THOMAS et al v. SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:04-vv-01730-UNJ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo LEAH THOMAS, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by ANAPOL, SCHWARTZ, WEISS, COHAN, FELDMAN & SMALLEY, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space LAWRENCE R. COHAN +1 856 482 1600 lcohan@anapolschwartz.com
No Logo Michael, Thomas, Petitioner
Unknown Role, H Power Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by ANAPOL, SCHWARTZ, WEISS, COHAN, FELDMAN & SMALLEY, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space LAWRENCE R. COHAN +1 856 482 1600 lcohan@anapolschwartz.com
No Logo LYON & LYON, Petitioner
Officially listed as "WILLIAM THOMAS"

Toggle Switch Represented by ANAPOL, SCHWARTZ, WEISS, COHAN, FELDMAN & SMALLEY, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space LAWRENCE R. COHAN +1 856 482 1600 lcohan@anapolschwartz.com
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Patrick Milmoe +1 202 616 4125 mike.milmoe@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 12/2/2004
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 483 - Death - Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 300 Vaccine Injury Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Vaccine - Judgment in Lump Sum
County None
Terminated 2/15/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (59) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 48 Filed: 6/20/2007, Entered: 6/20/2007
JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Vaccine Rule 11(a), that petitioners are awarded attorney's fees and costs in the amount of $50,000.00, in addition to the February 15, 2007 judgment of compensation. This award shall be in the form of a check made jointly payable to petitioners and Mr. Lawrence Cohan in the amount of $50,000.00. (lld)
    LREF
    Blank 47 Filed: 5/14/2007, Entered: 5/15/2007 DECISION of Special Master - Fees
    DECISION on Attorney's Fees and Costs Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (tjk, )
      LREF
      Blank 46 Filed: 5/9/2007, Entered: 5/11/2007 notice of filing
      NOTICE OF FILING Statement re:General Order#9. by LEAH THOMAS, WILLIAM THOMAS, MICHAEL THOMAS. Service: 4/30/07.(Neal, Alonzo)
        LREF
        Blank 45 Filed: 4/13/2007, Entered: 4/19/2007 Terminated:
        MOTION for Attorney Fees, filed by LEAH THOMAS, WILLIAM THOMAS, MICHAEL THOMAS. Service: 3/29/07.Response due by 4/16/2007. (tjk, )
          LREF
          Blank 44 Filed: 3/27/2007, Entered: 4/4/2007 Petitioner's Election to Accept Judgment
          Petitioner's Election to Accept [42] Judgment. Service: 3/19/07.(tjk, )
            LREF
            Blank 43 Filed: 2/22/2007, Entered: 2/25/2007 Scheduling Order
            SCHEDULING ORDER: Petitioner shall file a Motion for Fees and Costs due by 11/9/2007, or they shall be deemed waived. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (tjk, )
              LREF
              Blank 42 Filed: 2/15/2007, Entered: 2/15/2007
              JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Vaccine Rule 11(a), that petitioners are awarded compensation in the amount of $62,500.00 in the form of a check made payable to petitioners, as administrators of Michael's Estate. (lld, )
                LREF
                Blank 41 Filed: 1/8/2007, Entered: 1/11/2007 DECISION of Special Master
                DECISION Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (tjk, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 40 Filed: 12/21/2006, Entered: 12/25/2006 Stipulation
                  STIPULATION, filed by LEAH THOMAS, WILLIAM THOMAS, MICHAEL THOMAS, SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (tjk, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 39 Filed: 11/13/2006, Entered: 11/15/2006 Status Report
                    STATUS REPORT, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 11/13/06.(tjk, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 38 Filed: 7/28/2006, Entered: 8/1/2006 15-Week Stipulation Order
                      15-Week STIPULATION ORDER: Respondent shall, within 15 weeks, send petitioner(s) the joint stipulation and file a status report. Within 30 days after the receipt of the stipulation, the petitioner(s) shall file a status report. Within 15 days after receiving the stipulation from petitioner(s), the respondent shall file the signed stipulation.Respondents Status Report due by 11/10/2006. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (tjk, )
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 6/29/2006, Entered: 6/29/2006
                        Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 7/28/2006. (vp1, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 37 Filed: 6/28/2006, Entered: 7/1/2006 Order
                          ORDER re At the parties' joint request, the telephonic evidentiary hearing scheduled for 6/28/06 is hereby CANCELLED. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (tjk, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 36 Filed: 6/27/2006, Entered: 7/1/2006 Order
                            ORDER re The prehearing telephonic status conference was held on 6/26/06. During the conference call, the undersigned encouraged the parties to consider settling this case. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (tjk, )
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 6/27/2006, Entered: 6/27/2006
                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Laura D. Millman : Telephonic Status Conference held on June 26, 2006. (tlj, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 35 Filed: 5/24/2006, Entered: 5/25/2006 Order
                                ORDER GRANTING PETITIONERS' MOTION TO CHANGE ATTORNEY OF RECORD. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (tjk, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 34 Filed: 5/23/2006, Entered: 5/25/2006 Terminated:
                                  MOTION to Substitute Attorney Lawrence R. Cohan in place of Heather J. Lipson , filed by LEAH THOMAS, WILLIAM THOMAS, MICHAEL THOMAS. Service: 5/11/06. (tjk, ) Modified on 5/25/2006 (tjk, ).
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 5/23/2006, Entered: 5/25/2006 Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                    ***Attorney Lawrence R. Cohan for LEAH THOMAS and WILLIAM THOMAS added. Attorney Heather Joy Lipson terminated. (tjk, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 33 Filed: 3/23/2006, Entered: 3/27/2006 Prehearing Order
                                      PREHEARING ORDER: Prehearing Submissions due by 6/16/2006. Hearing set for 6/28/2006 01:00 PM before Special Master Laura D. Millman. Prehearing Conference set for 6/26/2006 10:30 AM before Special Master Laura D. Millman. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (tjk, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 32 Filed: 3/15/2006, Entered: 3/17/2006 Terminated:
                                        MOTION to Substitute Attorney Lawrence R. Cohan in place of Heather J. Lipson , filed by LEAH THOMAS, WILLIAM THOMAS, MICHAEL THOMAS. [Filed by leave of the Special Master] Service: 2/28/06. (tjk, ). Modified on 5/22/2006 (tjk, ).
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 31 Filed: 2/13/2006, Entered: 2/15/2006 Order
                                          ORDER re At petitioner's request the hearing scheduled for 2/16/06 is cancelled. The parties shall telephone the undersigned's law clerk by 3/10/06 with a new hearing date. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (tjk, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 30 Filed: 2/10/2006, Entered: 2/14/2006 Prehearing Submissions
                                            PREHEARING SUBMISSIONS by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 2/10/06.(tjk, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 29 Filed: 2/6/2006, Entered: 2/9/2006 Order
                                              ORDER re. If petitioners will be represented at the hearing by Larry Cohan, petitioners should file a Notice of Appearance that Mr.Cohan and not Ms. Lipson is their new counsel. The parties shall consider settlement in this case. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (tjk, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 2/6/2006, Entered: 2/6/2006
                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Laura D. Millman : Telephone Conference held on February 6, 2006. (tlj, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 28 Filed: 2/3/2006, Entered: 2/7/2006 notice of filing
                                                  NOTICE OF FILING [Disputed issues to be raised at the entitlement hearing] by LEAH THOMAS, WILLIAM THOMAS, MICHAEL THOMAS. Service: 2/02/06.(tjk, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 27 Filed: 2/3/2006, Entered: 2/7/2006 Witness List
                                                    NOTICE OF FILING: Witness List, filed by LEAH THOMAS, WILLIAM THOMAS, MICHAEL THOMAS. Service: 2/02/06.(tjk, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 26 Filed: 1/27/2006, Entered: 1/31/2006 Prehearing Order
                                                      PREHEARING ORDER:Prehearing Submissions due by 2/3/2006. Hearing set for 2/16/2006 10:00 AM before Special Master Laura D. Millman. Prehearing Conference set for 2/6/2006 10:30 AM before Special Master Laura D. Millman. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (tjk, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 25 Filed: 1/26/2006, Entered: 1/30/2006 Order
                                                        ORDER. The undersigned submits Court Exhibit #1 in this action. [C.Ex. #1 Medical literature] Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (tjk, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 24 Filed: 12/20/2005, Entered: 12/30/2005 notice of filing
                                                          NOTICE OF FILING photograph by LEAH THOMAS, WILLIAM THOMAS, MICHAEL THOMAS. Service: 12/20/05.(jat, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 23 Filed: 12/7/2005, Entered: 12/9/2005 Affidavit
                                                            AFFIDAVIT re [22] Order, by LEAH THOMAS, WILLIAM THOMAS, MICHAEL THOMAS. Service: 12/06/05.(tjk, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 22 Filed: 11/22/2005, Entered: 11/29/2005 Order
                                                              ORDER re Petitioner shall file a supplemental affidavit from Mrs. Thomas due by 12/09/05. The parties shall select a date for a telephonic hearing and notify the undersigned's law clerk by 12/09/05. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (tjk, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank -- Filed: 11/22/2005, Entered: 11/22/2005
                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Laura D. Millman : Telephone Conference held on November 22, 2005. (tlj, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 21 Filed: 11/8/2005, Entered: 11/9/2005 Description not available
                                                                  ORDER: The undersigned has advised the parties to read Williams v. Sec'y of HHS, No. 00-123V, 2002 WL 1488750 (Fed. Cl. Spec. Mstr. June 20, 2002). Telephonic Status Conference set for 11/21/2005 02:30 PM (EST) before Special Master Laura D. Millman. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (tjk, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 11/7/2005, Entered: 11/7/2005
                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Laura D. Millman : Telephone Conference held on November 7, 2005. (tlj, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 20 Filed: 11/3/2005, Entered: 11/7/2005 Description not available
                                                                      STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference reset for 11/7/2005 11:30 AM (EST) before Special Master Laura D. Millman. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (tjk, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 19 Filed: 10/21/2005, Entered: 10/27/2005 Expert Report
                                                                        NOTICE OF FILIING: EXPERT REPORT of Enid Gilbert-Barness, M.D. (Ex. no. C) filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 10/21/05.(tjk, )
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 18 Filed: 10/3/2005, Entered: 10/4/2005 Expert Report
                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT of Dr. John J. Shane, M.D. (Ex. no. 13) filed by LEAH THOMAS, WILLIAM THOMAS, MICHAEL THOMAS. Service: 9/30/05.(tjk, )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 17 Filed: 9/7/2005, Entered: 9/8/2005 Description not available
                                                                            STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 11/2/2005 at 10:30 AM before Special Master Laura D. Millman. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (mb2, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 9/6/2005, Entered: 9/6/2005
                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Laura D. Millman : Telephone Conference held on September 6, 2005. (tlj, )
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 16 Filed: 9/2/2005, Entered: 9/7/2005 Description not available
                                                                                STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference set for 9/6/2005 02:30 PM (EDT) before Special Master Laura D. Millman. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (tjk, )
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 15 Filed: 8/26/2005, Entered: 9/1/2005 Respondent's Report
                                                                                  Respondent's Report filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.Service: 8/26/05. (tjk, )
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 14 Filed: 7/14/2005, Entered: 7/26/2005 Expert Report
                                                                                    SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT of Robert L. Geggel, M.D. (Ex. no. 12) filed by LEAH THOMAS, WILLIAM THOMAS, MICHAEL THOMAS. Service: 7/12/05.(tjk, )
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 13 Filed: 7/12/2005, Entered: 7/14/2005 Scheduling Order
                                                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER: Respondent shall file a Rule 4(b) Report and expert report and CV by 8/26/05. Telephonic Conference set for 9/6/2005 11:30 AM (EDT) before Special Master Laura D. Millman. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (tjk, )
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 7/12/2005, Entered: 7/14/2005 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                                                        Set Deadlines/Hearings: .Respondents Report Due by 8/26/2005. (tjk, )
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 7/12/2005, Entered: 7/12/2005
                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Laura D. Millman : Telephone Conference held on July 12, 2005. (tlj, )
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 12 Filed: 6/30/2005, Entered: 7/1/2005 Expert Report
                                                                                            EXPERT REPORT of John J. Shane, M.D. (Ex. no. 11) filed by LEAH THOMAS, WILLIAM THOMAS, MICHAEL THOMAS. Service: 6/29/05.(tjk, )
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 11 Filed: 5/13/2005, Entered: 5/17/2005 Scheduling Order
                                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER: Petitioner's motion for an extention of time of 45 days in which to file the autopsy slides is granted. Status Conference reset for 7/12/2005 11:00 AM (EST) before Special Master Laura D. Millman. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (tjk, )
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 10 Filed: 4/21/2005, Entered: 4/21/2005
                                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER: As soon as possible, petitioners shall file the pediatric pathology addendum report. Supplemental Expert Medical Report due by 5/20/2005. Status Conference set for 5/25/2005 at 11:00 AM before Special Master Laura D. Millman. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (mb2, )
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 9 Filed: 4/21/2005, Entered: 4/21/2005
                                                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING: Final Pathology Speciman Report by LEAH THOMAS, WILLIAM THOMAS, MICHAEL THOMAS. Service: 4/20/05.(tjk, )
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 4/20/2005, Entered: 4/20/2005
                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Laura D. Millman : Telephone Conference held on April 20, 2005. (tlj, )
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 8 Filed: 4/7/2005, Entered: 4/11/2005 Expert Report
                                                                                                      EXPERT REPORT of #8- Report and Curriculum Vitae of Robert L. Geggel, M.D. Exhibit #9- Report and Curriculum Vitae of John J. Shane, M.D. filed by LEAH THOMAS, WILLIAM THOMAS, MICHAEL THOMAS. Service: 4/06/05.(tjk, )
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 7 Filed: 3/11/2005, Entered: 3/15/2005 Scheduling Order
                                                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER: Petitioners' oral motion for an extention of time to file an Expert Report is granted. Petitioners shall file Expert Report and accompanying CV due by 4/7/2005. Status Conference set for 4/20/2005 10:30 AM (EST) before Special Master Laura D. Millman. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (tjk, )
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 6 Filed: 2/23/2005, Entered: 2/28/2005 notice of filing
                                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING Complaint Report from the Marcus Hook Police Department by LEAH THOMAS, WILLIAM THOMAS, MICHAEL THOMAS. Service: 2/22/05.(tjk, )
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 5 Filed: 2/2/2005, Entered: 2/7/2005 Scheduling Order
                                                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER: Petitioners shall file all available medical records, any available police or paramedic reports, the pediatric pathology report addendum report mentioned in Exhibit 6, and all available medical expert reports and accompanying cvs due by 3/18/2005. Status Conference set for 3/24/2005 10:30 AM (EST) before Special Master Laura D. Millman. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (tjk, )
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 2/1/2005, Entered: 2/1/2005
                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Laura D. Millman : Telephone Conference held on February 1, 2004. (tlj, )
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 1/18/2005, Entered: 1/21/2005 Description not available
                                                                                                                ORDER:The Initial Status Conference is set for 2/1/2005 11:30 AM (EST) before Special Master Laura D. Millman. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 12/16/2004, Entered: 12/22/2004 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Patrick Milmoe for SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 12/16/04.(tjk, )
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 12/2/2004, Entered: 12/6/2004 Notice Of Assignment
                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Assignment to Special Master Laura Millman (tjk, )
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 12/2/2004, Entered: 12/6/2004 Petition
                                                                                                                      PETITION against SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES [Filed with Exhibits #1-6] ( Filing fee $150, Receipt number 061833) [Vaccination date: 2/11/03], filed by LEAH THOMAS, MICHAEL THOMAS, WILLIAM THOMAS.Respondents Report Due by 3/2/2005.(tjk, )
                                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 145 times.

                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?