COMCATION, INC. v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:05-cv-00515-FMA
District Judge Francis M. Allegra, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo COMCATION, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Anderson & Gulotta, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anthony Gulotta +1 717 635 7145 +1 717 541 5434 tgulotta@fbstax.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jacob Earl Christensen +1 202 307 0878 +1 202 514 9440 jacob.e.christensen@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 5/4/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand $10000
Nature of Suit 206 - Tax - Excise
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed
County None
Terminated 8/17/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ECF
  Entries (46) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 44 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: 5/13/2008 CAFC Mandate Dismissing
MANDATE of CAFC dismissing [43] Notice of Appeal filed by COMCATION, INC. (hw1, )
    LREF
    Legal Document 43 Filed: 10/3/2007, Entered: 10/3/2007, Terminated: 5/12/2008 Notice of Appeal
    NOTICE OF APPEAL, filed by COMCATION, INC. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 067193. Copies to judge, opposing party and CAFC. (hw1, )
      LREF
      Legal Document 42 Filed: 8/17/2007, Entered: 8/17/2007
      JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed. (lld)
        LREF
        Legal Document 41 Filed: 8/17/2007, Entered: 8/17/2007 Court Filing
        PUBLISHED OPINION: directing the Clerk to dismiss the complaint. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si1, )
          LREF
          Legal Document 40 Filed: 2/12/2007, Entered: 2/12/2007
          STATUS REPORT, filed by USA. (Christensen, Jacob)
            LREF
            Legal Document 39 Filed: 1/29/2007, Entered: 1/31/2007 TranscriptCourt Filing
            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-164) held on January 9, 2007 before Judge Francis M. Allegra. (dw1)
              LREF
              Legal Document 38 Filed: 12/18/2006, Entered: 12/18/2006 Court Filing
              ORDER Setting Closing Argument. Closing Argument set for January 9, 2007 at 02:00 PM in National Courts Building before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si1, )
                LREF
                Legal Document 37 Filed: 12/13/2006, Entered: 12/13/2006
                POST TRIAL BRIEF REPLY, filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix # (2) Appendix)(Christensen, Jacob)
                LREF
                Legal Document 36 Filed: 12/13/2006, Entered: 12/13/2006
                POST TRIAL BRIEF (Reply), filed by COMCATION, INC.. (Gulotta, Anthony)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 35 Filed: 11/13/2006, Entered: 11/13/2006
                  POST TRIAL BRIEF, filed by USA. (Christensen, Jacob)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 34 Filed: 11/13/2006, Entered: 11/13/2006
                    POST TRIAL BRIEF (Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law), filed by COMCATION, INC.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibits A through F)(Gulotta, Anthony)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 33 Filed: 9/28/2006, Entered: 9/28/2006 Court Filing
                    POST TRIAL ORDER: The proofs shall be closed with the filing of the official transcript and the parties' briefs.Post Trial Brief due 11/13/2006. Reply to post trial brief due 12/13/2006. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si1, )
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 32 Filed: 9/28/2006, Entered: 9/28/2006 Court Filing
                      ORDER closing proof. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si1, )
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 31 Filed: 9/25/2006, Entered: 9/27/2006 TranscriptCourt Filing
                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-164) held on September 11, 2006 before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Plaintiff Exhibits: 1-7. Defendant Exhibits: 1 and 2. Joint Exhibits: 1. (dw1)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 9/20/2006, Entered: 9/20/2006
                          Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 10/16/2006. (vp1, )
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 30 Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: 9/6/2006
                            Exhibit List (Second Revised), filed by COMCATION, INC.. (Gulotta, Anthony)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 29 Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: 9/6/2006
                              STIPULATION, filed by all parties. (Gulotta, Anthony)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 28 Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: 8/31/2006
                                Exhibit List, filed by COMCATION, INC.. (Gulotta, Anthony)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 27 Filed: 8/29/2006, Entered: 8/29/2006 Court Filing
                                  PRETRIAL ORDER. Plaintiff's revised Exhibit List due by 9/1/2006. Defendant's Supplemental Witness List due by 9/1/2006. Joint Stipulation of Undisputed facts due by 9/6/2006. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si1, )
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 26 Filed: 8/28/2006, Entered: 8/28/2006
                                    Witness List, filed by USA. (Christensen, Jacob)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 25 Filed: 7/31/2006, Entered: 7/31/2006 Court Filing
                                      PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: pretrial conference set for 8/28/2006 10:00 AM via Telephone before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si1, )
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 24 Filed: 7/28/2006, Entered: 7/28/2006
                                        Witness List, filed by USA. (Christensen, Jacob)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 23 Filed: 7/28/2006, Entered: 7/28/2006
                                          Exhibit List, filed by USA. (Christensen, Jacob)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 22 Filed: 7/28/2006, Entered: 7/28/2006
                                            TRIAL BRIEF, filed by USA. (Christensen, Jacob)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 21 Filed: 7/28/2006, Entered: 7/28/2006
                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Earl Christensen for USA. (Christensen, Jacob)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 7/28/2006, Entered: 7/31/2006 Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                ***Attorney Jacob Earl Christensen for USA added. Attorney G. Robson Stewart terminated. (mij, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 20 Filed: 6/28/2006, Entered: 6/28/2006
                                                  Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law, filed by COMCATION, INC.. (Gulotta, Anthony)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 19 Filed: 6/28/2006, Entered: 6/28/2006
                                                    Witness List, filed by COMCATION, INC.. (Gulotta, Anthony)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 18 Filed: 6/28/2006, Entered: 6/28/2006
                                                      Exhibit List, filed by COMCATION, INC.. (Gulotta, Anthony)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 17 Filed: 6/19/2006, Entered: 6/19/2006
                                                        JOINT STATUS REPORT Re Pre-Trial Meeting Certification, filed by all parties. (Stewart, G.)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 16 Filed: 4/24/2006, Entered: 4/24/2006 Court Filing
                                                          PRETRIAL ORDER Exhibit List due by 6/28/2006. Witness List due by 6/28/2006.Appendix A Filings due by 6/28/2006.Pretrial Brief due by 6/28/2006.Opposing Exhibit List due by 7/28/2006. Opposing Witness List due by 7/28/2006.Opposing Appendix A Filings due by 7/28/2006.Opposing Pretrial Brief due by 6/28/2006. Pretrial Conference set for 8/28/2006 10:00 AM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Trial set for 9/11/2006 10:00 AM in National Courts Building before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si1, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 15 Filed: 4/4/2006, Entered: 4/4/2006 Court Filing
                                                            STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephonic Conference set for 4/21/2006 10:00 AM before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si1, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 14 Filed: 3/27/2006, Entered: 3/27/2006
                                                              STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Stewart, G.)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 13 Filed: 3/13/2006, Entered: 3/13/2006 Court Filing
                                                                STATUS REPORT ORDER. Joint Status Report due by 3/27/2006. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si1, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 12 Filed: 3/10/2006, Entered: 3/10/2006
                                                                  JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Stewart, G.)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 11 Filed: 10/13/2005, Entered: 10/13/2005 Court Filing
                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 2/24/2006. Joint Status Report due by 3/10/2006. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (Allegra, Francis)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 10 Filed: 9/28/2005, Entered: 9/28/2005 Court Filing
                                                                      STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 10/13/2005 10:00 AM via telephone before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si1, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 9 Filed: 9/27/2005, Entered: 9/27/2005 Court Filing
                                                                        STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Preliminary Status Conference set for 10/14/2005 02:00 PM via telephone before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si1, )
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 8 Filed: 8/23/2005, Entered: 8/23/2005
                                                                          JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT. (Stewart, G.)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 7 Filed: 7/11/2005, Entered: 7/13/2005 Notice of Designation of Electronic Case
                                                                            NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (mb2, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 6 Filed: 7/11/2005, Entered: 7/13/2005 Order Designating ECF CaseCourt Filing
                                                                              ORDER directing the Clerk to designate this case as an electronic (ECF) case. All future filings will be in electronic form. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (mb2, )
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 5 Filed: 7/5/2005, Entered: 7/7/2005 Answer
                                                                                ANSWER to [1] Complaint, filed by USA. Service: 7/5/2005. JPSR due by 8/26/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 4 Filed: 6/1/2005, Entered: 6/2/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                  SPECIAL PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (dw1)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 3 Filed: 5/20/2005, Entered: 5/25/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by G. Robson Stewart for USA. Service: 5/20/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 2 Filed: 5/4/2005, Entered: 5/5/2005 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                      NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Francis M. Allegra. (dw1)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 5/4/2005, Entered: 5/5/2005 Complaint
                                                                                        COMPLAINT against USA (TRE) (Filing fee $250, Receipt number 062831), filed by COMCATION, INC.. Answer Due by 7/5/2005.(dw1)
                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                          This case has been viewed 230 times.

                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                          Space
                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                           
                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                          Need Password Help?