ROEMER v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:04-cv-01398-EGB
District Judge Eric G. Bruggink, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo DENNIS RAY ROEMER, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Douglas Gustafson David.D.Gustafson@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 8/31/2004
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 202 - Tax - Declaratory Judgment 28:1507
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed
County None
Terminated 11/29/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 10 Filed: 12/2/2004, Entered: 12/9/2004 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER: Pending is [8] Pltf's 11/22/2004 MOTION for Hearing. Because the court issued an order of dismissal for lack of jurisdiction on 11/12/2004, and judgment was entered 11/29/2004, pltf's motion is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (jcp, )
    LREF
    Blank 9 Filed: 11/29/2004, Entered: 11/29/2004
    JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed, without prejudice, pursuant to RCFC 12(b)(1) for lack of jurisdiction. No costs. (lld, )
      LREF
      Blank 8 Filed: 11/23/2004, Entered: 11/29/2004, Terminated: 12/2/2004 Terminated:
      MOTION to Set Hearing by DENNIS RAY ROEMER.Service: 11/18/2004. Response due by 12/6/2004. (jcp, )
        LREF
        Blank 7 Filed: 11/12/2004, Entered: 11/16/2004 Order on Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(1)Court Filing
        ORDER: The [3] Dft's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction must therefore be granted. The Clerk is directed to dismiss the complaint without prejudice pursuant to RCFC 12(b)(1) for lack of jurisdiction. No costs. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (jcp, )
          LREF
          Blank 6 Filed: 11/5/2004, Entered: 11/9/2004 Reply to Response to Motion
          REPLY to Response to Motion re [3] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) filed by USA. Service: 11/5/2004.(dw1)
            LREF
            Blank 5 Filed: 10/25/2004, Entered: 10/28/2004 Response to Motion
            RESPONSE to [3] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) filed by DENNIS RAY ROEMER. Reply due by 11/8/2004. Service: 10/21/04.(jat, )
              LREF
              Blank 4 Filed: 9/22/2004, Entered: 9/26/2004 Notice of Appearance/
              NOTICE of Appearance by David Douglas Gustafson for USA Service: 9/21/2004.(lg1, )
                LREF
                Blank 3 Filed: 9/22/2004, Entered: 9/26/2004 Terminated:
                MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) by USA.Service: 9/21/2004. Response due by 10/25/2004 (lg1, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 2 Filed: 8/31/2004, Entered: 8/31/2004 Court Filing
                  NOTICE of Assignment to Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (dw1)
                    LREF
                    Blank 1 Filed: 8/31/2004, Entered: 8/31/2004
                    COMPLAINT against USA (TRE) (Filing fee $150, Receipt number 061305), filed by DENNIS RAY ROEMER.Answer Due by 11/1/2004.(dw1)
                      LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 127 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?