FOUNDATION OF HUMAN UNDERSTANDING v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:04-cv-01441-ECH
District Judge Emily C. Hewitt, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo FOUNDATION OF HUMAN UNDERSTANDING, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Schwabe, Williamson & Wyatt, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marc K. Sellers +1 503 796 2917 +1 503 796 2900 msellers@schwabe.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Charles Rapp +1 202 307 0503 william.c.rapp2@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 9/13/2004
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 202 - Tax - Declaratory Judgment 28:1507
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County None
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag ECF
  Entries (61) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 58 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: 9/12/2008 Court Filing
ORDER denying [52] Motion for Leave to File Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ae)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 9/11/2008, Entered: 9/11/2008
    Minute Entry for proceeding held in Washington DC on 9/11/2008 before Judge Emily C. Hewitt: Informal Telephonic Status Conference off the record to resolve method for filing documents. [Total number of minutes of proceeding: 10]. Proceeding was not officially recorded. (Click HERE for link to Court of Federal Claims web site forms page for information on ordering: certified transcript from reporter or certified transcript of proceeding from official digital recording.)(ae)
      LREF
      Legal Document 57 Filed: 9/10/2008, Entered: 9/10/2008 Court Filing
      ORDER ADDRESSING DEFICIENCY OF FILING Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ae)
        LREF
        Legal Document 56 Filed: 9/9/2008, Entered: 9/9/2008
        PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact RE: [53] MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment Plaintiff's Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact (RCFC 56(h)), filed by FOUNDATION OF HUMAN UNDERSTANDING. (Sellers, Marc)
          LREF
          Legal Document 55 Filed: 9/9/2008, Entered: 9/9/2008
          AFFIDAVIT re [53] MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment Affidavit of Roy Masters in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment by FOUNDATION OF HUMAN UNDERSTANDING. (Sellers, Marc)
            LREF
            Legal Document 54 Filed: 9/9/2008, Entered: 9/9/2008
            MEMORANDUM re: [53] Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by FOUNDATION OF HUMAN UNDERSTANDING. (Sellers, Marc)
              LREF
              Legal Document 53 Filed: 9/9/2008, Entered: 9/9/2008
              MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by FOUNDATION OF HUMAN UNDERSTANDING.Response due by 10/10/2008.(Sellers, Marc)
                LREF
                Legal Document 52 Filed: 9/9/2008, Entered: 9/9/2008, Terminated: 9/12/2008 Motion for Leave to File
                MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Summary Judgment Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Documents Conventionally, on Disc, filed by FOUNDATION OF HUMAN UNDERSTANDING.Response due by 9/26/2008.(Sellers, Marc)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 51 Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: 7/10/2008 Court Filing
                  ORDER granting [50] Motion for Extension of Time Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment due by 9/9/2008. Defendant's Cross Motion for Summary Judgment and responses due by 10/28/2008. Plaintiff's Reply and Responses due by 11/25/2008. Defendant's Reply due by 12/23/2008. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (jh4)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 50 Filed: 7/8/2008, Entered: 7/8/2008, Terminated: 7/10/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 9/23/08 to file plaintiff's motion for summary judgment Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Enlargement of Time, filed by FOUNDATION OF HUMAN UNDERSTANDING.Response due by 7/25/2008.(Sellers, Marc)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 49 Filed: 6/19/2008, Entered: 6/19/2008 Court Filing
                      SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment due by 7/22/2008. Defendant's Cross Motion for Summary Judgment and Response due by 9/23/2008. Plaintiff's Reply and Response due by 10/21/2008. Defendant's Reply due by 11/18/2008.. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (jh4)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 6/19/2008, Entered: 6/19/2008
                        Minute Entry for proceeding held in Washington, DC on 6/19/2008 for 12 minutes before Judge Emily C. Hewitt: Status Conference. [Total number of days of proceeding: 1]. Official Record of proceeding taken via electronic digital recording (EDR). (Click HERE for link to Court of Federal Claims web site forms page for information on ordering: certified transcript from reporter or certified transcript of proceeding from official digital recording.)(jh4)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 48 Filed: 6/17/2008, Entered: 6/17/2008 Court Filing
                          STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 6/19/2008 02:00 PM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Judge Emily C. Hewitt. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (jh4)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 47 Filed: 5/23/2008, Entered: 5/23/2008
                            STIPULATION Joint Stipulation of Facts, filed by all parties. (Sellers, Marc)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 46 Filed: 4/8/2008, Entered: 4/8/2008 Court Filing
                              ORDER granting [45] Motion for Extension of Time. Joint Stipulation of Facts due 5/23/2008 Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (jh4)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 45 Filed: 4/8/2008, Entered: 4/8/2008, Terminated: 4/8/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 05/23/2008 to file joint stipulation of facts, filed by USA.Response due by 4/25/2008.(Rapp, William)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 44 Filed: 1/9/2008, Entered: 1/9/2008 Court Filing
                                  SCHEDULING ORDER:Joint Stipulation of Facts due by 4/8/2008.,Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment along with proposed findings of uncontroverted fact due by 6/10/2008.,defendant's cross-motion for summary judgment along with proposed findings of uncontroverted fact, its opposition to plaintiff's motion for summary judgment, and its responses to plaintiff's proposed findings of uncontroverted fact due by 8/12/2008.,Plaintiff's Reply and opposition, along with its responses to defendant's proposed findings of uncontroverted fact due by 9/9/2008.,defendant's Reply due by 10/7/2008. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (jh4)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 43 Filed: 1/4/2008, Entered: 1/4/2008
                                    STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Rapp, William)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 42 Filed: 7/17/2007, Entered: 7/17/2007 Court Filing
                                      ORDER granting [41] Motion for Extension of Time Exhibit List due by 9/30/2007. Witness List due by 9/30/2007. Discovery due by 12/29/2007. Joint Status Report due by 1/4/2008 Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ef2)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 41 Filed: 7/16/2007, Entered: 7/16/2007, Terminated: 7/17/2007 Motion to Amend Schedule
                                        Unopposed MOTION to Amend Schedule re: [40] Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File, filed by USA.Response due by 8/2/2007.(Rapp, William)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 40 Filed: 6/11/2007, Entered: 6/11/2007 Court Filing
                                          ORDER granting [39] Motion for Extension of Time. Discovery due by 7/16/2007. Motion due by 7/16/2007. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ef2)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 39 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: 6/8/2007, Terminated: 6/11/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until July 15, 2007 to to file motion to dismiss, filed by USA.Response due by 6/25/2007.(Rapp, William)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 38 Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: 4/18/2007 Court Filing
                                              SCHEDULING ORDER:Discovery and Motion due by 6/15/2007. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ef2) Modified on 4/18/2007 (mb2, ).
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 37 Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: 4/16/2007, Terminated: 7/25/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 06/15/2007 to File a Motion to Dismiss and to Complete Discovery, filed by USA.Response due by 5/3/2007.(Rapp, William)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 36 Filed: 3/1/2007, Entered: 3/1/2007 Court Filing
                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER:Discovery due by 4/16/2007. Motion(s) due by 4/16/2007. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ef2, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 35 Filed: 2/28/2007, Entered: 2/28/2007, Terminated: 7/25/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 4/16/2007 to To file motion to dismiss and to complete discovery, filed by USA.Response due by 3/19/2007.(Rapp, William)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 34 Filed: 12/12/2006, Entered: 12/12/2006 Court Filing
                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER:Discovery due by 3/1/2007.Dispositive Motion concerning potential lack of jurisdiction due by 3/1/2007. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ef2, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 33 Filed: 12/4/2006, Entered: 12/4/2006
                                                        NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (mb2, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 32 Filed: 12/4/2006, Entered: 12/4/2006 Court Filing
                                                          ORDER directing the Clerk to designate this case as an electronic (ECF) case. All future filings will be in electronic form. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (mb2, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 31 Filed: 12/4/2006, Entered: 12/4/2006 Court Filing
                                                            STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 12/12/2006 at 3:30 PM before Judge Emily C. Hewitt. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (mb2, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 30 Filed: 11/21/2006, Entered: 11/22/2006 Joint Status Report
                                                              JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by USA. Service: 11/21/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 29 Filed: 11/14/2006, Entered: 11/14/2006 Court Filing
                                                                ORDER granting [27] Motion for Leave to File Other Media. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (mb2, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 28 Filed: 10/23/2006, Entered: 10/24/2006 Administrative Record
                                                                  ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD (24 Volumes), filed by USA. Service: 10/23/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 27 Filed: 10/23/2006, Entered: 10/24/2006, Terminated: 11/14/2006 Terminated:
                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Other Media, filed by USA. Service: 10/23/2006.Response due by 11/9/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 26 Filed: 9/12/2006, Entered: 9/12/2006 Court Filing
                                                                      ORDER granting [25] Motion for Extension of Time.Administrative Record due by 10/23/2006. Status Report due by 11/22/2006. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (mb2, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 25 Filed: 9/8/2006, Entered: 9/11/2006, Terminated: 9/12/2006 Terminated:
                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time until 10/23/2006 to File the Administrative Record , filed by USA. Service: 9/8/2006.Response due by 9/25/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 24 Filed: 7/27/2006, Entered: 7/27/2006 Court Filing
                                                                          ORDER granting [23] Motion for Extension of Time. Administrative Record due by 9/8/2006. Status Report due by 10/10/2006 Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (mb2, )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 23 Filed: 7/25/2006, Entered: 7/25/2006, Terminated: 7/27/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time until 9/8/2006 to File the Administrative Record , filed by USA. Service: 7/25/2006.Response due by 8/11/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 22 Filed: 5/30/2006, Entered: 6/5/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                                                                              ORDER granting [21] Motion for Extension of Time. Administrative Record due by 7/25/2006. Status Report due by 8/25/2006. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (mb2, )
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 21 Filed: 5/24/2006, Entered: 5/30/2006, Terminated: 5/30/2006 Terminated:
                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time until 7/25/2006 to File the Administrative Record , filed by USA. Service: 5/24/2006.Response due by 6/12/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 20 Filed: 3/29/2006, Entered: 3/31/2006 Order on Motion to Amend ScheduleCourt Filing
                                                                                  ORDER granting [19] Motion for Extension of Time. Administrative Record due by 5/26/2006. Status Report due by 6/26/2006. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (mb2, )
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 19 Filed: 3/24/2006, Entered: 3/27/2006, Terminated: 3/29/2006 Terminated:
                                                                                    MOTION to Amend Schedule re: [18] Scheduling Order, filed by USA. Service: 3/24/2006. Response due by 4/10/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 18 Filed: 1/27/2006, Entered: 1/31/2006 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER: Administrative Record due 3/28/2006. Status Report due by 4/27/2006. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (mb2, )
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 17 Filed: 1/24/2006, Entered: 1/27/2006 Terminated:
                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time until 4/27/2006 to File the Joint Status Report , filed by FOUNDATION OF HUMAN UNDERSTANDING. Service: 1/19/2006. Response due by 2/6/2006. (mb2, )
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 16 Filed: 12/7/2005, Entered: 12/12/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                                                                                          ORDER granting [15] Motion for Extension of Time. Administrative Record due 1/27/2006. Status Report due by 2/24/2006. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (mb2, )
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 15 Filed: 12/6/2005, Entered: 12/7/2005, Terminated: 12/7/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time until 2/26/2006 to Designate the Administrative Record , filed by FOUNDATION OF HUMAN UNDERSTANDING. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 11/28/2005. Response due by 12/15/2005. (mb2, )
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 14 Filed: 10/4/2005, Entered: 10/6/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                                                                                              ORDER granting [13] Motion for Extension of Time to file the Administrative Record. Administrative Record due 11/28/2005. Joint Status Report due by 12/28/2005. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (dw1)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 13 Filed: 9/29/2005, Entered: 9/30/2005, Terminated: 10/4/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time until 11/28/2005 to File the Administrative Record, filed by USA. Service: 9/29/2005. Response due by 10/17/2005. (mb2, )
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 12 Filed: 8/1/2005, Entered: 8/3/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER granting [11] Motion for Extension of Time.Administrative Record due 9/29/2005. Status Report due by 10/27/2005. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (mb2, )
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 11 Filed: 7/29/2005, Entered: 7/29/2005, Terminated: 8/1/2005 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time until 9/29/2005 to File the Administrative Record, filed by USA. Service: 7/29/2005. Response due by 8/15/2005. (mb2, )
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 10 Filed: 6/7/2005, Entered: 6/13/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER granting [9] Motion for Extension of Time. Administrative Record due 8/1/2005. Status Report due by 8/30/2005. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (mb2, )
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 9 Filed: 6/1/2005, Entered: 6/6/2005, Terminated: 6/7/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time until July 31, 2005 to stipulate and file the administrative record filed by USA.Service: 6/1/05. (dw1)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 8 Filed: 2/9/2005, Entered: 2/11/2005 Order Returning Document UnfiledCourt Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER RETURNING UNFILED: Plaintiff's Reply to Answer received 2/7/05. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (mb2, )
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 7 Filed: 1/31/2005, Entered: 2/2/2005 Joint Preliminary Status Report
                                                                                                            JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT. Service: 01/31/05.(mb2, )
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 6 Filed: 12/13/2004, Entered: 12/21/2004 Answer
                                                                                                              ANSWER to [1] Complaint by USA.Service: 12/13/04. JPSR due by 2/3/2005.(dw1)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 5 Filed: 11/15/2004, Entered: 11/19/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER Granting Defendant's Motion for an Enlargment of time. Defendant's answer or other response shall be filed on or before Monday, December 13, 2004. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (lg1, )
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 11/15/2004, Entered: 11/19/2004 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                                                                                  Set Deadlines for defendant's to answer or other response. . Response due by 12/13/2004 (lg1, )
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 11/10/2004, Entered: 12/27/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint until 12/13/2004 by USA.Service: 11/10/2004. (hw1, )
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 9/29/2004, Entered: 9/30/2004 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by William Charles Rapp for USA. Service: 9/29/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 9/13/2004, Entered: 9/14/2004 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (lg1, )
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 9/13/2004, Entered: 9/14/2004 Complaint
                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT against USA (TRE) ( Filing fee $150, Receipt number 061373), filed by FOUNDATION OF HUMAN UNDERSTANDING.Answer Due by 11/12/2004.(lg1, )
                                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 91 times.

                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?