LEVINE v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:05-cv-00020-VJW
District Judge Victor J. Wolski, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo MATTHEW E. LEVINE, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Hillary Adrienne Stern +1 202 616 0177 hillary.stern@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 1/6/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 352 - Military Pay - Retirement
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed
County None
Terminated 11/7/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case '06-5026'[]
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (25) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 24 Filed: 8/21/2006, Entered: 8/21/2006
MANDATE of CAFC affirming [20] Order Dismissing Case. (hw1, )
    LREF
    Blank 23 Filed: 11/30/2005, Entered: 12/5/2005 Terminated:
    CAFC Case Number 06-5026 for [22] Notice of Appeal filed by MATTHEW E. LEVINE. (hw1, )
      LREF
      Blank 22 Filed: 11/28/2005, Entered: 11/29/2005 Terminated:
      NOTICE OF APPEAL, filed by MATTHEW E. LEVINE. Filing fee $ 255, receipt number 063983. Copies to judge, opposing party and CAFC. (hw1, )
        LREF
        Blank 21 Filed: 11/7/2005, Entered: 11/7/2005
        JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed. The parties shall bear their own costs. (lld, )
          LREF
          Blank 20 Filed: 11/7/2005, Entered: 11/7/2005 Court Filing
          MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting the Government's motion to dismiss, mooting the Government's motion for judgment on the administrative record and directing the Clerk to dismiss the case. The parties will bear their own costs. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (lld, )
            LREF
            Blank 19 Filed: 7/21/2005, Entered: 7/25/2005 Response to Cross Motion
            RESPONSE and reply to [10] MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record, filed by USA. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Reply due by 8/4/2005. Service: 7/18/2005.(mb2, ) Modified on 7/25/2005 (mb2, ).
              LREF
              Blank 18 Filed: 7/1/2005, Entered: 7/5/2005 Reply to Response to Motion
              REPLY to Response to Motion re [17] MOTION to Amend [11] MOTION to Supplement the Administrative Record, filed by MATTHEW E. LEVINE. Service: 6/25/2005.(mb2, )
                LREF
                Blank 17 Filed: 6/23/2005, Entered: 6/29/2005 Terminated:
                MOTION to Amend [11] MOTION to Supplement the Administrative Record, filed by MATTHEW E. LEVINE. Service: 6/23/2005. Response due by 7/11/2005. (mb2, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 16 Filed: 6/16/2005, Entered: 6/21/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                  ORDER granting [12] Motion for Extension of Time to Respond re [11] Motion to Supplement the Administrative Record, Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (mb2, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 15 Filed: 6/15/2005, Entered: 6/20/2005 Order Returning Document UnfiledCourt Filing
                    ORDER RETURNING UNFILED: Plaintiff's Motion for Leave. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (mb2, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 14 Filed: 6/14/2005, Entered: 6/16/2005 Response to Motion
                      RESPONSE to [11] MOTION to Supplement the Administrative Record, filed by USA. Reply due by 7/1/2005. Service: 6/14/2005.(mb2, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 13 Filed: 6/14/2005, Entered: 6/16/2005 Terminated:
                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [10] MOTION for Summary Judgment, MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record, until 7/18/2005, filed by USA. Service: 6/15/2005. Response due by 7/5/2005. (mb2, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 12 Filed: 6/7/2005, Entered: 6/10/2005, Terminated: 6/16/2005 Terminated:
                          MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond re [11] Motion to Supplement the Administrative Record, 6/14/2005, filed by USA. Service: 6/7/2005. Response due by 6/24/2005. (mb2, ) Modified on 6/21/2005 (mb2, ).
                            LREF
                            Blank 11 Filed: 6/1/2005, Entered: 6/2/2005 Terminated: Court Filing
                            MOTION to Supplement the Administrative Record filed by MATTHEW E. LEVINE, by leave of the Judge. Copy to defendant. Response due by 6/15/2005. (dw1) Modified on 6/6/2005 to correct response deadline (jat, ). Modified on 6/15/2005 to reflect that a copy was served on defendant by the Clerk's Office and to adjust the due date accordingly. (dls).
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 6/1/2005, Entered: 6/6/2005 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                              Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 6/7/2005. (jat, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 10 Filed: 5/16/2005, Entered: 5/17/2005 Terminated:
                                MOTION for Summary Judgment, MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record, filed by MATTHEW E. LEVINE. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Dispositive Motion Response due by 6/16/2005.(mb2, ) Modified on 5/17/2005 (mb2, ).
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 9 Filed: 4/25/2005, Entered: 4/26/2005 Terminated:
                                  MOTION to Amend/Correct [8] Administrative Record filed by MATTHEW E. LEVINE. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Response due by 5/9/2005. (mb2, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 8 Filed: 4/15/2005, Entered: 4/19/2005 Administrative Record
                                    ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD by USA. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 4/13/2005.(mb2, ) Modified on 4/19/2005 (mb2, ).
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 7 Filed: 4/13/2005, Entered: 4/15/2005 Statement of Facts
                                      STATEMENT OF FACTS re: [6] Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(6), Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record by MATTHEW E. LEVINE. Service: 4/13/2005.(mb2, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 6 Filed: 4/13/2005, Entered: 4/15/2005 Terminated:
                                        MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6), MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record, filed by USA. Service: 4/13/2005. Response due by 5/16/2005. (mb2, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 5 Filed: 3/9/2005, Entered: 3/11/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                          ORDER granting [4] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Answer Due by 4/13/2005. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (mb2, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 4 Filed: 3/3/2005, Entered: 3/4/2005, Terminated: 3/9/2005 Terminated:
                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint until 4/13/2005 filed by USA.Service: 3/2/2005. Response due by 3/21/2005.(mb2, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 3 Filed: 2/4/2005, Entered: 2/8/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Hillary Adrienne Stern for USA. Service: 02/02/04.(mb2, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 2 Filed: 1/6/2005, Entered: 1/7/2005 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                                                NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Victor J. Wolski. (lg1, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 1/6/2005, Entered: 1/7/2005 Complaint
                                                  COMPLAINT against USA (ARM) ( Filing fee $150, Receipt number 062038), filed by MATTHEW E. LEVINE.Answer Due by 3/7/2005.(lg1, )
                                                    LREF

                                                    Statistics

                                                    This case has been viewed 159 times.

                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                    Space
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                     
                                                    PlainSite
                                                    Sign Up
                                                    Need Password Help?