MOORE v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:04-cv-01281-LB
District Judge Lawrence J. Block, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo DAVID EARL MOORE, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"
Office COFC
Filed 8/13/2004
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 352 - Military Pay - Retirement
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Transfer/Remand - Remanded to U.S. Agency
County None
Terminated 8/26/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 4 Filed: 8/19/2005, Entered: 8/22/2005 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER: Waiving Filing Fee. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (mb2, )
    LREF
    Blank 3 Filed: 8/26/2004, Entered: 8/26/2004 Court Filing
    ORDERED that "plaintiff's submission entittled "Complaint" is deemed to be in fact a Notice of Appeal in case number 03-1499, and not as the erroneously filed complaint in case number 04-1281 C. Accordingly, the Clerk of the Court is directed to close case number 04-1281 C, and file forthwith, nunc pro tunc to August 13, 2004, plaintiff's Notice of Appeal in case number 03-1499 C." Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (hw1, )
      LREF
      Blank 2 Filed: 8/13/2004, Entered: 8/17/2004 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
      NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Lawrence J. Block. (lg1, )
        LREF
        Blank 1 Filed: 8/13/2004, Entered: 8/17/2004 Complaint
        COMPLAINT against USA (AF) , filed by DAVID EARL MOORE.Answer Due by 10/12/2004.(lg1, )
          LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 112 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?