BARNES v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:04-cv-01193-EGB
District Judge Eric G. Bruggink, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo ALBERT L. BARNES, SR., Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Benjamin C. King, Jr. +1 202 307 6506 benjamin.c.king@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 7/21/2004
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 214 - Tax - Informer's Fees
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed
County None
Terminated 10/28/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 13 Filed: 11/5/2004, Entered: 11/10/2004 OrderCourt Filing
ORDERED: On November 1, 2004, the court received plaintiff's motion for summary judgment with supporting affidavit, and plaintiff's proposed findings of uncontroverted fact. Becuase this action was dismissed by order and judgment of October 28, 2004, plaintiff's motion for summary judgmentis returned unfiled. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (lg1, )
    LREF
    Blank 12 Filed: 10/28/2004, Entered: 10/28/2004
    JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Rule 58, dismissing the complaint pursuant to RCFC 12(b)(6). No costs. (dls)
      LREF
      Blank 11 Filed: 10/28/2004, Entered: 10/28/2004 Court Filing
      ORDER granting defendant's motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim, and directing the Clerk to dismiss the complaint pursuant to RCFC 12(b)(6). No costs. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (dls)
        LREF
        Blank 10 Filed: 10/15/2004, Entered: 10/20/2004 Reply to Response to Motion
        REPLY to Response to Motion re [8] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by USA. Service: 10/15/04.(vro, )
          LREF
          Blank 9 Filed: 10/4/2004, Entered: 10/7/2004 Response to Motion
          RESPONSE to [8] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by ALBERT L. BARNES SR.. Reply due by 10/15/2004. Service: 9/30/04.(dw1)
            LREF
            Blank 8 Filed: 9/17/2004, Entered: 9/22/2004 Terminated:
            MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) by USA.Service: 9/17/2004. Response due by 10/18/2004. (jcp, )
              LREF
              Blank 7 Filed: 9/13/2004, Entered: 9/16/2004 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
              ORDER: Pltf has been allowed to file a document entitled [6] "For Admission to Practice In the United States Court of Claims." It is unnecessary for the court to do so. Pltf is entitled to represent himself and is permitted to make all necessary filings and arguments to advance his case. The request is denied, yet pltf is not precluded from presenting himself. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (jcp, )
                LREF
                Blank 6 Filed: 9/9/2004, Entered: 9/14/2004, Terminated: 9/13/2004 Terminated:
                For Admission to Practice in the US Court of Federal Claims by ALBERT L. BARNES SR. [COPY TO DEFT][FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Response due by 9/27/2004. (jcp, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 5 Filed: 8/19/2004, Entered: 8/20/2004 Notice of Appearance/
                  NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin C. King for USA. Service: 8/19/2004.(jcp, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 4 Filed: 7/28/2004, Entered: 8/2/2004 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma paupCourt Filing
                    ORDER: For good cause shown, we allow [3] Pltf's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (jcp, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 3 Filed: 7/21/2004, Entered: 7/22/2004 Terminated:
                      MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ALBERT L. BARNES SR..Service: 7/21/2004. Response due by 8/9/2004 (lg1, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 2 Filed: 7/21/2004, Entered: 7/22/2004 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                        NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (lg1, ).
                          LREF
                          Blank 1 Filed: 7/21/2004, Entered: 7/22/2004 Complaint
                          COMPLAINT against USA (TRE) , filed by ALBERT L. BARNES SR..Answer Due by 9/20/2004.(lg1, )
                            LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 224 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?