USA CHOICE INTERNET SERVICE, LLC v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:05-cv-00525-CFL
District Judge Charles F. Lettow, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo USA CHOICE INTERNET SERVICE, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Anderson & Gulotta, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anthony Gulotta +1 717 635 7145 +1 717 541 5434 tgulotta@fbstax.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Karen Elisabeth Servidea +1 202 616 3423 +1 202 514 9440 karen.e.servidea@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 5/5/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand $34000
Nature of Suit 206 - Tax - Excise
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment
County None
Terminated 12/15/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case '07-5077'[]
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (32) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 30 Filed: 6/6/2008, Entered: 6/10/2008 CAFC Mandate Reversing
MANDATE of CAFC reversing [25] Unpublished Opinion/Order. (hw1, )
    LREF
    Blank 29 Filed: 2/28/2007, Entered: 2/28/2007, Terminated: 6/6/2008 CAFC Case Number
    CAFC Case Number 07-5077 for [28] Notice of Appeal filed by USA. (hw1, )
      LREF
      Blank 28 Filed: 2/8/2007, Entered: 2/9/2007 Terminated:
      NOTICE OF APPEAL, filed by USA. Copies to judge, opposing party and CAFC. (hw1, )
        LREF
        Blank 27 Filed: 1/3/2007, Entered: 1/3/2007
        CERTIFIED TRANSCRIPT OF JUDGMENT, dated December 15, 2006, forwarded to Anthony Gulotta, certified copy of judgment, forwarded to Tommy Thompson, of the Department of Justice. See letter in file. (bre,)
          LREF
          Blank 26 Filed: 12/15/2006, Entered: 12/15/2006
          JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the plaintiff recover of and from the United States the sum of $20,625.76, plus interest as provided by law until plaintiff receives payment from the United States. (lld, )
            LREF
            Blank 25 Filed: 12/15/2006, Entered: 12/15/2006 Court Filing
            ORDER FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment against the U.S. in the amount of $20,625.76, plus interest as provided by law until plaintiff receives payment from the U.S. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (lld, )
              LREF
              Blank 24 Filed: 12/11/2006, Entered: 12/12/2006 Stipulation
              STIPULATION of Fact as to the amounts of tax subject to the court's opinion of November 15, 2006 filed by USA CHOICE INTERNET SERVICE, LLC and USA. Service: 12/11/06.(dw1)
                LREF
                Blank 23 Filed: 11/15/2006, Entered: 11/16/2006 Published OpinionCourt Filing
                PUBLISHED OPINION. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (dw1)
                  LREF
                  Blank 22 Filed: 10/2/2006, Entered: 10/3/2006 TranscriptCourt Filing
                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-117) held on September 22, 2006 before Judge Charles F. Lettow. (dw1)
                    LREF
                    Blank 21 Filed: 9/13/2006, Entered: 9/14/2006 Post-Trial Brief
                    POST TRIAL RESPONSE BRIEF filed by USA. Service: 9/13/06.(dw1)
                      LREF
                      Blank 20 Filed: 9/12/2006, Entered: 9/13/2006 Response
                      REPLY Brief to Defendant's Post-Trial Brief filed by USA CHOICE INTERNET SERVICE, LLC. Service: 9/12/2006.(dw1)
                        LREF
                        Blank 19 Filed: 8/25/2006, Entered: 8/28/2006 Post-Trial Brief
                        POST TRIAL BRIEF filed by USA. Service: 8/25/06.(dw1)
                          LREF
                          Blank 18 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: 8/24/2006
                          POST TRIAL BRIEF filed by USA CHOICE INTERNET SERVICE, LLC. Service: 8/23/06.(dw1)
                            LREF
                            Blank 17 Filed: 8/1/2006, Entered: 8/2/2006 ~Notice (other)
                            NOTICE of Filing filed by USA CHOICE INTERNET SERVICE, LLC and USA. USA CHOICE INTERNET SERVICE, LLC Exhibits: 1-22 and USA's Exhibit's: 1-8. Three (3) binders. Service: 8/1/2006.(dw1)
                              LREF
                              Blank 16 Filed: 7/25/2006, Entered: 7/25/2006 Court Filing
                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-285) held on July 11, 2006 before Judge Charles F. Lettow. (dw1)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 7/19/2006, Entered: 7/19/2006
                                Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 7/26/2006. (vp1, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 15 Filed: 7/12/2006, Entered: 7/17/2006 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                  SCHEDULING ORDER:Post Trial Brief due 8/25/2006.Post Trial Response Brief due 9/13/2006. Closing Argument set for 9/22/2006 at 10:00 AM in National Courts Building before Judge Charles F. Lettow. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (mb2, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 14 Filed: 7/7/2006, Entered: 7/10/2006 Exhibit
                                    Exhibit List, filed by USA. Service: 7/7/2006.(mb2, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 13 Filed: 7/7/2006, Entered: 7/10/2006 Witness List
                                      Witness List, filed by USA. Service: 7/7/2006.(mb2, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 12 Filed: 6/7/2006, Entered: 6/9/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Karen Elisabeth Servidea for USA. Service: 6/7/2006.(mb2)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 11 Filed: 3/10/2006, Entered: 3/14/2006 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                          SCHEDULING ORDER: Trial set for 7/11/2006 at 10:00 AM in National Courts Building before Judge Charles F. Lettow. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (mb2, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 10 Filed: 3/6/2006, Entered: 3/8/2006 Joint Status Report
                                            JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by USA CHOICE INTERNET SERVICE, LLC. (mb2, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 9 Filed: 3/3/2006, Entered: 3/3/2006 Court Filing
                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on February 16, 2006 before Judge Charles F. Lettow. (dw1)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 2/23/2006, Entered: 2/23/2006
                                                Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 3/3/2006. (vp1, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 8 Filed: 2/3/2006, Entered: 2/7/2006 Status Conference OrderCourt Filing
                                                  STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 2/16/2006 at 10:00 AM in National Courts Building before Judge Charles F. Lettow. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (mb2, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 1/20/2006, Entered: 1/25/2006 Joint Status Report
                                                    JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (mb2, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 9/6/2005, Entered: 9/12/2005 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER: Fact Discovery due by 1/4/2006. Joint Status Report due by 1/20/2006. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (mb2, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 5 Filed: 8/23/2005, Entered: 8/25/2005 Joint Preliminary Status Report
                                                        JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT. (mb2, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 7/5/2005, Entered: 7/7/2005 Answer
                                                          ANSWER to [1] Complaint, filed by USA. Service: 7/5/2005. JPSR due by 8/26/2005.(mb2, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 3 Filed: 5/20/2005, Entered: 5/25/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by G. Robson Stewart for USA. Service: 5/20/2005.(mb2, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 2 Filed: 5/5/2005, Entered: 5/6/2005 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                                                              NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Charles F. Lettow. (dw1)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 5/5/2005, Entered: 5/6/2005 Complaint
                                                                COMPLAINT against USA (TRE) (Filing fee $250, Receipt number 062849), filed by USA CHOICE INTERNET SERVICE, LLC. Answer Due by 7/5/2005.(dw1)
                                                                  LREF

                                                                  Statistics

                                                                  This case has been viewed 128 times.

                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                  Space
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                   
                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                  Need Password Help?