ALLEN et al v. SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:05-vv-00017-UNJ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ANGEL ALLEN, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael J. McDonnell +1 314 621 6558 +1 314 621 6705 michael_mcdonnell@sbcglobal.net
No Logo RAVEN MO'NAE ALLEN, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael J. McDonnell +1 314 621 6558 +1 314 621 6705 michael_mcdonnell@sbcglobal.net
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Glenn Alexander MacLeod +1 202 616 4122 glenn.macleod@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 1/6/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 483 - Death - Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 300 Vaccine Injury Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Vaccine - Dismissed by Special Master
County None
Terminated 5/25/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 17 Filed: 7/11/2005, Entered: 7/11/2005
JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Vaccine Rule 11(a), that petitioner is awarded attorney's fees and costs in the amount of $6,425.76. The check shall be made jointly payable to petitioner and Mr. Michael J. McDonnell in the amount of $6,425.76. (lld, )
    LREF
    Blank 16 Filed: 6/6/2005, Entered: 6/8/2005 DECISION of Special Master - Fees
    DECISION on Attorney's Fees and Costs Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (tjk, )
      LREF
      Blank 15 Filed: 6/2/2005, Entered: 6/7/2005 Description not available
      SCHEDULING ORDER: No later than 12/26/05, petitioner shall have filed an application for fees and costs or they shall be deemed waived. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (tjk, )
        LREF
        Blank 14 Filed: 5/25/2005, Entered: 5/25/2005
        JUDGMENT entered,pursuant to Vaccine Rule 11(a), that the petition is dismissed. (lld, )
          LREF
          Blank 13 Filed: 5/9/2005, Entered: 5/11/2005 Terminated:
          MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by ANGEL ALLEN, RAVEN MO'NAE ALLEN.Service: 5/05/05. Response due by 5/23/2005. (tjk, )
            LREF
            Blank 12 Filed: 4/27/2005, Entered: 5/1/2005 ERRATA
            ERRATA correcting [10] DECISION of Special Master. Signed by Special Master Laura Millman. (tjk, )
              LREF
              Blank 11 Filed: 4/14/2005, Entered: 4/17/2005 Order
              ORDER: The police report no. 03-003371 dated 1/09/05 attached to this order, is filed by leave of the Special Master. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (tjk, )
                LREF
                Blank 10 Filed: 4/14/2005, Entered: 4/17/2005 DECISION of Special Master
                DECISION Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (tjk, )
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 4/13/2005, Entered: 4/13/2005
                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Laura D. Millman : Telephone Conference held on April 13, 2005. (tlj, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 9 Filed: 3/28/2005, Entered: 3/30/2005 Order
                    ORDER suspending the due date for respondent's Rule 4(b) Report. A due date will be set for the Rule 4(b) Report once petitioner has filed a medical expert report. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (jat, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 8 Filed: 3/14/2005, Entered: 3/16/2005 Amended Petition
                      AMENDED PETITION re: [1] Petition filed by ANGEL ALLEN, RAVEN MO'NAE ALLEN. (tjk, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 7 Filed: 3/10/2005, Entered: 3/15/2005 Description not available
                        SCHEDULING ORDER: Petitioner shall file police report due by 4/08/05. If petitioner determines that a medical expert report is needed, they shall file the report and a CV as soon as possible. Petitioner shall file the full article to the abstract attached to this order and petitioner's medical expert shall consider the article's applicability. Status Conference set for 4/13/2005 10:30 AM (EDT) before Special Master Laura D. Millman. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (tjk, )
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 3/9/2005, Entered: 3/9/2005
                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Laura D. Millman : Telephone Conference held on March 9, 2005. (tlj, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 6 Filed: 3/3/2005, Entered: 3/7/2005 Description not available
                            STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: At the request of respondent, the Status Conference is reset for 3/9/2005 10:30 AM (EST) before Special Master Laura D. Millman. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (tjk, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 5 Filed: 2/16/2005, Entered: 2/18/2005 Description not available
                              ORDER: Status Conference set for 3/3/2005 10:30 AM (EST) before Special Master Laura D. Millman. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (tjk, ).
                                LREF
                                Blank 4 Filed: 1/26/2005, Entered: 1/28/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                NOTICE of Appearance by Glenn Alexander MacLeod for SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 1/26/05.(tjk, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 3 Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: 1/20/2005 Order Reassigning Case Special Master
                                  ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Special Master Laura D. Millman for all further proceedings. Special Master E. LaVon French no longer assigned to case Signed by Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. (tjk, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 2 Filed: 1/6/2005, Entered: 1/11/2005 Notice Of Assignment
                                    NOTICE of Assignment to Special Master E. LaVon French. (tjk, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 1 Filed: 1/6/2005, Entered: 1/11/2005 Petition
                                      PETITION against SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $150, Receipt number 062035) [Vaccination date: 1-3-03]{Filed with Exhibits 1-7}, filed by ANGEL ALLEN, RAVEN MO'NAE ALLEN.Respondents Report Due by 4/6/2005.(tjk, )
                                        LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 158 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?