POLK v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:05-cv-00403-LAS
District Judge Loren A. Smith, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo WILLARD JEROME POLK, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew P. Averbach +1 202 353 0527 +1 202 305 2118 andrew.averbach@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 3/25/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand $20000000
Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed
County None
Terminated 10/11/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case '07-5030'[]
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 15 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: 6/4/2007 CAFC Mandate Affirming
MANDATE of CAFC affirming [11] Published Opinion/Order directing the Clerk to enter judgment. (hw1, )
    LREF
    Blank 14 Filed: 12/15/2006, Entered: 12/15/2006, Terminated: 5/29/2007 CAFC Case Number
    CAFC Case Number 07-5030 for [13] Notice of Appeal filed by WILLARD JEROME POLK. (hw1, )
      LREF
      Blank 13 Filed: 12/8/2006, Entered: 12/8/2006, Terminated: 5/29/2007 Notice of Appeal
      NOTICE OF APPEAL, filed by WILLARD JEROME POLK. Copies to judge, opposing party and CAFC. Fee waived, [2] motion to proceed in forma pauperis is granted in [4] Order. (hw1, )
        LREF
        Blank 12 Filed: 10/11/2006, Entered: 10/11/2006
        JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, dismissing the complaint without prejudice. (dls)
          LREF
          Blank 11 Filed: 10/11/2006, Entered: 10/11/2006 Court Filing
          PUBLISHED OPINION and ORDER GRANTING [8] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) filed by USA. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment dismissing the complaint without prejudice. Signed by Senior Judge Loren A. Smith. (dls )
            LREF
            Blank 10 Filed: 8/16/2005, Entered: 8/18/2005 Reply to Response to Motion
            REPLY to Response to Motion re [8] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record, filed by USA. Service: 8/16/2005.(mb2, )
              LREF
              Blank 9 Filed: 8/8/2005, Entered: 8/9/2005 Response to Motion
              RESPONSE to [8] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record, filed by WILLARD JEROME POLK. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Reply due by 8/19/2005. Service: 8/2/2005.(mb2, )
                LREF
                Blank 8 Filed: 7/8/2005, Entered: 7/11/2005 Terminated:
                MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1), MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record, filed by USA.Service: 7/8/2005. Dispositive Motion Response due by 8/8/2005.(mb2, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 7 Filed: 5/24/2005, Entered: 6/2/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                  ORDER granting [6] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer Due by 7/8/2005. (signed by the Clerk) (dls )
                    LREF
                    Blank 6 Filed: 5/18/2005, Entered: 6/2/2005, Terminated: 5/24/2005 Terminated:
                    MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint until 7/8/2005 filed by USA.Service: 5/18/05. (dls )
                      LREF
                      Blank 5 Filed: 4/22/2005, Entered: 4/26/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                      NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew P. Averbach for USA. Service: 4/21/2005.(mb2, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 4 Filed: 4/1/2005, Entered: 4/5/2005 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma paupCourt Filing
                        ORDER granting [2] Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Signed by Judge Loren A. Smith. (mb2, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 3 Filed: 3/25/2005, Entered: 3/28/2005 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                          NOTICE of Assignment to Senior Judge Loren A. Smith. (dw1)
                            LREF
                            Blank 2 Filed: 3/25/2005, Entered: 3/28/2005, Terminated: 4/1/2005 Terminated:
                            MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by WILLARD JEROME POLK.Service: 3/25/05. Response due by 4/11/2005. (dw1)
                              LREF
                              Blank 1 Filed: 3/25/2005, Entered: 3/28/2005 Complaint
                              COMPLAINT against USA (NAV), filed by WILLARD JEROME POLK. Answer Due by 5/24/2005.(dw1)
                                LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 159 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?