EVERGLADES NATIONAL PARK BOAT TOURS, INC. v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:04-cv-01400-EGB
District Judge Eric G. Bruggink, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo EVERGLADES NATIONAL PARK BOAT TOURS, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by The Garden Law Firm PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kevin Richard Garden +1 703 535 5565 +1 703 977 1330 kevin@gardenlawfirm.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory Thomas Jaeger +1 202 353 7955 +1 202 353 7988 gregory.jaeger@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 9/1/2004
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 138 - Contract - (Pre Award) Injunctions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County None
Terminated 6/14/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (48) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 44 Filed: 6/14/2005, Entered: 6/17/2005 Stipulation of Dismissal
STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice by all parties filed [by leave of the judge]. Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii) this day. (dls )
    LREF
    Blank 43 Filed: 5/5/2005, Entered: 5/10/2005 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
    STATUS REPORT ORDER: Status Report due by 5/20/2005. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mb2, )
      LREF
      Blank 42 Filed: 3/11/2005, Entered: 3/14/2005 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
      STATUS REPORT ORDER: Joint Status Report that was to be due on 3/11/05 is now due by 4/15/2005. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mb2, )
        LREF
        Blank 41 Filed: 3/4/2005, Entered: 3/7/2005 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
        STATUS REPORT ORDER: Status Report due by 3/11/2005. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mb2, )
          LREF
          Blank 40 Filed: 2/24/2005, Entered: 2/28/2005 Joint Status Report
          JOINT STATUS REPORT by all parties. Service: 2/24/2005.(mb2, )
            LREF
            Blank 39 Filed: 2/10/2005, Entered: 2/14/2005 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
            STATUS REPORT ORDER: Status Report due by 2/25/2005. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mb2, )
              LREF
              Blank 38 Filed: 2/9/2005, Entered: 2/10/2005 Joint Status Report
              JOINT STATUS REPORT by all parties. Service: 2/9/05.(mb2, )
                LREF
                Blank 37 Filed: 1/31/2005, Entered: 2/1/2005 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                STATUS REPORT ORDER: Status Report due by 2/9/2005. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mb2, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 36 Filed: 1/26/2005, Entered: 1/28/2005 Joint Status Report
                  JOINT STATUS REPORT by all parties. Service: 01/26/05.(mb2, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 35 Filed: 1/11/2005, Entered: 1/12/2005 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                    STATUS REPORT ORDER: The court's order of January 6, 2005 is amended to reflect that the parties are directed to file a joint status report on or before 1/26/2005. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mb2, )
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 1/11/2005, Entered: 1/11/2005
                      Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 2/7/2005. (vp1, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 34 Filed: 1/6/2005, Entered: 1/10/2005 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                        STATUS REPORT ORDER: The telephonic status conference scheduled for January 5, 2005, is cancelled. The defendant's obligation to file an answer or other response to the first amended complaint is deferred pending further order. Status Report due by 1/11/2005 Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mb2, ) Modified on 1/10/2005 (mb2, ).
                          LREF
                          Blank 33 Filed: 1/3/2005, Entered: 1/4/2005 TranscriptCourt Filing
                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on December 3, 2004 before Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (eph, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 32 Filed: 12/16/2004, Entered: 12/28/2004 Amended Complaint
                            FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. Service: 12/16/2004.(dw1)
                              LREF
                              Blank 31 Filed: 12/16/2004, Entered: 12/28/2004 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                              SCHEDULING ORDER: Answer to Amended Complaint Due by 1/7/2005. Telephonic Status Conference set for 1/5/2005 10:00 AM before Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. Signed by Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (dw1)
                                LREF
                                Blank 30 Filed: 12/8/2004, Entered: 12/14/2004 Terminated:
                                MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by EVERGLADES NATIONAL PARK BOAT TOURS, INC..Service: 12/8/2004. Response due by 12/27/2004. (dw1)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 12/2/2004, Entered: 12/2/2004
                                  Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 1/3/2005. (vp1, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 29 Filed: 11/17/2004, Entered: 11/19/2004 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                    SCHEDULING ORDER: Oral Argument set for 12/3/2004 10:00 AM in National Courts Building before Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. Signed by Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (dw1)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 28 Filed: 11/15/2004, Entered: 11/17/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings in One Volume held on 10/12/2004 before Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (jcp, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 27 Filed: 11/12/2004, Entered: 11/16/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                        Reply by EVERGLADES NATIONAL PARK BOAT TOURS, INC. re [26] MOTION for Leave to File amend the complaint. Service: 11/12/2004.(dw1)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 26 Filed: 11/5/2004, Entered: 11/9/2004 Terminated:
                                          Opposition to Notice of Filing of First Amended Complaint, or in the alternative, MOTION for Leave to amend the complaint by USA.Service: 11/5/2004. Response due by 11/22/2004. (dw1)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 25 Filed: 10/19/2004, Entered: 10/25/2004 Terminated:
                                            MOTION for Leave to amend complaint by EVERGLADES NATIONAL PARK BOAT TOURS, INC. Service: 10/19/2004. Response due by 11/5/2004.(hw1, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 24 Filed: 10/13/2004, Entered: 10/20/2004 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment on the Admin.Court Filing
                                              ORDER finding as moot [18] Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record. Signed by Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (dw1)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 10/13/2004, Entered: 10/20/2004 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                Set Deadlines/Hearings: Plaintiff's Motion(s) to Amend the Complaint due by 10/19/2004. (dw1)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 10/13/2004, Entered: 10/13/2004
                                                  Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 11/12/2004. (vp1, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 23 Filed: 10/5/2004, Entered: 10/6/2004 Status Conference OrderCourt Filing
                                                    STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference set for 10/12/2004 10:00 AM before Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. The court's scheduling order of September 3, 2004 is vacated Signed by Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (dw1)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 22 Filed: 10/1/2004, Entered: 10/5/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                      NOTICE OF AGENCY ACTION by USA. Service: 10/1/2004.(jcp, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 21 Filed: 9/28/2004, Entered: 9/30/2004 Redacted Document
                                                        REDACTED DOCUMENT by EVERGLADES NATIONAL PARK BOAT TOURS, INC. redacting [19] Pltf's Memorandum in Support of its Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record. Service: 9/28/2004 by hand.(jcp, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 20 Filed: 9/24/2004, Entered: 9/28/2004 Statement of Facts
                                                          STATEMENT OF FACTS by EVERGLADES NATIONAL PARK BOAT TOURS, INC. [FILDD UNDER SEAL] Service: 9/22/2004.(jcp, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 19 Filed: 9/24/2004, Entered: 9/28/2004 Memorandum
                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record by EVERGLADES NATIONAL PARK BOAT TOURS, INC. [FILED UNDER SEAL] Service: 9/22/2004.(jcp, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 18 Filed: 9/24/2004, Entered: 9/28/2004 Terminated:
                                                              MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record by EVERGLADES NATIONAL PARK BOAT TOURS, INC. Service: 9/22/2004. Response due by 10/1/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 17 Filed: 9/24/2004, Entered: 9/28/2004 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER: [14] Pltf's Motion for Leave to Exceed the Page Limitation is ALLOWED. Pltf's motion for judgment on the administrative record shall be FILED THIS DAY. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (jcp, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 16 Filed: 9/24/2004, Entered: 9/28/2004 Administrative Record (Supplement)
                                                                  SUPPLEMENT to the ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD [One Large Bound Volume] by EVERGLADES NATIONAL PARK BOAT TOURS, INC. (jcp, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 15 Filed: 9/24/2004, Entered: 9/28/2004 Order on Motion to Supplement the Administrative RCourt Filing
                                                                    ORDER: [13] Pltf's Motion to Supplement the Administrative Record is ALLOWED. Pltf's supplement to the administrative record shall be FILED THIS DAY. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (jcp, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 14 Filed: 9/22/2004, Entered: 9/26/2004 Terminated:
                                                                      MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit of Brief by 8 pages by EVERGLADES NATIONAL PARK BOAT TOURS, INC..Service: 9/22/2004. Response due by 10/12/2004 (lg1, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 13 Filed: 9/22/2004, Entered: 9/26/2004 Terminated:
                                                                        MOTION to Supplement the Administrative Record by EVERGLADES NATIONAL PARK BOAT TOURS, INC..Service: 9/22/2004. Response due by 10/12/2004 (lg1, )
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 12 Filed: 9/21/2004, Entered: 9/24/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                          NOTICE Of Filing of Additional Documents Pursuant to Court Order by USA Service: 9/21/2004.(lg1, )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 11 Filed: 9/20/2004, Entered: 9/23/2004 Order on Motion to CompelCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER granting [10] Pltf's Motion to Compel Production of the Complete Administrative Record. Dft is directed to file with the court the pages from the agency file that are the subject of pltf's motion. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (jcp, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 10 Filed: 9/17/2004, Entered: 9/21/2004, Terminated: 9/20/2004 Terminated:
                                                                              MOTION to Compel Production of Complete Administrative Record, by EVERGLADES NATIONAL PARK BOAT TOURS, INC. Service: 9/17/2004. Response due by 10/4/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 9 Filed: 9/15/2004, Entered: 9/17/2004 Administrative RecordCourt Filing
                                                                                ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD (two volumes) by USA, by leave of the Judge. [FILED UNDER SEAL] Service: 9/13/04.(dw1)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 8 Filed: 9/15/2004, Entered: 9/17/2004 Administrative RecordCourt Filing
                                                                                  ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD (two volumes) by USA, by leave of the Judge. [FILED UNDER SEAL] Service: 9/13/04.(dw1)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 9/15/2004, Entered: 9/17/2004 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                    NOTICE of Filing the Administrative Record by USA, by leave of the Judge. Service by hand: 9/13/2004(dw1)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 9/13/2004, Entered: 9/16/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                                                                                      ORDER granting [5] Dft's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time.Administrative Record due by 9/13/2004. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (jcp, )
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 5 Filed: 9/10/2004, Entered: 9/15/2004, Terminated: 9/13/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                        UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time until 9/13/2004 to file the Administrative Record by USA.Service: 9/10/2004. Response due by 9/27/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 9/10/2004, Entered: 9/15/2004 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Thomas Jaeger for USA. Service: 9/10/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 3 Filed: 9/3/2004, Entered: 9/8/2004 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER: Dft will file the Administrative Record by the close of business on 9/10/2004. Pltf will file its motion for judgment on the administrative record pursuant to RCFC 56.1 on or before 9/22/2004. Dft will file its response and Cross Motion for summary judgment on or before 10/1/2004.Pltf will file its Reply Brief on or before 10/7/2004. No other briefing will be filed absent court order. Oral Argument will be heard from the courtroom on Tuesday, 10/12/2004 10:00 AM in National Courts Building before Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (jcp, )
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 2 Filed: 9/1/2004, Entered: 9/1/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                              NOTICE of Assignment to Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (dw1)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 9/1/2004, Entered: 9/1/2004
                                                                                                COMPLAINT against USA (DOI) (Filing fee $150, Receipt number 061307), filed by EVERGLADES NATIONAL PARK BOAT TOURS, INC.. Answer Due by 11/1/2004.(dw1)
                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                  Space Space

                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 132 times.

                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                   
                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                  Need Password Help?