LABARGE, INC. v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:05-cv-00001-MMS
District Judge Margaret M. Sweeney, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Labarge, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gary Thomas Carr +1 314 725 6464 +1 314 725 6868 gtc10485@aol.com
United States of America United States of America, Counter-Claimant
Officially listed as "USA"
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory Thomas Jaeger +1 202 353 7955 +1 202 353 7988 gregory.jaeger@usdoj.gov
No Logo Labarge, Inc., Counter-Defendant
Office COFC
Filed 1/3/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand $37000
Nature of Suit 134 - Contract - Other
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County None
Terminated 7/28/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ECF
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 21 Filed: 7/28/2006, Entered: 7/28/2006
STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice, filed by all parties.. (Jaeger, Gregory)
    LREF
    Legal Document 20 Filed: 1/10/2006, Entered: 1/11/2006 Notice of ReassignmentCourt Filing
    NOTICE of Reassignment. Case reassigned to Judge Margaret Sweeney for all further proceedings. Judge Loren A. Smith no longer assigned to case. (dw1)
      LREF
      Legal Document 19 Filed: 1/10/2006, Entered: 1/10/2006 Court Filing
      ORDER reassigning case to Judge Sweeney. Signed by Judge Loren A. Smith. (lp1)
        LREF
        Legal Document 18 Filed: 7/29/2005, Entered: 7/29/2005 Court Filing
        SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Discovery pursuant to RCFC 26(a)(1) due 9/6/05. Designation of Experts/Reports due by 4/8/2006. Designation of Rebuttal Experts/Reports due by 6/8/2006. Close of all discovery by 9/6/2006. Dispositive Motion(s) due by 11/6/2006. Signed by Judge Loren A. Smith. (lp1) Modified on 8/1/2005 to correct deadline for Designation of Rebuttal Experts/Reports (jat, ).
          LREF
          Legal Document 17 Filed: 7/25/2005, Entered: 7/25/2005
          JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT Filed By Defendant. (Jaeger, Gregory)
            LREF
            Legal Document 16 Filed: 7/25/2005, Entered: 7/25/2005
            JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT LaBarge Submission. (Carr, Gary)
              LREF
              Legal Document 15 Filed: 7/19/2005, Entered: 7/19/2005 Court Filing
              ORDER granting [14] Motion for Extension of Time to file JPSR due on or before 7/25/05. Signed by Judge Loren A. Smith. (lp1)
                LREF
                Legal Document 14 Filed: 7/15/2005, Entered: 7/15/2005, Terminated: 7/19/2005 Motion for Extension of Time
                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 7-25-05 to To File Joint Preliminary Status Report filed by USA. Response due by 8/1/2005. (Jaeger, Gregory)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 13 Filed: 6/24/2005, Entered: 6/24/2005 Court Filing
                  ORDER granting [12] Motion for Extension of Time. JPSR due by 7/18/2005. Signed by Judge Loren A. Smith. (lp1) Modified on 6/27/2005 to correct text (jat, ).
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 6/24/2005, Entered: 6/27/2005 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                    Set/Reset Deadlines: JPSR due by 7/18/2005. (jat, )
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 12 Filed: 6/21/2005, Entered: 6/21/2005, Terminated: 6/24/2005 Motion for Extension of Time
                      Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until July 18, 2005 to file Joint Preliminary Status Report filed by USA. Response due by 7/8/2005. (Jaeger, Gregory)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 11 Filed: 5/6/2005, Entered: 5/6/2005
                        ANSWER to Counterclaim filed by LABARGE, INC., LABARGE, INC.. JPSR due by 6/27/2005.(Carr, Gary)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 10 Filed: 4/18/2005, Entered: 4/18/2005
                          ANSWER to [1] Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against LABARGE, INC. filed by USA. Answer to Counterclaim due by 5/9/2005.(Jaeger, Gregory) Modified on 4/20/2005 to set answer deadline (jat, ).
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 4/18/2005, Entered: 4/20/2005 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                            Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer Due by 5/9/2005. (jat, )
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 9 Filed: 4/15/2005, Entered: 4/15/2005 Court Filing
                              ORDER granting [8] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Answer Due by 4/18/2005. Signed by Judge Loren A. Smith. (lp1)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 4/15/2005, Entered: 4/18/2005 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer Due by 4/18/2005. (jat, )
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 8 Filed: 4/4/2005, Entered: 4/4/2005, Terminated: 4/15/2005 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                  Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint, until 4/18/2005 filed by USA. Response due by 4/21/2005 (Jaeger, Gregory)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 7 Filed: 3/8/2005, Entered: 3/8/2005
                                    ORDER granting [6] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer Due by 4/4/2005. (signed by the Clerk) (dls )
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 6 Filed: 3/3/2005, Entered: 3/3/2005, Terminated: 3/8/2005 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                      Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint, until 4/4/2005 filed by USA. Response due by 3/21/2005 (Jaeger, Gregory)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 5 Filed: 1/12/2005, Entered: 1/12/2005
                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Thomas Jaeger for USA. (Jaeger, Gregory)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 4 Filed: 1/3/2005, Entered: 1/4/2005 Notice of Designation of Electronic Case
                                          NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (dw1)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 3 Filed: 1/3/2005, Entered: 1/4/2005 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                                            NOTICE of Assignment to Senior Judge Loren A. Smith. (dw1)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 2 Filed: 1/3/2005, Entered: 1/4/2005 Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1
                                              Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by LABARGE, INC.. Service: 1/3/05.(dw1)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/3/2005, Entered: 1/4/2005 Complaint
                                                COMPLAINT against USA (O) (Filing fee $150, Receipt number 062013), filed by LABARGE, INC.. Answer Due by 3/4/2005. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet # (2) Exhibit # (3) Exhibit # (4) Exhibit # (5) Exhibit # (6) Exhibit # (7) Exhibit # (8) Exhibit # (9) Exhibit # (10) Exhibit # (11) Exhibit # (12) Exhibit # (13) Exhibit # (14) Exhibit)(dw1)
                                                LREF

                                                Statistics

                                                This case has been viewed 123 times.

                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                Space
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                 
                                                PlainSite
                                                Sign Up
                                                Need Password Help?