NOYAKUK et al v. SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:04-vv-01772-UNJ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo MCKENZY ABLOWALUK, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Merdes & Merdes, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ward M. Merdes +1 907 452 5400 +1 907 452 8879 ward@merdes.com
No Logo TANYA NOYAKUK, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Merdes & Merdes, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ward M. Merdes +1 907 452 5400 +1 907 452 8879 ward@merdes.com
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Vincent James Matanoski +1 202 616 4124 +1 202 616 4310 vincent.matanoski@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 12/15/2004
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 483 - Death - Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 300 Vaccine Injury Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Vaccine - Judgment in Lump Sum
County None
Terminated 7/22/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (31) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 30 Filed: 9/30/2005, Entered: 9/30/2005
JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Vaccine Rule 11(a), that petitioner is awarded attorney's fees and costs in the amount of $15,323.55, in addition to the July 22, 2005 judgment of compensation. Ms. Noyakuk's attorney of record, Ward M. Merdes, Esq. may collect $15,323.55 from Ms. Noyakuk. (lld, )
    LREF
    Blank 29 Filed: 8/26/2005, Entered: 9/1/2005 DECISION of Special Master - Fees
    DECISION on Attorney's Fees and Costs Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
      LREF
      Blank 28 Filed: 8/24/2005, Entered: 8/26/2005 Joint Status Report
      JOINT STATUS REPORT by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 8/24/05.(tjk, )
        LREF
        Blank 27 Filed: 8/4/2005, Entered: 8/10/2005 Petitioner's Election to Accept Judgment
        Petitioner's Election to Accept [26] Judgment. Service: 8/01/05.(tjk, )
          LREF
          Blank 26 Filed: 7/22/2005, Entered: 7/22/2005
          JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Vaccine Rule 11(a), awarding petitioner compensation in the amount of $250,000. (dls )
            LREF
            Blank 25 Filed: 7/20/2005, Entered: 7/22/2005 Notice Not to Seek Review
            JOINT NOTICE Not to Seek Review by TANYA NOYAKUK, MCKENZY ABLOWALUK, SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES re [24] DECISION of Special Master. (tjk, )
              LREF
              Blank 24 Filed: 6/30/2005, Entered: 7/1/2005 DECISION of Special Master
              DECISION Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                LREF
                Blank 23 Filed: 6/29/2005, Entered: 7/1/2005 Respondent's Report
                Respondent's Report filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.Service: 6/29/05. (tjk, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 22 Filed: 6/28/2005, Entered: 7/1/2005 notice of filing
                  NOTICE OF FILING [Exhibit A: Records from the State of Alaska] by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 6/28/05.(tjk, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 21 Filed: 6/24/2005, Entered: 6/28/2005 Terminated:
                    MOTION for Extension of Time until 7/01/05 to to file the Rule 4(b) Report filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.Service: 6/24/05. Response due by 7/11/2005. (tjk, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 20 Filed: 5/11/2005, Entered: 5/13/2005 Description not available
                      SCHEDULING ORDER: Respondent shall file the Rule 4 report and a medical expert's opinion due by 6/24/05. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 19 Filed: 5/11/2005, Entered: 5/13/2005 Description not available
                        SCHEDULING ORDER: Respondent shall file the Rule 4 report and a medical expert's opinion due by 6/24/05. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 18 Filed: 5/9/2005, Entered: 5/11/2005 Status Report
                          STATUS REPORT by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 5/09/05.(tjk, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 17 Filed: 4/14/2005, Entered: 4/17/2005 Order on Motion to Issue Subpoena
                            ORDER granting [15] Motion to Issue Subpoena Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 16 Filed: 4/14/2005, Entered: 4/17/2005 Status Report/Order
                              STATUS REPORT ORDER: Respondent shall file a Status Report due by 5/9/2005. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 15 Filed: 4/12/2005, Entered: 4/13/2005, Terminated: 4/14/2005 Terminated:
                                SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION to Issue Subpoena filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.Service: 4/12/05. Response due by 4/29/2005 (tjk, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 14 Filed: 4/4/2005, Entered: 4/6/2005 Order
                                  ORDER: Respondent shall either file a supplemental motion for issuance of subpoena or a status report informing the special master about respondent's progress in preparing a supplemental motion for issuance of subpoena due by 4/13/05. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 13 Filed: 3/30/2005, Entered: 4/4/2005 Status Report
                                    STATUS REPORT by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 3/30/05.(tjk, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 12 Filed: 3/1/2005, Entered: 3/2/2005 Status Report/Order
                                      STATUS REPORT ORDER: Respondent shall file a Status Report due by 3/30/2005 Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 11 Filed: 2/25/2005, Entered: 3/1/2005 Joint Status Report
                                        JOINT STATUS REPORT by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 2/25/05.(tjk, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 10 Filed: 2/22/2005, Entered: 2/28/2005 Order on Motion to Issue Subpoena
                                          ORDER granting [9] Motion to Issue Subpoena Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 9 Filed: 2/18/2005, Entered: 2/23/2005, Terminated: 2/22/2005 Terminated:
                                            MOTION to Issue Subpoena by TANYA NOYAKUK, MCKENZY ABLOWALUK.Service: 2/18/05. Response due by 3/7/2005 (tjk, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 8 Filed: 1/27/2005, Entered: 2/1/2005 Status Report/Order
                                              STATUS REPORT ORDER: The parties shall file a Joint Status Report due by 2/25/2005. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 1/26/2005, Entered: 1/26/2005
                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master John F. Edwards: Status Conference held on 01/26/05, at 2:00 p.m. (ps2, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 1/18/2005, Entered: 1/21/2005 Description not available
                                                  STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference set for 1/26/2005 02:00 PM (EST) before Special Master John F. Edwards. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 6 Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: 1/20/2005 Joint Status Report
                                                    JOINT STATUS REPORT by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 1/14/05.(tjk, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 1/10/2005, Entered: 1/14/2005 notice of filing
                                                      NOTICE OF FILING [Petitioner's VAERS form] by TANYA NOYAKUK, MCKENZY ABLOWALUK. Service: 1/05/05.(tjk, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 12/28/2004, Entered: 12/29/2004 Notice of Appearance/
                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent James Matanoski for SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 12/28/04.(tjk, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 12/23/2004, Entered: 12/28/2004 Status Report/Order
                                                          STATUS REPORT ORDER: Parties shall file a Joint Status Report due by 1/14/2005, proposing to the special master three dates and times for an early Status Conference. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 2 Filed: 12/15/2004, Entered: 12/16/2004 Notice Of Assignment
                                                            NOTICE of Assignment to Special Master John Edwards. (tjk, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 12/15/2004, Entered: 12/16/2004 Petition
                                                              PETITION against SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES [Filed with Exhibits 1-15], ( Filing fee $150, Receipt number 061907) [Vaccination date: 12/17/02], filed by MCKENZY ABLOWALUK, TANYA NOYAKUK.Respondents Report Due by 3/15/2005.(tjk, )
                                                                LREF

                                                                Statistics

                                                                This case has been viewed 101 times.

                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                Space
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                 
                                                                PlainSite
                                                                Sign Up
                                                                Need Password Help?