LAWRENCE v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:05-cv-00174-MCW
District Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo JOHN P. LAWRENCE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Harry James Jordan +1 202 349 3851 +1 202 349 3852 hjjlaw@msn.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James D. Colt +1 202 305 7576 +1 202 307 0972 james.colt@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 1/28/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 118 - Contract - Other (CDA)
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed
County None
Terminated 2/2/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case '06-5065'[]
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 20 Filed: 1/5/2007, Entered: 1/9/2007 CAFC Mandate Affirming
MANDATE of CAFC affirming [15] Published Opinion/Order. (hw1, )
    LREF
    Blank 18 Filed: 3/23/2006, Entered: 3/24/2006 Notice of Appearance/
    NOTICE of Appearance by James D. Colt for USA. Service: 3/23/2006.(mb2, )
      LREF
      Blank 19 Filed: 3/13/2006, Entered: 5/18/2006 Terminated:
      CAFC Case Number 06-5065 for [17] Notice of Appeal filed by JOHN P. LAWRENCE. (hw1, )
        LREF
        Blank 17 Filed: 3/7/2006, Entered: 3/7/2006, Terminated: 1/5/2007 Notice of Appeal
        NOTICE OF APPEAL, filed by JOHN P. LAWRENCE. Filing fee $ 255, receipt number 064552. Copies to judge, opposing party and CAFC. (hw1, )
          LREF
          Blank 16 Filed: 2/2/2006, Entered: 2/2/2006
          JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed. No costs. (lld, )
            LREF
            Blank 15 Filed: 2/1/2006, Entered: 2/2/2006 Published Opinion/OrderCourt Filing
            PUBLISHED MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The Clerk is directed to dismiss the action. No costs. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (lld, )
              LREF
              Blank 14 Filed: 7/21/2005, Entered: 7/25/2005 Reply to Response to Motion
              REPLY to Response to Motion re [8] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1), filed by USA. Service: 7/21/2005.(mb2, )
                LREF
                Blank 13 Filed: 6/28/2005, Entered: 6/29/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                ORDER granting [12] Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply re [8] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1). Reply due by 7/21/2005. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (mb2, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 12 Filed: 6/24/2005, Entered: 6/27/2005, Terminated: 6/28/2005 Terminated:
                  MOTION for Extension of Time until 7/21/2005 to File Reply as to [8] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1), filed by USA. Service: 6/24/2005. Response due by 7/11/2005. (mb2, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 11 Filed: 6/15/2005, Entered: 6/20/2005 Response to Motion
                    RESPONSE to [8] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1), filed by JOHN P. LAWRENCE. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Reply due by 6/30/2005. Service: 6/13/2005.(mb2, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 10 Filed: 6/14/2005, Entered: 6/14/2005 Court Filing
                      ORDER granting [9] Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Harry James Jordan for JOHN P. LAWRENCE. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (mb2, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 9 Filed: 6/9/2005, Entered: 6/14/2005, Terminated: 6/14/2005 Terminated:
                        MOTION to Substitute Attorney Harry J. Jordan in place of Pro Se John P. Lawrence, filed by JOHN P. LAWRENCE. Service: 9/6/2005. Response due by 6/27/2005. (mb2, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 8 Filed: 5/13/2005, Entered: 5/16/2005 Terminated:
                          MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1), MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by USA. Service: 5/13/2005. Dispositive Motion Response due by 6/13/2005. (mb2, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 7 Filed: 3/16/2005, Entered: 3/18/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                            ORDER granting [6] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Answer Due by 5/13/2005. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (mb2, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 6 Filed: 3/14/2005, Entered: 3/15/2005, Terminated: 3/16/2005 Terminated:
                              MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint until 5/13/2005 filed by USA.Service: 3/14/2005. Response due by 3/31/2005. (mb2, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 5 Filed: 2/11/2005, Entered: 2/15/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly B. Blank for USA. Service: 2/11/2005.(mb2, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 4 Filed: 2/1/2005, Entered: 2/3/2005 Notice of ReassignmentCourt Filing
                                  NOTICE of Reassignment to Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (dls )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 3 Filed: 2/1/2005, Entered: 2/3/2005 Order of RecusalCourt Filing
                                    ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Emily C. Hewitt recused. Case reassigned to Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams for all further proceedings Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (dls )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 2 Filed: 1/28/2005, Entered: 1/31/2005 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                                      NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (lg1, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 1 Filed: 1/28/2005, Entered: 1/31/2005 Complaint
                                        COMPLAINT against USA (GSA) ( Filing fee $150, Receipt number 062230), filed by JOHN P. LAWRENCE.Answer Due by 3/29/2005.(lg1, )
                                          LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 125 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?