NETFORCE, INC. v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:05-cv-00514-MCW
District Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Netforce, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Anderson & Gulotta, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anthony Gulotta +1 717 635 7145 +1 717 541 5434 tgulotta@fbstax.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space G. Robson Stewart +1 202 307 6493 +1 202 514 9440 george.r.stewart@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 5/4/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand $11000
Nature of Suit 206 - Tax - Excise
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County None
Terminated 7/1/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ECF
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 10 Filed: 7/1/2008, Entered: 7/1/2008
STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice, filed by all parties.. (Stewart, G.)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 7/1/2008, Entered: 7/6/2008 Terminated Case - Public
    Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii) this day. (dls)
      LREF
      Legal Document 9 Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: 8/31/2006
      NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (hw1, )
        LREF
        Blank 8 Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: 8/31/2006 Court Filing
        ORDER directing the Clerk to designate this case as an electronic (ECF) case. All future filings will be in electronic form. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (hw1, )
          LREF
          Blank 7 Filed: 5/2/2006, Entered: 5/8/2006 Order on Motion to StayCourt Filing
          ORDER granting [6] Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (dw1)
            LREF
            Blank 6 Filed: 4/27/2006, Entered: 5/1/2006, Terminated: 5/2/2006 Terminated:
            MOTION to Stay the Case , filed by NETFORCE, INC., USA.(mb2, )
              LREF
              Blank 5 Filed: 8/16/2005, Entered: 8/18/2005 Joint Preliminary Status Report
              JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT. (mb2, )
                LREF
                Blank 4 Filed: 6/28/2005, Entered: 6/29/2005 Answer
                ANSWER to [1] Complaint, filed by USA. Service: 6/28/2005. JPSR due by 8/19/2005.(mb2, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 3 Filed: 5/20/2005, Entered: 5/25/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                  NOTICE of Appearance by G. Robson Stewart for USA. Service: 5/20/2005.(mb2, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 2 Filed: 5/4/2005, Entered: 5/5/2005 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                    NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (dw1)
                      LREF
                      Blank 1 Filed: 5/4/2005, Entered: 5/5/2005 Complaint
                      COMPLAINT against USA (TRE) (Filing fee $250, Receipt number 062830), filed by NETFORCE, INC.. Answer Due by 7/5/2005.(dw1)
                        LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 134 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?