VEZINA v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:05-cv-00372-NBF
District Judge Nancy B. Firestone, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo RAYMOND A. VEZINA, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Patrick E Moore, Inc., PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Neil J. Berman +1 617 628 1563 +1 617 776 0074 njberman2@juno.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas K. Mickle +1 202 307 0383 +1 202 353 7988 douglas.mickle@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 3/16/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand $50000
Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed
County None
Terminated 8/25/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags AUTO, CLOSED
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 17 Filed: 8/25/2005, Entered: 8/25/2005
JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed. Each party to bear its own costs. (lld, )
    LREF
    Blank 16 Filed: 8/25/2005, Entered: 8/25/2005 Court Filing
    PUBLISHED ORDER and OPINION denying as moot [9] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) filed by USA, and granting, [10] MOTION to Voluntarily Dismiss pursuant to Rule 41(a) filed by RAYMOND A. VEZINA. The court declines the government's request for costs and fees. Each party is to bear its own costs. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (lld, )
      LREF
      Blank 15 Filed: 7/8/2005, Entered: 7/12/2005 Reply to Response to Motion
      REPLY to Response to Motion re [9] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1), filed by USA. Service: 7/8/2005.(mb2, )
        LREF
        Blank 14 Filed: 6/24/2005, Entered: 6/27/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
        ORDER denying [12] Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply re [9] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1). Reply due by 7/8/2005. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (mb2, )
          LREF
          Blank 13 Filed: 6/22/2005, Entered: 6/24/2005 Response to Motion
          RESPONSE to [10] MOTION to Voluntarily Dismiss pursuant to Rule 41(a), filed by USA. Reply due by 7/5/2005. Service: 6/22/2005.(mb2, )
            LREF
            Blank 12 Filed: 6/22/2005, Entered: 6/24/2005, Terminated: 6/24/2005 Terminated:
            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to [9] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1), filed by USA. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 6/20/2005. Response due by 7/11/2005. (mb2, )
              LREF
              Blank 11 Filed: 6/21/2005, Entered: 6/22/2005 Response to Motion
              RESPONSE to [9] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1), filed by RAYMOND A. VEZINA. Reply due by 7/7/2005. Service: 6/20/2005.(mb2, )
                LREF
                Blank 10 Filed: 6/15/2005, Entered: 6/17/2005, Terminated: 8/25/2005 Terminated:
                MOTION to Voluntarily Dismiss pursuant to Rule 41(a), filed by RAYMOND A. VEZINA. Service: 6/14/2005. Dispositive Motion Response due by 7/1/2005.(mb2, ) Modified on 6/22/2005 to correct response date. (dls ).
                  LREF
                  Blank 9 Filed: 6/1/2005, Entered: 6/6/2005 Terminated:
                  MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) filed by USA.Service: 6/1/05. Dispositive Motion Response due by 7/5/2005. (dw1)
                    LREF
                    Blank 8 Filed: 5/24/2005, Entered: 5/31/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER re: ADR proceedings shall be suspended until dispositive motion practice has been concluded. The parties shall file an ADR status report within one week after a decision on the motions has been filed, if the case is not disposed of in its entirety. If th status report is filed, the parties shall apprise the court regarding whether reviving ADR proceedings in this case would be appropriate. Signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn. (dw1, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 7 Filed: 5/20/2005, Entered: 5/26/2005 ADR Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                      ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 5/24/2005 at 10:00 AM before Judge Marian Blank Horn. Signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn. (mb2, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 6 Filed: 5/4/2005, Entered: 5/10/2005 ADR Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                        ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: ADR Conference set for 5/19/2005 3:30 PM in National Courts Building before Judge Marian Blank Horn. ADR Confidentiality Agreement due by 5/17/2005 at 12:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn. (mb2, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 5 Filed: 4/27/2005, Entered: 4/29/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                          NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas K. Mickle for USA. Service: 4/27/2005.(mb2, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 4 Filed: 4/15/2005, Entered: 4/15/2005
                            COMPLAINT against USA filed by RAYMOND A. VEZINA.Answer Due by 6/14/2005. Copies (5) to defendant.(dls )
                              LREF
                              Blank 3 Filed: 3/16/2005, Entered: 3/16/2005 Court Filing
                              NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Marian Blank Horn for ADR Pilot proceedings. (dw1)
                                LREF
                                Blank 2 Filed: 3/16/2005, Entered: 3/16/2005 Court Filing
                                NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (dw1)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 1 Filed: 3/16/2005, Entered: 3/16/2005
                                  Case transferred in from the United States District Court for the District of Massachusetts (Worcester); Case Number 03-cv-40280. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received and filed by RAYMOND A. VEZINA.(dw1)
                                    LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 152 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?