VAN ALLEN v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:05-cv-00166-JFM
District Judge James F. Merow, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo HAROLD W. VAN ALLEN, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Office COFC
Filed 1/25/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 352 - Military Pay - Retirement
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed
County None
Terminated 2/27/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Cases '05-5147'[], '06-5079'[]
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (40) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 39 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: 10/18/2007 CAFC Mandate Affirming
MANDATE of CAFC affirming [31] Published Opinion/Order. (hw1, )
    LREF
    Blank 38 Filed: 5/10/2006, Entered: 5/10/2006, Terminated: 7/30/2007 CAFC Case Number
    CAFC Case Number 06-5079 for [37] Notice of Appeal filed by HAROLD W. VAN ALLEN. (hw1, )
      LREF
      Blank 37 Filed: 4/27/2006, Entered: 4/27/2006, Terminated: 7/30/2007 Notice of Appeal
      NOTICE OF APPEAL, filed by HAROLD W. VAN ALLEN. Copies to judge, opposing party and CAFC. In Forma Pauperis granted. (hw1, )
        LREF
        Blank 36 Filed: 3/30/2006, Entered: 4/3/2006 Order on Motion for Reconsideration - Rule 59(a)Court Filing
        ORDER denying [33] Motion for Reconsideration - Rule 59(a). Signed by Senior Judge James F. Merow. (dw1)
          LREF
          Blank 35 Filed: 3/27/2006, Entered: 3/29/2006 Response to Motion
          RESPONSE to [33] MOTION for Reconsideration - Rule 59(a) re [32] Judgment , filed by USA. Service: 3/27/2006.(mb2, )
            LREF
            Blank 34 Filed: 3/14/2006, Entered: 3/16/2006 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER re [33] MOTION for Reconsideration - Rule 59(a) re [32] Judgment filed by HAROLD W. VAN ALLEN, Response due by 3/29/2006. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (mb2, )
              LREF
              Blank 33 Filed: 3/13/2006, Entered: 3/15/2006, Terminated: 3/30/2006 Terminated:
              MOTION for Reconsideration - Rule 59(a) re [32] Judgment , filed by HAROLD W. VAN ALLEN. Service: 3/11/2006. (mb2, )
                LREF
                Blank 32 Filed: 2/27/2006, Entered: 2/27/2006
                JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed with no costs assessed. (lld, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 31 Filed: 2/27/2006, Entered: 2/27/2006 Court Filing
                  PUBLISHED OPINION. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment dismissing the complaint with no costs to be assessed. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lld, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 30 Filed: 2/7/2006, Entered: 2/9/2006 Order on Motion for ReconsiderationCourt Filing
                    ORDER denying [29] Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (mb2, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 29 Filed: 2/7/2006, Entered: 2/9/2006, Terminated: 2/7/2006 Terminated:
                      MOTION for Reconsideration re [28] Order on Motion to Continue , filed by HAROLD W. VAN ALLEN. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 1/30/2006. Response due by 2/16/2006. (mb2, ) Modified on 2/9/2006 (mb2, ).
                        LREF
                        Blank 28 Filed: 1/18/2006, Entered: 1/23/2006 Order on Motion to ContinueCourt Filing
                        ORDER denying [25] Motion for adjournment of plaintiff's response to defendant's motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (mb2, )
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 1/18/2006, Entered: 1/23/2006 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                          Set Deadlines: Response to [20] MOTION to Dismiss due by 2/21/2006. (mb2, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 27 Filed: 12/23/2005, Entered: 12/28/2005 Reply to Response to Motion
                            REPLY to Response to Motion re [25] MOTION for adjournment of plaintiff's response to defendant's motion to dismiss , filed by HAROLD W. VAN ALLEN. Service: 12/22/2005.(mb2, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 26 Filed: 12/9/2005, Entered: 12/16/2005 Response to Motion
                              RESPONSE to [25] MOTION for adjournment of plaintiff's response to defendant's motion to dismiss , filed by USA. Reply due by 12/23/2005. Service: 12/9/2005.(mb2, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 25 Filed: 11/28/2005, Entered: 12/1/2005, Terminated: 1/18/2006 Terminated:
                                MOTION for adjournment of plaintiff's response to defendant's motion to dismiss (and request for a telephone conference) filed by HAROLD W. VAN ALLEN. Service: 11/26/05. Response due by 12/13/2005. (dls)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 24 Filed: 11/21/2005, Entered: 11/22/2005 Letter
                                  Letter from Harold W. Van Allen. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] (mb2, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 23 Filed: 11/8/2005, Entered: 11/8/2005
                                    ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD (Five Volumes), filed by USA. Service: 10/28/2005.(mb2, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 22 Filed: 11/8/2005, Entered: 11/8/2005 Court Filing
                                      ORDER granting [21] Motion for Leave to File Administrative Record, granting [21] Motion to Waive Copy Requirements. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (mb2, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 21 Filed: 11/3/2005, Entered: 11/7/2005, Terminated: 11/8/2005 Terminated:
                                        MOTION for Leave to File the Administrative Record, MOTION to Waive Copy Requirements for the Administrative Record , filed by USA. Service: 11/3/2005. Response due by 11/21/2005. (mb2, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 20 Filed: 11/2/2005, Entered: 11/4/2005 Terminated:
                                          MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) , filed by USA. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 10/28/2005. Dispositive Motion Response due by 11/28/2005. (mb2, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 19 Filed: 10/24/2005, Entered: 10/25/2005 Terminated:
                                            MANDATE of CAFC dismissing [13] Notice of Appeal filed by HAROLD W. VAN ALLEN. (hw1, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 17 Filed: 9/19/2005, Entered: 9/21/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                              ORDER granting [16] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Answer Due by 10/28/2005. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (mb2, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 16 Filed: 9/15/2005, Entered: 9/19/2005, Terminated: 9/19/2005 Terminated:
                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [15] Amended Complaint until 10/28/2005, filed by USA.Service: 9/15/2005. Response due by 10/3/2005. (mb2, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 15 Filed: 9/12/2005, Entered: 9/14/2005 Amended Complaint
                                                  AMENDED COMPLAINT. Service: 9/10/2005.(mb2, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 14 Filed: 9/6/2005, Entered: 9/12/2005 Terminated:
                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time until 9/12/2005 to File Amended Complaint for Military Retirement Status and Compensation, filed by HAROLD W. VAN ALLEN. Service: 9/3/2005. Response due by 9/20/2005. (mb2, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 18 Filed: 7/20/2005, Entered: 10/25/2005 Terminated:
                                                      CAFC Case Number 05-5147 for [13] Notice of Appeal filed by HAROLD W. VAN ALLEN. (hw1, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 13 Filed: 7/18/2005, Entered: 7/18/2005, Terminated: 7/30/2007 Notice of Appeal
                                                        NOTICE OF APPEAL by HAROLD W. VAN ALLEN. Copies to judge, opposing party and CAFC. Filed in forma pauperis. (hw1, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 12 Filed: 7/13/2005, Entered: 7/15/2005 Published OpinionCourt Filing
                                                          PUBLISHED OPINION on [7] CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [6] Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(1) filed by USA, filed by HAROLD W. VAN ALLEN,, [9] MOTION for Claim for Reimbursement for Cognitive Therapy Expenses 2001-2002 filed by HAROLD W. VAN ALLEN,, [6] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) filed by USA. Absent the filing of an amended complaint on or before September 12, 2005, final judgment dismissing this matter shall be entered. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (mb2, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 11 Filed: 7/12/2005, Entered: 7/14/2005 Surreply
                                                            SUR-REPLY re [9] MOTION for Claim for Reimbursement for Cognitive Therapy Expenses 2001-2002, filed by HAROLD W. VAN ALLEN. Service: 7/7/2005.(mb2, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 10 Filed: 6/30/2005, Entered: 7/5/2005 Response to Motion
                                                              RESPONSE to [9] MOTION for Claim for Reimbursement for Cognitive Therapy Expenses 2001-2002, filed by USA. Reply due by 7/15/2005. Service: 6/30/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 9 Filed: 6/23/2005, Entered: 6/27/2005 Terminated:
                                                                Emergency MOTION for Claim for Reimbursement for Cognitive Therapy Expenses 2001-2002, filed by HAROLD W. VAN ALLEN. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 6/22/2005. Response due by 7/11/2005. (mb2, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 8 Filed: 5/10/2005, Entered: 5/12/2005 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re [6] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1), filed by USA. Service: 5/10/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 4/25/2005, Entered: 4/28/2005 Terminated:
                                                                    CROSS MOTION to Sever Military Disability Retirement Claim from the Health Care Expenses Claim and RESPONSE to [6] Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(1), filed by USA, filed by HAROLD W. VAN ALLEN. Service: 4/23/2005. Dispositive Motion Response due by 5/11/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 3/28/2005, Entered: 3/30/2005 Terminated:
                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) filed by USA.Service: 3/25/2005. Response due by 4/25/2005. (mb2, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 5 Filed: 2/11/2005, Entered: 2/14/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Tara Kathleen Hogan for USA. Service: 2/10/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 1/27/2005, Entered: 1/31/2005 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma paupCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER granting [3] Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (mb2, )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 3 Filed: 1/25/2005, Entered: 1/26/2005, Terminated: 1/27/2005 Terminated:
                                                                            MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by HAROLD W. VAN ALLEN.Service: 1/25/2005 (copy to defendant). Response due by 2/11/2005 (lg1, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 2 Filed: 1/25/2005, Entered: 1/26/2005 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                                                                              NOTICE of Assignment to Judge James F. Merow. (lg1, )
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 1/25/2005, Entered: 1/26/2005 Complaint
                                                                                COMPLAINT against USA (NAV) , filed by HAROLD W. VAN ALLEN.Answer Due by 3/28/2005.(lg1, )
                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                  This case has been viewed 175 times.

                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                  Space
                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                   
                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                  Need Password Help?