LECHLITER v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:04-cv-01729-NBF
District Judge Nancy B. Firestone, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo GERALD A. LECHLITER, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert E. Chandler +1 202 514 4678 +1 202 514 8624 robert.chandler@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 12/2/2004
Jury Demand None
Demand $50000
Nature of Suit 352 - Military Pay - Retirement
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County None
Terminated 5/7/2007
Origin 4
Reopened 7/18/2006
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags AUTO, CLOSED
  Entries (105) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 100 Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: 5/8/2007 Stipulation of Dismissal
STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice, filed by all parties. Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii) this day. (bre,)
    LREF
    Blank 99 Filed: 4/23/2007, Entered: 4/23/2007 Court Filing
    ORDER granting [97] Motion to Expedite; granting [98] Motion to Withdraw Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (bre, )
      LREF
      Blank 98 Filed: 4/19/2007, Entered: 4/20/2007 Terminated:
      MOTION to Withdraw [97] MOTION to Expedite, filed by GERALD A. LECHLITER. Service: 4/16/2007.Response due by 5/3/2007.(mb2)
        LREF
        Blank 97 Filed: 4/13/2007, Entered: 4/17/2007, Terminated: 4/23/2007 Terminated:
        MOTION to Expedite, filed by GERALD A. LECHLITER. Service: 4/12/2007.Response due by 4/30/2007.(bre,)
          LREF
          Blank 96 Filed: 4/4/2007, Entered: 4/10/2007 Status Report
          JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. Service: 4/4/2007.(bre, )
            LREF
            Blank 95 Filed: 3/20/2007, Entered: 3/22/2007 Notice of Appearance/
            NOTICE of Appearance by Robert E. Chandler for USA Service: 3/20/2007.(lg1, )
              LREF
              Blank 94 Filed: 3/20/2007, Entered: 3/21/2007 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
              STATUS REPORT ORDERJoint Status Report due by 4/4/2007 Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (bre,)
                LREF
                Blank 93 Filed: 10/5/2006, Entered: 10/6/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER re [89] MOTION to Stay Formal Physical Evalaution Board Proceedings pending the conclusion of the ADR proceedings with ADR Judge Christine Miller. Each party shall file a Status Report within 10 days of the ADR proceedings indicating what issues remains between the parties. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (bre, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 92 Filed: 10/3/2006, Entered: 10/3/2006
                  REPLY to [90] Response to [89] MOTION to Stay Formal Physical Evalaution Board Proceedings , filed by GERALD A. LECHLITER. Service: 10/2/2006.(bre, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 91 Filed: 10/2/2006, Entered: 10/2/2006 Court Filing
                    ADR ORDER:Case retain for a period of thirty days. The parties shall informally report back to the court's law clerk by October 27, 2006, regarding their progress in bringing this matter to an informal resolution.Notice of Compliance due by 10/27/2006. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (lg1, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 90 Filed: 9/26/2006, Entered: 9/28/2006 Response to Motion [Dispositive]
                      RESPONSE to [89] MOTION to Stay Formal Physical Evalaution Board Proceedings , filed by USA.Reply due by 10/13/2006. Service: 9/26/2006.(bre, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 89 Filed: 9/22/2006, Entered: 9/22/2006, Terminated: 5/7/2007 Motion to Stay
                        MOTION to Stay Formal Physical Evalaution Board Proceedings , filed by GERALD A. LECHLITER. Service: 9/21/2006.Response due by 10/10/2006.(mb2, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 88 Filed: 9/11/2006, Entered: 9/12/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER Re: The court is in receipt of plaintiff's letter dated August 31, 2006 indicating that the parties have been in settlement discussions. The court has forwarded plaintiff's letter to ADR Judge Christine Miller for her review and any action she deems appropriate. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (bre, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 87 Filed: 8/1/2006, Entered: 8/1/2006 Court Filing
                            ORDER denying [85] Motion, denying [86] Motion to Stay Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (bre,)
                              LREF
                              Blank 86 Filed: 7/31/2006, Entered: 8/1/2006 Terminated:
                              MOTION to Stay further proceedings pending interlocutory appeal filed by GERALD A. LECHLITER. Service: 7/29/2006.Response due by 8/17/2006.(hw1, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 85 Filed: 7/31/2006, Entered: 8/1/2006, Terminated: 8/1/2006 Terminated:
                                MOTION to CERTIFY for an INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL filed by GERALD A. LECHLITER. Service: 7/29/2006.Response due by 8/17/2006.(hw1, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 84 Filed: 7/18/2006, Entered: 7/18/2006 Court Filing
                                  ORDER granting in part and denying in part [72] Motion for Reconsideration - Rule 59(a); VACATING OPINION AND JUDGMENT OF APRIL 25, 2006;and REMANDING for 6 months to the Secretary of the Army. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (bre,)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 7/18/2006, Entered: 7/18/2006
                                    Administrative Record Returned to defendant's counsel for return to agency pursuant to RCFC 52.2(a)(4). (dls )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 83 Filed: 7/6/2006, Entered: 7/10/2006 Supplemental Brief
                                      SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re: [72] Motion for Reconsideration - Rule 59(a), filed by GERALD A. LECHLITER. Service: 6/28/2006.(mb2, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 82 Filed: 7/6/2006, Entered: 7/10/2006 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                        ORDER granting [81] Motion for Leave to File Supplement. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (mb2, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 81 Filed: 6/29/2006, Entered: 7/5/2006, Terminated: 7/6/2006 Terminated:
                                          MOTION for Leave to File Supplement to Reply to Motion for Reconsideration , filed by GERALD A. LECHLITER. Service: 6/28/2006.Response due by 7/17/2006.(mb2, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 80 Filed: 6/27/2006, Entered: 6/29/2006 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                            SCHEDULING ORDER:Reply not to exceed 13 pages due by 7/7/2006. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (mb2, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 79 Filed: 6/22/2006, Entered: 6/23/2006 Response to Motion
                                              RESPONSE to [72] MOTION for Reconsideration - Rule 59(a) re [67] Judgment , filed by USA.Reply due by 7/6/2006. Service: 6/22/2006.(mb2, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 78 Filed: 6/9/2006, Entered: 6/12/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                                ORDER granting [76] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re [72] MOTION for Reconsideration - Rule 59(a) re [67] Judgment,Response due by 6/22/2006. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (mb2, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 76 Filed: 6/6/2006, Entered: 6/8/2006, Terminated: 6/9/2006 Terminated:
                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time until 6/22/2006 to File Response as to [72] MOTION for Reconsideration - Rule 59(a) re [67] Judgment , filed by USA. Service: 6/6/2006.Response due by 6/23/2006.(mb2, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 77 Filed: 6/2/2006, Entered: 6/8/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER granting [75] MOTION to Supplement Pleadings - Rule 15(d) re: [72] MOTION for Reconsideration - Rule 59(a) re [67] Judgment filed by GERALD A. LECHLITER, Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (lld, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 75 Filed: 6/1/2006, Entered: 6/7/2006, Terminated: 6/2/2006 Terminated:
                                                      MOTION to Supplement Pleadings - Rule 15(d) re: [72] MOTION for Reconsideration - Rule 59(a) re [67] Judgment , filed by GERALD A. LECHLITER. Service: 5/31/2006.Response due by 6/19/2006.(mb2, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 74 Filed: 5/26/2006, Entered: 6/1/2006 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER: re MOTION for Reconsideration. Response due by 6/6/2006. Reply due by 6/12/2006. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (mb2, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 73 Filed: 5/10/2006, Entered: 5/15/2006 Order on Motion to Amend/CorrectCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER finding as moot [71] Motion to Amend/Correct transcript of Oral Argument. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (dw1)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 72 Filed: 5/8/2006, Entered: 5/15/2006, Terminated: 7/18/2006 Terminated:
                                                            MOTION for Reconsideration - Rule 59(a) re [67] Judgment , filed by GERALD A. LECHLITER. Service: 5/6/2006.(mb2, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 70 Filed: 5/4/2006, Entered: 5/4/2006 Court Filing
                                                              [Revised and Corrected Copy] TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-50) held on April 12, 2006 before Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (dw1)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 71 Filed: 5/3/2006, Entered: 5/9/2006 Terminated:
                                                                MOTION to Amend/Correct [69] Transcript , filed by GERALD A. LECHLITER. Service: 5/2/2006.Response due by 5/19/2006.(mb2, ) Modified on 5/10/2006 (mb2, ).
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 68 Filed: 4/27/2006, Entered: 5/2/2006 Order Returning Document UnfiledCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER RETURNING UNFILED: Plaintiff's Motion and Brief to Supplement the Administrative Record. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (mb2, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 69 Filed: 4/26/2006, Entered: 5/3/2006 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (50 pages) held on April 12, 2006 before Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (dw1)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 67 Filed: 4/25/2006, Entered: 4/25/2006
                                                                      JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, dismissing the complaint. Each party is to bear its own costs. (dls)VACATED PER ORDER OF JULY 18, 2006. Modified on 7/18/2006 (bre, ).
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 66 Filed: 4/25/2006, Entered: 4/25/2006 Court Filing
                                                                        PUBLISHED OPINION DENYING defendant's motion to dismiss, in part, for lack of subject matter jurisdiction; GRANTING defendant's motion to dismiss in part, for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted; GRANTING defendant's motion for judgment upon the administrative record; DENYING plaintiff's cross-motion for judgment upon the administrative record; and DENYING plaintiff's motion for discovery, supplementation of the administrative record, and a hearing. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (dls ) VACATED PER ORDER OF JULY 18, 2006. Modified on 7/18/2006 (dls, ).
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 4/12/2006, Entered: 4/12/2006
                                                                          Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 4/27/2006. (vp1, )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 65 Filed: 4/7/2006, Entered: 4/12/2006 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER denying [64] Motion to reschedule oral argument and denying [64] Motion to Expedite. Oral Argument set for 4/12/2006 10:30 AM before Judge Nancy B. Firestone. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (dw1)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 64 Filed: 4/7/2006, Entered: 4/12/2006, Terminated: 4/7/2006 Terminated:
                                                                              MOTION to reschedule the oral argument and MOTION to Expedite filed by USA. Service: 4/6/06.(dw1)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 63 Filed: 4/3/2006, Entered: 4/5/2006 Order Setting Oral Argument/Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion [27] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record, [36] CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE: Oral Argument set for 4/12/2006 at 10:30 AM before Judge Nancy B. Firestone. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (mb2, )
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 62 Filed: 2/27/2006, Entered: 3/2/2006 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re [58] MOTION to Strike [55] Response , filed by USA. Service: 2/27/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 61 Filed: 2/21/2006, Entered: 2/23/2006 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re [52] CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [46] Motion to Strike filed by USA, filed by GERALD A. LECHLITER. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 2/13/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 60 Filed: 2/14/2006, Entered: 2/21/2006 Response to Motion
                                                                                      RESPONSE to [58] MOTION to Strike [55] Response , filed by GERALD A. LECHLITER. Reply due by 2/27/2006. Service: 2/13/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 59 Filed: 2/9/2006, Entered: 2/13/2006 Order on Motion to Amend/CorrectCourt Filing
                                                                                        ORDER granting [56] Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (mb2, )
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 58 Filed: 2/6/2006, Entered: 2/8/2006 Terminated:
                                                                                          MOTION to Strike [55] Response , filed by USA. Service: 2/6/2006. Response due by 2/23/2006. (mb2, )
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 57 Filed: 2/6/2006, Entered: 2/8/2006 Response to Cross Motion
                                                                                            RESPONSE and reply to [52] CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [46] Motion to Strike, filed by USA. Reply due by 2/21/2006. Service: 2/6/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 56 Filed: 2/2/2006, Entered: 2/6/2006, Terminated: 2/9/2006 Terminated:
                                                                                              MOTION to Correct [55] Response , filed by GERALD A. LECHLITER. Service: 1/30/2006. Response due by 2/16/2006. (mb2, )
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 55 Filed: 1/25/2006, Entered: 1/30/2006 Response
                                                                                                RESPONSE to [48] Statement of Facts , filed by GERALD A. LECHLITER. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 1/20/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 54 Filed: 1/25/2006, Entered: 1/30/2006 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re [36] CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [27] Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(1), Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(1), Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record, filed by GERALD A. LECHLITER. Service: 1/20/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 53 Filed: 1/25/2006, Entered: 1/30/2006 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER granting [51] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (mb2, )
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 52 Filed: 1/23/2006, Entered: 1/25/2006 Terminated:
                                                                                                      CROSS MOTION for Leave to Supplement the Administrative and RESPONSE to [46] Motion to Strike, filed by GERALD A. LECHLITER. Service: 1/20/2006. Response due by 2/6/2006. (mb2, )
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 51 Filed: 1/23/2006, Entered: 1/25/2006, Terminated: 1/25/2006 Terminated:
                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit of Reply by 10 pages , filed by GERALD A. LECHLITER. Service: 1/20/2006. Response due by 2/9/2006. (mb2, )
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 50 Filed: 12/16/2005, Entered: 12/23/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER granting [49] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant's motion to strike. Response due by 2/1/2006. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (vro, )
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 49 Filed: 12/12/2005, Entered: 12/16/2005, Terminated: 12/16/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time until 2/1/2005 to File Response as to [46] MOTION to Strike, filed by GERALD A. LECHLITER. Service: 12/9/2005. Response due by 12/27/2005. (mb2, )
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 48 Filed: 12/1/2005, Entered: 12/6/2005 Statement of Facts
                                                                                                              COUNTER STATEMENT OF FACTS re: [28] Statement of Facts, filed by USA. Service: 11/23/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 47 Filed: 12/1/2005, Entered: 12/6/2005 Response to Cross Motion
                                                                                                                RESPONSE and reply to [36] CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [27] Motion to Dismiss, filed by USA. Reply due by 12/12/2005. Service: 11/25/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 46 Filed: 12/1/2005, Entered: 12/6/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                  MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Declaration re [36] CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [27] Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(1), filed by USA. Service: 11/23/2005. Response due by 12/12/2005. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 45 Filed: 12/1/2005, Entered: 12/6/2005 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [44] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 44 Filed: 11/23/2005, Entered: 11/29/2005, Terminated: 12/1/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit of Reply Brief by 29 pages , filed by USA. Service: 11/23/2005. Response due by 12/12/2005. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 43 Filed: 11/10/2005, Entered: 11/15/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [41] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re [36] CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [27] Motion to Dismiss. Reply due by 11/23/2005. Surreply due by 2/1/2006. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 42 Filed: 11/7/2005, Entered: 11/9/2005 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to [41] MOTION for Extension of Time until 11/23/2005 to File Response or Reply as to [27] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record, filed by GERALD A. LECHLITER. Reply due by 11/21/2005. Service: 11/5/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 41 Filed: 11/2/2005, Entered: 11/4/2005, Terminated: 11/10/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time until 11/23/2005 to File Response or Reply as to [27] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record, filed by USA. Service: 11/2/2005. Response due by 11/21/2005. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 40 Filed: 10/5/2005, Entered: 10/6/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [39] Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply by November 2, 2005 Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (vro, )
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 10/5/2005, Entered: 10/6/2005 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                                                                                                Set Deadlines/Hearings: . Reply due by 11/2/2005. (vro, )
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 39 Filed: 10/3/2005, Entered: 10/4/2005, Terminated: 10/5/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time until November 2, 2005 to File Reply as to [36] CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [27] Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(1), Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(1), Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(6), Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(6), Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record, filed by USA, filed by USA.Service: 10/3/2005. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 38 Filed: 9/12/2005, Entered: 9/14/2005 Proposed Additional Facts
                                                                                                                                    PROPOSED ADDITIONAL FACTS re: [36] Cross Motion, filed by GERALD A. LECHLITER. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 9/2/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 37 Filed: 9/12/2005, Entered: 9/14/2005 Statement of Facts
                                                                                                                                      COUNTER STATEMENT OF FACTS re: [28] Statement of Facts, filed by GERALD A. LECHLITER. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 9/2/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 36 Filed: 9/12/2005, Entered: 9/14/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                        CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [27] Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(1), Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(6), Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record, filed by GERALD A. LECHLITER. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 9/2/2005. Dispositive Motion Response due by 10/3/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 35 Filed: 8/25/2005, Entered: 8/29/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [34] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re [27] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b), denying [34] Motion For Assignment to a Pro Bono Attorney, granting [34] Motion for Reconsideration. Response, not to exceed eighty (80) pages, due by 9/6/2005. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 34 Filed: 8/1/2005, Entered: 8/2/2005, Terminated: 8/25/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time until 9/5/2005 to File Response as to [27] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1), MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record, MOTION Assignment from the Pro Bono Program, MOTION for Reconsideration re [33] Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. filed by GERALD A. LECHLITER.Service: 7/30/2005. Response due: 8/17/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 33 Filed: 7/25/2005, Entered: 7/27/2005 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting in part and denying in part [31] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Accordingly, plaintiff's brief, due 8/5/2005, shall not exceed 75 pages. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 32 Filed: 7/15/2005, Entered: 7/19/2005 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER: Re: Motion to Dismiss. Response and any request for supplementation of the Administrative Record due by 8/5/2005. Reply due by 8/22/2005. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 31 Filed: 7/14/2005, Entered: 7/18/2005, Terminated: 7/25/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit, filed by GERALD A. LECHLITER. Service: 7/11/2005. Response due by 7/28/2005. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 30 Filed: 7/11/2005, Entered: 7/13/2005 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER: re: [27]MOTION to Dismiss. Dispositive Motion Response including any request for supplementation of the Administrative Record due by 8/2/2005. Reply due by 8/17/2005. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 29 Filed: 7/5/2005, Entered: 7/7/2005 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [25] Motion for Leave to Amend the Administrative Record. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 28 Filed: 7/5/2005, Entered: 7/7/2005 Statement of Facts
                                                                                                                                                        STATEMENT OF FACTS re: [27] Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(1), Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(1), Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(6), Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(6), Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record, filed by USA. Service: 7/5/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 27 Filed: 7/5/2005, Entered: 7/7/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss, in part, pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1), MOTION to Dismiss, in part, pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6), MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record with regard to the remainder of the complaint, filed by USA. Service: 7/5/2005. Dispositive Motion Response due by 8/5/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 26 Filed: 6/29/2005, Entered: 6/30/2005 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER:Answer Due by 7/5/2005. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 25 Filed: 6/29/2005, Entered: 6/30/2005, Terminated: 7/5/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to Amend the Administrative Record, filed by USA. Service: 6/29/2005. Response due by 7/18/2005. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 24 Filed: 6/24/2005, Entered: 6/27/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [22] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Answer Due by 7/15/2005. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 23 Filed: 6/22/2005, Entered: 6/24/2005 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to [22] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint until 7/5/2005, filed by GERALD A. LECHLITER. Reply due by 7/5/2005. Service: 6/21/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 22 Filed: 6/20/2005, Entered: 6/22/2005, Terminated: 6/24/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint until 7/5/2005, filed by USA. Service: 6/20/2005. Response due by 7/7/2005. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 5/24/2005, Entered: 5/24/2005
                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT(Pg. 1-42) of Proceedings held on 4/22/05 before Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (eph, )
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 21 Filed: 5/18/2005, Entered: 5/27/2005 Administrative Record
                                                                                                                                                                        ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD (four volumes), filed by USA. Service: 5/18/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 20 Filed: 4/25/2005, Entered: 4/27/2005 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER: Defendant's Reply due by 8/1/2005. Plaintiff's Response due by 7/18/2005. Administrative Record due 5/18/2005. Defendant's Motion(s) due by 6/20/2005. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 19 Filed: 4/21/2005, Entered: 4/25/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File An Addendum to the Joint Status Report, and MOTION to Initiate Discovery, filed by GERALD A. LECHLITER. Service: 4/20/2005. Response due by 5/9/2005. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 18 Filed: 4/19/2005, Entered: 4/21/2005 Status Conference OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 4/22/2005 at 2:00 PM before Judge Nancy B. Firestone. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 17 Filed: 4/15/2005, Entered: 4/19/2005 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 4/15/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 16 Filed: 4/15/2005, Entered: 4/19/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint Status Report Input and MOTION to Initiate Discovery, filed by GERALD A. LECHLITER. Service: 4/14/2005. Response due by 5/2/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 15 Filed: 4/13/2005, Entered: 4/15/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION For the Clerk to Declare Defendant in Default, filed by GERALD A. LECHLITER. Service: 4/7/2005. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Response due by 4/25/2005.(mb2, ) Modified on 4/15/2005 to correct response due date (dw1).
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 4/13/2005, Entered: 4/15/2005 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                                                                                                                                                      Set Deadlines/Hearings: Response due by 4/25/2005. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 14 Filed: 4/6/2005, Entered: 4/8/2005 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to [7] MOTION to Stay the Proceedings filed by GERALD A. LECHLITER. Service: 3/9/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 13 Filed: 4/6/2005, Entered: 4/8/2005 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [11] Motion for Leave to File Plaintiff's response brief in opposition to Defendant's Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 11 Filed: 3/25/2005, Entered: 3/28/2005, Terminated: 4/6/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's response brief in opposition to Defendant's Motion to Stay filed by GERALD A. LECHLITER.Service: 3/24/2005. Response due by 4/11/2005 (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 12 Filed: 3/24/2005, Entered: 3/28/2005 Order on Motion for ReconsiderationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying as moot [10] Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 9 Filed: 3/17/2005, Entered: 3/21/2005 Order Returning Document UnfiledCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER RETURNING Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Stay Proceedings. The Court's March 4, 2005 Order is Amended and the Court directs the parties to file a Joint Status Report by 4/15/2005. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 10 Filed: 3/16/2005, Entered: 3/21/2005, Terminated: 3/24/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Reconsideration re [8] Order on Motion to Stay filed by GERALD A. LECHLITER.Service: 3/15/2005. Response due by 4/1/2005. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 8 Filed: 3/4/2005, Entered: 3/9/2005 Order on Motion to StayCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [7] Motion to Stay. Status Report due by 5/3/2005. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 7 Filed: 2/23/2005, Entered: 2/25/2005, Terminated: 3/4/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Stay the Proceedings by USA.Service: 2/23/2005. Response due by 3/14/2005. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 6 Filed: 2/3/2005, Entered: 2/4/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [5] Motion for Extension of Time.Response due by 3/2/2005. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 5 Filed: 1/31/2005, Entered: 2/1/2005, Terminated: 2/3/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time until 3/2/05 to Respond to the Complaint by USA.Service: 01/31/05. Response due by 2/17/2005 (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 4 Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: 12/23/2004 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas David Dinackus for USA. Service: 12/17/04.(dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 3 Filed: 12/2/2004, Entered: 12/3/2004 Notice of Assignment - Auto ADRCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Christine O.C. Miller for ADR Pilot proceedings. (lg1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 2 Filed: 12/2/2004, Entered: 12/3/2004 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (lg1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 12/2/2004, Entered: 12/3/2004 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT against USA (ARM) ( Filing fee $150, Receipt number 061832), filed by GERALD A. LECHLITER.Answer Due by 1/31/2005.(lg1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 110 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?