COMBS-BURGE v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:04-cv-01608-LAS
District Judge Loren A. Smith, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo BARBARA J. COMBS-BURGE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Tom Weathered

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph D. Gebhardt +1 202 496 0400 +1 202 496 0404 jgebhardt@gebhardtlaw.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory Thomas Jaeger +1 202 353 7955 +1 202 353 7988 gregory.jaeger@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 10/27/2004
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 312 - Civilian Pay - Other
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed
County None
Terminated 4/1/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 6 Filed: 4/1/2005, Entered: 4/1/2005
JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, dismissing the complaint without prejudice. (dls )
    LREF
    Blank 5 Filed: 4/1/2005, Entered: 4/1/2005 Court Filing
    ORDER GRANTING defendant's motion to dismiss for lack of subject matter jurisdiction; and directing the Clerk to dismiss the complaint without prejudice. Signed by Senior Judge Loren A. Smith. (dls )
      LREF
      Blank 4 Filed: 12/22/2004, Entered: 12/28/2004 Terminated:
      MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) by USA.Service: 12/22/2004. Response due by 1/24/2005 (bre, )
        LREF
        Blank 3 Filed: 11/15/2004, Entered: 11/17/2004 Notice of Appearance/
        NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Thomas Jaeger for USA. Service: 11/15/2004.(jcp, )
          LREF
          Blank 2 Filed: 10/27/2004, Entered: 10/28/2004 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
          NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Loren A. Smith. (lg1, )
            LREF
            Blank 1 Filed: 10/27/2004, Entered: 10/28/2004 Complaint
            COMPLAINT against USA (DOD) ( Filing fee $150, Receipt number 061636), filed by BARBARA J. COMBS-BURGE.Answer Due by 12/27/2004.(lg1, )
              LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 147 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?