BAIR et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:04-cv-01689-LMB
District Judge Lawrence M. Baskir, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 31, 2016 at 9:46 AM ST (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ALLAN ROBEL, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Lukins & Annis, PS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bryce James Wilcox +1 509 455 9555 +1 509 363 2493 bwilcox@lukins.com
No Logo BAIR BROTHERS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Lukins & Annis, PS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bryce James Wilcox +1 509 455 9555 +1 509 363 2493 bwilcox@lukins.com
No Logo BAIR FARMS, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Lukins & Annis, PS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bryce James Wilcox +1 509 455 9555 +1 509 363 2493 bwilcox@lukins.com
No Logo BERGESON FARMS, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Lukins & Annis, PS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bryce James Wilcox +1 509 455 9555 +1 509 363 2493 bwilcox@lukins.com
No Logo CEEKAYDEE FARMS GENERAL PARTNERSHIP, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Lukins & Annis, PS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bryce James Wilcox +1 509 455 9555 +1 509 363 2493 bwilcox@lukins.com
No Logo CHRIS HYER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Lukins & Annis, PS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bryce James Wilcox +1 509 455 9555 +1 509 363 2493 bwilcox@lukins.com
No Logo CORBETT DRAW FARMS GENERAL PARTNERSHIP, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Lukins & Annis, PS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bryce James Wilcox +1 509 455 9555 +1 509 363 2493 bwilcox@lukins.com
No Logo D & D GILBERT FARMS, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Lukins & Annis, PS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bryce James Wilcox +1 509 455 9555 +1 509 363 2493 bwilcox@lukins.com
No Logo DAVID HAMMOND, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Lukins & Annis, PS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bryce James Wilcox +1 509 455 9555 +1 509 363 2493 bwilcox@lukins.com
No Logo J. LAMAR GILBERT, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Lukins & Annis, PS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bryce James Wilcox +1 509 455 9555 +1 509 363 2493 bwilcox@lukins.com
No Logo JERRY C. MILBRANDT, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Lukins & Annis, PS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bryce James Wilcox +1 509 455 9555 +1 509 363 2493 bwilcox@lukins.com
No Logo JERRY HODGES, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Lukins & Annis, PS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bryce James Wilcox +1 509 455 9555 +1 509 363 2493 bwilcox@lukins.com
No Logo JOHN HYER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Lukins & Annis, PS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bryce James Wilcox +1 509 455 9555 +1 509 363 2493 bwilcox@lukins.com
No Logo KEITH B. CHILD, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Lukins & Annis, PS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bryce James Wilcox +1 509 455 9555 +1 509 363 2493 bwilcox@lukins.com
No Logo L. SHEFFELS & SONS, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Lukins & Annis, PS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bryce James Wilcox +1 509 455 9555 +1 509 363 2493 bwilcox@lukins.com
No Logo LEON R. BAKERS FARMS, LLC,, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Lukins & Annis, PS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bryce James Wilcox +1 509 455 9555 +1 509 363 2493 bwilcox@lukins.com
No Logo LYLE K. BAIR, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Lukins & Annis, PS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bryce James Wilcox +1 509 455 9555 +1 509 363 2493 bwilcox@lukins.com
No Logo MARK IVERSON, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Lukins & Annis, PS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bryce James Wilcox +1 509 455 9555 +1 509 363 2493 bwilcox@lukins.com
No Logo PAUL STOKER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Lukins & Annis, PS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bryce James Wilcox +1 509 455 9555 +1 509 363 2493 bwilcox@lukins.com
No Logo R & J FAMILY FARMS, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Lukins & Annis, PS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bryce James Wilcox +1 509 455 9555 +1 509 363 2493 bwilcox@lukins.com
No Logo RANDY ROYLANCE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Lukins & Annis, PS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bryce James Wilcox +1 509 455 9555 +1 509 363 2493 bwilcox@lukins.com
No Logo RONALD ROYLANCE FARMS, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Lukins & Annis, PS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bryce James Wilcox +1 509 455 9555 +1 509 363 2493 bwilcox@lukins.com
No Logo ROSS L. BAIR, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Lukins & Annis, PS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bryce James Wilcox +1 509 455 9555 +1 509 363 2493 bwilcox@lukins.com
No Logo ROYLANCE COULEE PARTNERSHIP, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Lukins & Annis, PS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bryce James Wilcox +1 509 455 9555 +1 509 363 2493 bwilcox@lukins.com
No Logo SBS FARMS, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Lukins & Annis, PS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bryce James Wilcox +1 509 455 9555 +1 509 363 2493 bwilcox@lukins.com
No Logo STOKROSE FARM AND FEEDLOT, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Lukins & Annis, PS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bryce James Wilcox +1 509 455 9555 +1 509 363 2493 bwilcox@lukins.com
No Logo TIM TAYLOR, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Lukins & Annis, PS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bryce James Wilcox +1 509 455 9555 +1 509 363 2493 bwilcox@lukins.com
No Logo TOM DOWNS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Lukins & Annis, PS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bryce James Wilcox +1 509 455 9555 +1 509 363 2493 bwilcox@lukins.com
No Logo TRACY LYBBERT FARMS, INC.,, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Lukins & Annis, PS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bryce James Wilcox +1 509 455 9555 +1 509 363 2493 bwilcox@lukins.com
No Logo TRAVIS STEFFLER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Lukins & Annis, PS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bryce James Wilcox +1 509 455 9555 +1 509 363 2493 bwilcox@lukins.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory Thomas Jaeger +1 202 353 7955 +1 202 353 7988 gregory.jaeger@usdoj.gov
Space William K. Olivier +1 202 616 8131 +1 202 514 7965 william.olivier@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 11/19/2004
Jury Demand None
Demand $8573000
Nature of Suit 514 - Taking - Other
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed
County None
Terminated 1/11/2007
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
104-cv-01689-LMB None
Related Case
Other Court Case '07-5049'[]
Def Custody Status
Flags AUTO, CLOSED, LEAD
  Entries (55) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 53 Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: 8/18/2008
MANDATE of CAFC affirming [49] Published Opinion/Order. Nunc pro tunc 4/7/2008. (hw1, )
    LREF
    Blank 52 Filed: 2/5/2007, Entered: 2/6/2007 Terminated:
    CAFC Case Number 07-5049 for [51] Notice of Appeal, filed by ROSS L. BAIR, LYLE K. BAIR, BAIR BROTHERS, CEEKAYDEE FARMS GENERAL PARTNERSHIP, KEITH B. CHILD, CORBETT DRAW FARMS GENERAL PARTNERSHIP, TOM DOWNS, J. LAMAR GILBERT, DAVID HAMMOND, JERRY HODGES, CHRIS HYER, JOHN HYER, MARK IVERSON, LEON R. BAKERS FARMS, LLC, JERRY C. MILBRANDT, R & J FAMILY FARMS, INC., ALLAN ROBEL, ROYLANCE COULEE PARTNERSHIP, SBS FARMS, LLC, TRAVIS STEFFLER, STOKROSE FARM AND FEEDLOT, TIM TAYLOR, TRACY LYBBERT FARMS, INC., BAIR FARMS, INC., BERGESON FARMS, INC., D & D GILBERT FARMS, INC., L. SHEFFELS & SONS, INC., RONALD ROYLANCE FARMS, INC., RANDY ROYLANCE, PAUL STOKER. (hw1, )
      LREF
      Blank 51 Filed: 1/29/2007, Entered: 1/29/2007, Terminated: 8/18/2008 Notice of Appeal
      NOTICE OF APPEAL, filed by BERGESON FARMS, INC., CEEKAYDEE FARMS GENERAL PARTNERSHIP, KEITH B. CHILD, CORBETT DRAW FARMS GENERAL PARTNERSHIP, D & D GILBERT FARMS, INC., TOM DOWNS, J. LAMAR GILBERT, DAVID HAMMOND, JERRY HODGES, CHRIS HYER, JOHN HYER, ROSS L. BAIR, MARK IVERSON, L. SHEFFELS & SONS, INC., LEON R. BAKERS FARMS, LLC, JERRY C. MILBRANDT, R & J FAMILY FARMS, INC., ALLAN ROBEL, RONALD ROYLANCE FARMS, INC., ROYLANCE COULEE PARTNERSHIP, SBS FARMS, LLC, TRAVIS STEFFLER, LYLE K. BAIR, STOKROSE FARM AND FEEDLOT, TIM TAYLOR, TRACY LYBBERT FARMS, INC., RANDY ROYLANCE, PAUL STOKER, BAIR BROTHERS, BAIR FARMS, INC. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 066078. Copies to judge, opposing party and CAFC. (hw1, )
        LREF
        Blank 50 Filed: 1/11/2007, Entered: 1/11/2007
        JUDGMENT entered (in this and consolidated cases), pursuant to Rule 58, in favor of defendant, and dismissing the complaint. Each party is to bear its own costs. (dls )
          LREF
          Blank 49 Filed: 1/11/2007, Entered: 1/11/2007 Court Filing
          PUBLISHED OPINION GRANTING [26] CROSS MOTION filed by USA; and DENYING [21] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by ROSS L. BAIR. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment in favor of defendant. Parties are to bear their own costs. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dls)
            LREF
            Blank 48 Filed: 12/22/2006, Entered: 12/26/2006 Supplemental Brief
            SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re: [26] Cross Motion [Dispositive], filed by USA. Service: 12/22/06.(dls )
              LREF
              Blank 47 Filed: 12/6/2006, Entered: 12/8/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
              ORDER granting [45] Motion for Extension of Time Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (vro)
                LREF
                Blank 46 Filed: 12/6/2006, Entered: 12/8/2006 Response to Motion
                RESPONSE to [45] MOTION for Extension of Time until 12/22/2006 to Reply to Plaintiff's Supplemental Brief , filed by ROSS L. BAIR.Reply due by 12/20/2006. Service: 12/5/06.(vro)
                  LREF
                  Blank 45 Filed: 12/1/2006, Entered: 12/5/2006, Terminated: 12/6/2006 Terminated:
                  MOTION for Extension of Time until 12/22/2006 to Reply to Plaintiff's Supplemental Brief , filed by USA. Service: 12/01/06.Response due by 12/18/2006.(vro)
                    LREF
                    Blank 44 Filed: 11/22/2006, Entered: 11/28/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                    ORDER granting [43] Motion for Extension of Time Brief due by 12/1/2006 Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (vro)
                      LREF
                      Blank 43 Filed: 11/16/2006, Entered: 11/21/2006, Terminated: 11/22/2006 Terminated:
                      MOTION for Extension of Time until 12/1/2006 to Responsed to Plaintiff's Supplemental Brief , filed by USA. Service: 11/16/06.Response due by 12/4/2006.(vro)
                        LREF
                        Blank 42 Filed: 11/8/2006, Entered: 11/14/2006 Memorandum
                        PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM, filed by all plaintiffs. Service: 11/3/06.(vro)
                          LREF
                          Blank 41 Filed: 10/31/2006, Entered: 11/2/2006 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                          ORDER granting [40] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (mb2, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 40 Filed: 10/27/2006, Entered: 10/27/2006, Terminated: 10/31/2006 Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit
                            MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit of Supplemental Brief by 35 pages , filed by ROSS L. BAIR. Service: 10/26/06.Response due by 11/13/2006.(vro)
                              LREF
                              Blank 39 Filed: 10/24/2006, Entered: 10/25/2006 TranscriptCourt Filing
                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-109) held on September 20, 2006 before Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dw1)
                                LREF
                                Blank 38 Filed: 10/20/2006, Entered: 10/23/2006 Supplemental Brief
                                SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re: [37] Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File, filed by USA. Service: 10/20/06.(vro)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 37 Filed: 10/18/2006, Entered: 10/23/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                                  ORDER granting [36] Motion for Extension of Time Defendant's Brief due by 10/20/2006 Plaintiff's Brief(s) due by 11/3/2006. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (vro)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 36 Filed: 10/12/2006, Entered: 10/16/2006, Terminated: 10/18/2006 Terminated:
                                    MOTION for Extension of Time for Modication to the deadlines for the parties supplemental briefs , filed by USA. Service: 10/12/06.Response due by 10/30/2006.(vro)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 35 Filed: 9/21/2006, Entered: 9/29/2006 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                      SCHEDULING ORDER:SCHEDULING ORDER:Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Supplemental Brief due by 11/10/2006.Plaintiff's Brief due by 10/27/2006 Defendant Brief due by 10/13/2006.Response due by 11/10/2006.Brief due by 10/27/2006 Defendant Brief due by 10/13/2006. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (vro)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 34 Filed: 9/8/2006, Entered: 9/8/2006
                                        NOTICE of Additional Authority Service: 9/5/06.(vro, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 33 Filed: 8/25/2006, Entered: 8/25/2006 Court Filing
                                          ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion [21] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, [26] CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [21] Motion for Partial Summary Judgment: Oral Argument set for 9/20/2006 at 11:00 AM in National Courts Building before Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (mb2, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 32 Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: 8/22/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                            ORDER: parties shall notify the Court's J.A. of the proposed oral argument dates no later than 8/25/06 Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (vro, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 31 Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: 6/19/2006 Memorandum
                                              Consolidated Statement of Uncontroverted Facts, filed by all parties. Service: 6/16/2006.(mb2, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 30 Filed: 6/13/2006, Entered: 6/15/2006 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re [26] CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [21] Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, filed by ROSS L. BAIR, filed by USA. Service: 6/13/2006.(mb2, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 29 Filed: 6/12/2006, Entered: 6/13/2006 Order on Motion to Amend ScheduleCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER granting [28] Motion for Extension of Time. Reply due by 6/13/2006. Consolidated Statement of Uncontroverted Facts due by 6/16/2006. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (mb2, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 28 Filed: 6/8/2006, Entered: 6/9/2006, Terminated: 6/12/2006 Terminated:
                                                    MOTION to Amend Schedule re: [25] Order on Motion to Amend Schedule, , filed by USA. Service: 6/7/2006.Response due by 6/26/2006.(mb2, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 27 Filed: 5/31/2006, Entered: 6/5/2006 Response to Cross Motion [Dispositive]
                                                      RESPONSE and reply to [26] CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [21] Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, filed by ROSS L. BAIR, , filed by LYLE K. BAIR. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE]Reply due by 6/12/2006. Service: 5/25/2006.(mb2, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 26 Filed: 5/1/2006, Entered: 5/4/2006 Terminated:
                                                        CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE with separate appendix to [21] Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, filed by ROSS L. BAIR, , filed by USA. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 4/27/2006.Response due by 5/25/2006.(mb2, ) Modified on 5/4/2006 (mb2, ).
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 25 Filed: 4/19/2006, Entered: 4/24/2006 Order on Motion to Amend ScheduleCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER granting [24] Motion for Extension of Time. Cross Motions due by 4/27/2006. Response due by 5/25/2006. Reply due by 6/8/2006. Consolidated Statement of Uncontroverted Facts due by 6/15/2006. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (mb2, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 24 Filed: 4/13/2006, Entered: 4/18/2006, Terminated: 4/19/2006 Terminated:
                                                            MOTION to Amend Schedule re: [23] Order on Motion to Amend Schedule, , filed by USA. Service: 4/13/2006. Response due by 5/1/2006.(mb2, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 23 Filed: 4/4/2006, Entered: 4/6/2006 Order on Motion to Amend ScheduleCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER granting [22] Motion for Extension of Time. Cross Motions due by 4/17/2006. Response due by 5/15/2006. Reply due by 5/29/2006. Consolidated Statement of Uncontroverted Facts due by 6/5/2006. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (mb2, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 22 Filed: 3/30/2006, Entered: 4/3/2006, Terminated: 4/4/2006 Terminated:
                                                                MOTION to Amend Schedule re: [19] Scheduling Order filed by USA. Service: 3/30/06.(dw1)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 21 Filed: 3/29/2006, Entered: 3/30/2006 Terminated:
                                                                  MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment with separate appendix, filed by ROSS L. BAIR. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 3/1/2006. Response due by 4/3/2006.(mb2, ) Modified on 3/30/2006 to correct response date (mb2, ).
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 20 Filed: 3/28/2006, Entered: 3/30/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                    ORDER: Plaintiff's are Ordered to adhere to the briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (mb2, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 19 Filed: 1/24/2006, Entered: 1/27/2006 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER: Dispositive Motion(s) due by 3/1/2006. Cross Motions due by 4/3/2006. Response due by 5/1/2006. Reply due by 5/15/2006. Consolidated Statement of Uncontroverted Facts due by 5/22/2006. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (mb2, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 18 Filed: 1/17/2006, Entered: 1/20/2006 Joint Status Report
                                                                        JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. Service: 1/17/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 17 Filed: 10/4/2005, Entered: 10/6/2005 Order on Motion to Amend ScheduleCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER granting [15] Motion for Extension of Time, granting [15] Motion to Amend responses to First Request for Admissions granting [15] Motion for Leave to File out of time responses to plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents. Discovery due by 12/15/2005. Status Report due by 1/15/2006 Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dw1)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 16 Filed: 9/30/2005, Entered: 10/3/2005 Response to Motion
                                                                            RESPONSE to [15] MOTION to Amend Schedule, MOTION for Leave to File Out of Time Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents, MOTION to Amend Responses to Plaintiff's First Requests for Admissions. filed by ROSS L. BAIR. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Reply due by 10/11/2005. Service: 9/26/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 15 Filed: 9/9/2005, Entered: 9/14/2005, Terminated: 10/4/2005 Terminated:
                                                                              MOTION to Amend Schedule, MOTION for Leave to File Out of Time Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents, MOTION to Amend Responses to Plaintiff's First Requests for Admissions, filed by USA. Service: 9/9/2005. Response due by 9/26/2005. (mb2, )
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 14 Filed: 9/1/2005, Entered: 9/6/2005 Joint Status Report
                                                                                JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. Service: 9/1/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 13 Filed: 8/15/2005, Entered: 8/17/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Thomas Jaeger for USA. Service: 8/15/2005.(dw1)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 6/13/2005, Entered: 6/14/2005 Transcript
                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT (Pg 1-38) of Proceedings held on 5/11/05 before Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (eph, )
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 6/8/2005, Entered: 6/8/2005
                                                                                      Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 6/13/2005. (vp1, )
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 12 Filed: 5/18/2005, Entered: 5/31/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                        ORDER severing plaintiffs' claims and directing the Clerk to treat each of the plaintiffs as separate claims with separate docket numbers (04-1846C through 04-1890C); consolidating the newly created cases with this case; and allowing parties to object to consolidation by 6/1/2005. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dls )
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 11 Filed: 5/12/2005, Entered: 5/16/2005 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 10/1/2005. Status Report due by 9/1/2005. Status Report due by 11/1/2005. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (mb2, )
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 10 Filed: 3/28/2005, Entered: 3/30/2005 Status Conference OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                            STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 5/11/2005 at 02:00 PM before Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (mb2, )
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 9 Filed: 3/11/2005, Entered: 3/14/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                              ORDER : The parties shall notify the Court of proposed status conference dates no later than 4/11/2005. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (mb2, )
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 8 Filed: 3/8/2005, Entered: 3/10/2005 Joint Preliminary Status Report
                                                                                                JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT. Service: 3/8/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 1/18/2005, Entered: 1/21/2005 Answer
                                                                                                  ANSWER to [1] Complaint, by USA.Service: 01/18/05. JPSR due by 3/11/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 6 Filed: 12/21/2004, Entered: 12/29/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER re: This case has been referred for Alternative Dispute Resolution. Counsel is advised that the court is available at any time to discuss the merits of this case. If counsel wishes to meet with the court, they should agree on a time and notify the court. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (dw1)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 12/16/2004, Entered: 12/28/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                      SPECIAL PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dw1)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 12/10/2004, Entered: 12/16/2004 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by William K. Olivier for USA. Service: 12/10/04.(dw1)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 11/19/2004, Entered: 11/23/2004 Notice of Assignment - Auto ADRCourt Filing
                                                                                                          NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. for ADR Pilot proceedings. (lg1, )
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 2 Filed: 11/19/2004, Entered: 11/23/2004 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                            NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (lg1, )
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 11/19/2004, Entered: 11/23/2004 Complaint
                                                                                                              COMPLAINT against USA (AGR) ( Filing fee $150, Receipt number 061773), filed by LYLE K. BAIR, ROSS L. BAIR, BAIR BROTHERS, BAIR FARMS, INC., BERGESON FARMS, INC., CEEKAYDEE FARMS GENERAL PARTNERSHIP, KEITH B. CHILD, CORBETT DRAW FARMS GENERAL PARTNERSHIP, D & D GILBERT FARMS, INC., TOM DOWNS, J. LAMAR GILBERT, DAVID HAMMOND, JERRY HODGES, CHRIS HYER, JOHN HYER, MARK IVERSON, L. SHEFFELS & SONS, INC., LEON R. BAKERS FARMS, LLC,, JERRY C. MILBRANDT, R & J FAMILY FARMS, INC., ALLAN ROBEL, RONALD ROYLANCE FARMS, INC., RANDY ROYLANCE, ROYLANCE COULEE PARTNERSHIP, SBS FARMS, LLC, TRAVIS STEFFLER, PAUL STOKER, STOKROSE FARM AND FEEDLOT, TIM TAYLOR, TRACY LYBBERT FARMS, INC.,.Answer Due by 1/18/2005.(lg1, )
                                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 67 times.

                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                Need Password Help?