MAGPAGE INTERNET SERVICES, INC. v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:05-cv-00485-JPW
District Judge John P. Wiese, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo MAGPAGE INTERNET SERVICES, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Anderson & Gulotta, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anthony Gulotta +1 717 635 7145 +1 717 541 5434 tgulotta@fbstax.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space G. Robson Stewart +1 202 307 6493 +1 202 514 9440 george.r.stewart@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 4/21/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand $15000
Nature of Suit 206 - Tax - Excise
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County None
Terminated 7/29/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 14 Filed: 7/29/2008, Entered: 7/30/2008 Stipulation of Dismissal
STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice, filed by all parties. Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii) this day. (dls)
    LREF
    Blank 13 Filed: 3/7/2006, Entered: 3/9/2006 Order Staying CaseCourt Filing
    ORDER STAYING CASE. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (mb2, )
      LREF
      Blank 12 Filed: 3/1/2006, Entered: 3/6/2006 Joint Status Report
      SUPPLEMENTAL JOINT STATUS REPORT filed by MAGPAGE INTERNET SERVICES, INC. and USA. Service: 2/28/06.(dw1)
        LREF
        Blank 11 Filed: 11/18/2005, Entered: 11/21/2005 TranscriptCourt Filing
        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on October 19, 2005 before Judge John P. Wiese. (jat, )
          LREF
          Blank 10 Filed: 10/28/2005, Entered: 11/2/2005 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
          STATUS REPORT ORDER: Status Report due by 3/1/2006. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (mb2, )
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 10/25/2005, Entered: 10/25/2005
            Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 11/21/2005. (vp1, )
              LREF
              Blank 9 Filed: 9/27/2005, Entered: 9/28/2005 Status Conference OrderCourt Filing
              STATUS CONFERENCE RESCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference reset for 10/19/2005 at 2:30 PM in National Courts Building before Senior Judge John P. Wiese. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (mb2, )
                LREF
                Blank 8 Filed: 9/2/2005, Entered: 9/7/2005 Order Cancelling Deadline/HearingCourt Filing
                ORDER POSTPONING Hearing. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (mb2, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 7 Filed: 8/24/2005, Entered: 8/26/2005 Status Conference OrderCourt Filing
                  STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 9/6/2005 at 2:30 PM in National Courts Building before Senior Judge John P. Wiese. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (mb2, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 6 Filed: 8/2/2005, Entered: 8/4/2005 Joint Preliminary Status Report
                    JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT. (mb2, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 5 Filed: 6/14/2005, Entered: 6/16/2005 Answer
                      ANSWER to [1] Complaint, filed by USA. Service: 6/14/2005. JPSR due by 8/5/2005.(mb2, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 4 Filed: 5/26/2005, Entered: 5/31/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER: (i) Directing the parties to confer and arrange for preliminary status conference (ii) Identifying filing requirements for conference and (iii) Precluding filing of dispositive motions until after conference has been held. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (mb2, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 3 Filed: 5/9/2005, Entered: 5/11/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                          NOTICE of Appearance by G. Robson Stewart for USA. Service: 5/9/05.(dw1)
                            LREF
                            Blank 2 Filed: 4/21/2005, Entered: 4/21/2005 Court Filing
                            NOTICE of Assignment to Senior Judge John P. Wiese. (dw1)
                              LREF
                              Blank 1 Filed: 4/21/2005, Entered: 4/21/2005
                              COMPLAINT against USA (TRE) (Filing fee $250, Receipt number 062755), filed by MAGPAGE INTERNET SERVICES, INC.. Answer Due by 6/20/2005.(dw1)
                                LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 168 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?