DUBSKY v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:05-cv-00397-TCW
District Judge Thomas C. Wheeler, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ROBERT A. DUBSKY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward Austin Zimmerman +1 612 925 2500 +1 952 830 1200 edzimmerman8@hotmail.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas K. Mickle +1 202 307 0383 +1 202 353 7988 douglas.mickle@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 3/24/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County None
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 19 Filed: 3/19/2008, Entered: 3/19/2008 Court Filing
ORDER granting [18] Motion to continue the Stay. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (dw1)
    LREF
    Blank 18 Filed: 3/17/2008, Entered: 3/18/2008, Terminated: 3/19/2008 Terminated:
    JOINT MOTION to continue the Stay in this case filed by USA. Service: 3/17/08.(dw1)
      LREF
      Legal Document 17 Filed: 9/14/2007, Entered: 9/14/2007 Court Filing
      ORDER granting Motion to Continue the Stay. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (pn)
        LREF
        Blank 16 Filed: 9/12/2007, Entered: 9/14/2007 Terminated:
        MOTION to Continue the Stay filed by USA. Service: 9/12/07.(dw1)
          LREF
          Blank 15 Filed: 5/30/2007, Entered: 5/30/2007 Court Filing
          ORDER granting [14] Motion to Continue the Stay. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (dw1)
            LREF
            Blank 14 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: 5/29/2007, Terminated: 5/30/2007 Motion to Continue
            MOTION to Continue the Stay in this case, filed by USA. Service: 5/25/2007. Response due by 6/12/2007.(hw1, )
              LREF
              Blank 13 Filed: 11/2/2006, Entered: 11/2/2006 Court Filing
              ORDER granting [12] Motion Continue the Stay. Status Report due within ten days of a decision. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (mb2, )
                LREF
                Blank 12 Filed: 10/27/2006, Entered: 10/30/2006, Terminated: 11/2/2006 Terminated:
                MOTION to continue the Stay filed by USA. Service: 10/27/06.(dw1)
                  LREF
                  Blank 11 Filed: 5/16/2006, Entered: 5/22/2006 Order on Motion to StayCourt Filing
                  ORDER granting [10] Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (mb2, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 10 Filed: 5/9/2006, Entered: 5/15/2006, Terminated: 5/16/2006 Terminated:
                    MOTION to Stay (out of time) the case filed by USA. Service: 5/9/06.(dw1)
                      LREF
                      Blank 9 Filed: 5/4/2006, Entered: 5/11/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                      NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas K. Mickle for USA. Service: 5/4/2006.(mb2, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 8 Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: 12/6/2005 Notice of ReassignmentCourt Filing
                        NOTICE of Reassignment. Case reassigned to Judge Thomas C. Wheeler for all further proceedings. Judge Susan G. Braden no longer assigned to case. (dls )
                          LREF
                          Blank 7 Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: 12/6/2005 Order Reassigning CaseCourt Filing
                          ORDER reassigning case to Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (dls)
                            LREF
                            Blank 6 Filed: 6/20/2005, Entered: 6/22/2005 Order on Motion to StayCourt Filing
                            ORDER granting [4] Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (mb2, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 5 Filed: 6/8/2005, Entered: 6/13/2005 Status Conference OrderCourt Filing
                              STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 6/10/2005 at 3:00 PM before Judge Susan G. Braden. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (mb2, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 4 Filed: 5/23/2005, Entered: 5/27/2005, Terminated: 6/20/2005 Terminated:
                                MOTION to Stay the Proceedings, filed by USA. Service: 5/23/2005. Response due by 6/9/2005. (mb2, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 3 Filed: 4/22/2005, Entered: 4/26/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Reid Wellons for USA. Service: 4/22/2005.(mb2, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 2 Filed: 3/24/2005, Entered: 3/24/2005 Court Filing
                                    NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Susan G. Braden. (dw1)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 1 Filed: 3/24/2005, Entered: 3/24/2005
                                      COMPLAINT against USA (AF) (Filing fee $150, Receipt number 062591), filed by ROBERT A. DUBSKY. Answer Due by 5/23/2005.(dw1)
                                        LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 378 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?