STARR v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:04-cv-01728-EGB
District Judge Eric G. Bruggink, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo FRANKE C. STARR, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory Thomas Jaeger +1 202 353 7955 +1 202 353 7988 gregory.jaeger@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 12/2/2004
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 134 - Contract - Other
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed
County None
Terminated 12/20/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 6 Filed: 1/6/2005, Entered: 1/11/2005 TranscriptCourt Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on December 16, 2004 before Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (dw1)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 12/23/2004, Entered: 12/23/2004
    Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 1/18/2005. (vp1, )
      LREF
      Blank 5 Filed: 12/20/2004, Entered: 12/20/2004
      JUDGMENT entered, pursunat to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed, without prejudice. (lld, )
        LREF
        Blank 4 Filed: 12/16/2004, Entered: 12/20/2004 Unpublished Opinion/OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER directing the clerk to dismiss plaintiff's complaint without prejudice and to return plaintiff's filing fee. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (lld, )
          LREF
          Blank 3 Filed: 12/10/2004, Entered: 12/16/2004 Notice of Appearance/
          NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Thomas Jaeger for USA Service: 12/10/2004.(lg1, )
            LREF
            Blank 2 Filed: 12/2/2004, Entered: 12/3/2004 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
            NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (lg1, )
              LREF
              Blank 1 Filed: 12/2/2004, Entered: 12/3/2004 Complaint
              COMPLAINT against USA (DOJ) ( Filing fee $150, Receipt number 061831), filed by FRANKE C. STARR.Answer Due by 1/31/2005.(lg1, ).
                LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 122 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?