SOUTHERN NEW JERSEY INTERNET PROVIDER v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:05-cv-00501-RHH
District Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr., presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo SOUTHERN NEW JERSEY INTERNET PROVIDER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Anderson & Gulotta, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anthony Gulotta +1 717 635 7145 +1 717 541 5434 tgulotta@fbstax.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space G. Robson Stewart +1 202 307 6493 +1 202 514 9440 george.r.stewart@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 4/27/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand $9000
Nature of Suit 206 - Tax - Excise
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County None
Terminated 7/14/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ECF
  Entries (23) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 22 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/14/2008
STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice, filed by all parties.. (Stewart, G.)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/14/2008
    Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii) this day. (dls)
      LREF
      Legal Document 21 Filed: 3/13/2007, Entered: 3/13/2007 Court Filing
      ORDER STAYING CASE Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (CLB)
        LREF
        Legal Document 20 Filed: 2/20/2007, Entered: 2/20/2007
        JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Stewart, G.)
          LREF
          Legal Document 19 Filed: 2/6/2007, Entered: 2/6/2007 Court Filing
          ORDER LIFTING STAY Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (clb, )
            LREF
            Legal Document 18 Filed: 11/28/2006, Entered: 11/28/2006 Court Filing
            ORDER - The parties will file a status report thirty days after final decision is rendered in XO or Comcation, whichever is later. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (swf, )
              LREF
              Legal Document 17 Filed: 11/28/2006, Entered: 11/28/2006
              JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Stewart, G.)
                LREF
                Legal Document 16 Filed: 8/8/2006, Entered: 8/8/2006 Court Filing
                ORDER - The motion to extend the stay is GRANTED at counsel's joint request. The parties will file a status report within thirty days after final decision is rendered in XO, USA Choice, or Comcation. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (swf, )
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 15 Filed: 8/7/2006, Entered: 8/7/2006
                  STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Stewart, G.)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 14 Filed: 7/12/2006, Entered: 7/12/2006
                    NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (mb2, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 13 Filed: 7/12/2006, Entered: 7/12/2006 Court Filing
                      ORDER directing the Clerk to designate this case as an electronic (ECF) case. All future filings will be in electronic form. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (mb2, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 12 Filed: 5/8/2006, Entered: 5/15/2006 Order Staying CaseCourt Filing
                        ORDER STAYING CASE. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (mb2, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 11 Filed: 4/28/2006, Entered: 5/3/2006 Status Report
                          STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (mb2, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 10 Filed: 2/1/2006, Entered: 2/6/2006 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                            STATUS REPORT ORDER: Status Report due by 5/2/2006. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (mb2, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 9 Filed: 1/19/2006, Entered: 1/24/2006 Status Conference OrderCourt Filing
                              STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 2/1/2006 at 10:00 AM before Sr. Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (mb2, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 8 Filed: 9/29/2005, Entered: 9/30/2005 Discovery Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                DISCOVERY SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 1/26/2006. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (mb2, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 7 Filed: 9/20/2005, Entered: 9/21/2005 Joint Preliminary Status Report
                                  JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] (mb2, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 6 Filed: 7/27/2005, Entered: 7/28/2005 Answer
                                    ANSWER to [1] Complaint, filed by USA. Service: 7/27/2005. JPSR due by 9/19/2005.(mb2, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 5 Filed: 6/23/2005, Entered: 6/23/2005
                                      ORDER granting [4] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer Due by 7/27/2005. (signed by the Clerk) (dls )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 4 Filed: 6/23/2005, Entered: 6/23/2005, Terminated: 6/23/2005 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint until 7/27/2005 filed by USA.Service: 6/23/05. (dls )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 3 Filed: 5/20/2005, Entered: 5/25/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                          NOTICE of Appearance by G. Robson Stewart for USA. Service: 5/20/2005.(mb2, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 2 Filed: 4/27/2005, Entered: 4/27/2005 Court Filing
                                            NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.. (dw1)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 1 Filed: 4/27/2005, Entered: 4/27/2005
                                              COMPLAINT against USA (TRE) (Filing fee $250, Receipt number 062789), filed by SOUTHERN NEW JERSEY INTERNET PROVIDER.Answer Due by 6/27/2005.(dw1)
                                                LREF

                                                Statistics

                                                This case has been viewed 163 times.

                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                Space
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                 
                                                PlainSite
                                                Sign Up
                                                Need Password Help?