CORDICK v. SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:04-vv-01708-UNJ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo DIANE CORDICK, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICES OF JAY A. BANSAL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jay Ankur Bansal +1 480 820 9090 +1 480 831 5966 JayABansal@aol.com
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Vincent James Matanoski +1 202 616 4124 +1 202 616 4310 vincent.matanoski@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 11/29/2004
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 485 - Injury - Hemophilus influenzae
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 300 Vaccine Injury Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Vaccine - Dismissed by Special Master
County None
Terminated 1/21/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 7 Filed: 1/21/2005, Entered: 1/21/2005
JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Vaccine Rule 11(a), that the petition is dismissed without prejudice. (lld, )
    LREF
    Blank 6 Filed: 12/14/2004, Entered: 12/15/2004 DECISION of Special Master
    DECISION Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 12/13/2004, Entered: 12/13/2004
      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master John F. Edwards: Status Conference held on 12/13/04, at 10:30 a.m. (ps2, )
        LREF
        Blank 5 Filed: 12/8/2004, Entered: 12/14/2004 Notice of Appearance/
        NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent James Matanoski for SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 12/08/04.(tjk, )
          LREF
          Blank 4 Filed: 12/8/2004, Entered: 12/14/2004 Terminated:
          MOTION to Dismiss by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.Service: 12/08/04. Response due by 12/27/2004 (tjk, )
            LREF
            Blank 3 Filed: 12/2/2004, Entered: 12/3/2004 Description not available
            STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Initial Status Conference set for 12/13/2004 10:30 AM (EST) before Special Master John F. Edwards. Both parties shall appear by telephone. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
              LREF
              Blank 2 Filed: 11/29/2004, Entered: 11/30/2004 Notice Of Assignment
              NOTICE of Assignment to Special Master John Edwards (tjk, )
                LREF
                Blank 1 Filed: 11/29/2004, Entered: 11/30/2004 Petition
                PETITION against SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $150, Receipt number 061805) [Vaccination date: 12/05/01], filed by DIANE CORDICK.Respondents Report Due by 2/28/2005.(tjk, )
                  LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 94 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?