ALLEGHENYINTEL, LLC v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:05-cv-00516-SGB
District Judge Susan G. Braden, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ALLEGHENYINTEL, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Anderson & Gulotta, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anthony Gulotta +1 717 635 7145 +1 717 541 5434 tgulotta@fbstax.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space G. Robson Stewart +1 202 307 6493 +1 202 514 9440 george.r.stewart@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 5/4/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand $14000
Nature of Suit 206 - Tax - Excise
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County None
Terminated 4/30/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ECF
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 15 Filed: 5/2/2008, Entered: 5/2/2008 Court Filing
ORDER directing the Clerk to dismiss the case. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (am)
    LREF
    Legal Document 14 Filed: 4/30/2008, Entered: 4/30/2008
    STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice, filed by all parties.. (Stewart, G.)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 4/30/2008, Entered: 5/2/2008 Terminated Case - Public
      Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii) this day. (dls)
        LREF
        Legal Document 13 Filed: 11/8/2006, Entered: 11/8/2006 Court Filing
        ORDER: Although designated as an electronic case in the court's case management/electronic case filing (CM/ECF) system, any filing in excess of 100 pages (inclusive of appendices/exhibits) will be filed in traditional, hard-copy form, and not in electronic form. The parties will make such filings in accordance with the requirements set forth in the Rules of the United States Court of Federal Claims. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (dls )
          LREF
          Legal Document 12 Filed: 11/8/2006, Entered: 11/8/2006
          NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (dls )
            LREF
            Blank 11 Filed: 11/8/2006, Entered: 11/8/2006 Court Filing
            ORDER directing the Clerk to designate this case as an electronic (ECF) case. All future filings will be in electronic form. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (dls )
              LREF
              Blank 10 Filed: 10/12/2006, Entered: 10/12/2006 Court Filing
              ORDER granting [9] Motion to Stay Proceedings until final decisions are rendered in Case Nos. 03-2754T, 05-515T, and 05-525T. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (dls)
                LREF
                Blank 9 Filed: 9/26/2006, Entered: 9/27/2006, Terminated: 10/12/2006 Terminated:
                MOTION to Stay proceedings pending final decisions in Case Nos. 03-2754T, 05-515T and 05-525T. , filed by ALLEGHENYINTEL, LLC, USA.(dls )
                  LREF
                  Blank 8 Filed: 11/15/2005, Entered: 11/17/2005 Discovery Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                  DISCOVERY SCHEDULING ORDER:Fact and Expert Discovery due by 3/31/2006. Dispositive due by 4/28/2006. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (mb2, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 7 Filed: 10/13/2005, Entered: 10/17/2005 Status Report
                    STATUS REPORT, filed by USA. Service: 10/13/2005.(mb2, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 6 Filed: 9/27/2005, Entered: 9/28/2005 Status Conference OrderCourt Filing
                      STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 10/7/2005 at 2:30 PM before Judge Susan G. Braden. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (mb2, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 5 Filed: 8/23/2005, Entered: 8/25/2005 Joint Preliminary Status Report
                        JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT. (mb2, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 4 Filed: 7/5/2005, Entered: 7/7/2005 Answer
                          ANSWER to [1] Complaint, filed by USA. Service: 7/5/2005. JPSR due by 8/26/2005.(mb2, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 3 Filed: 5/20/2005, Entered: 5/25/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                            NOTICE of Appearance by G. Robson Stewart for USA. Service: 5/20/2005.(mb2, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 2 Filed: 5/4/2005, Entered: 5/5/2005 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                              NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Susan G. Braden. (dw1)
                                LREF
                                Blank 1 Filed: 5/4/2005, Entered: 5/5/2005 Complaint
                                COMPLAINT against USA (TRE) (Filing fee $250, Receipt number 062833), filed by ALLEGHENYINTEL, LLC.Answer Due by 7/5/2005.(dw1)
                                  LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 140 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?