MURPHY v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:05-cv-00567-MBH
District Judge Marian Blank Horn, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo COLLEEN MURPHY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of James Alan Wendt

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barbara A. Norris +1 907 279 6621 +1 907 279 0199 norris@ak.net
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas K. Mickle +1 202 307 0383 +1 202 353 7988 douglas.mickle@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 5/23/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed
County None
Terminated 2/22/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case '06-5076'[]
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (21) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 20 Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: 4/19/2007 CAFC Mandate Affirming
MANDATE of CAFC affirming [16] Published Opinion/Order that directed the Clerk to enter judgment. (hw1, )
    LREF
    Blank 19 Filed: 4/26/2006, Entered: 5/18/2006 Terminated:
    CAFC Case Number 06-5076 for [18] Notice of Appeal filed by COLLEEN MURPHY,(hw1, )
      LREF
      Blank 18 Filed: 4/17/2006, Entered: 4/20/2006 Terminated:
      NOTICE OF APPEAL, filed by COLLEEN MURPHY. Partial Filing fee $ 255.00 paid, (additional $200.00 due) receipt number 064774. Copies to judge, opposing party and CAFC. (hw1, )
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 4/17/2006, Entered: 4/27/2006 Terminated:
        CAFC Appeal Fees received additional $200, receipt number 064795 re [18] Notice of Appeal filed by COLLEEN MURPHY. (hw1, )
          LREF
          Blank 17 Filed: 2/22/2006, Entered: 2/22/2006
          JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed, with prejudice. (lld, )
            LREF
            Blank 16 Filed: 2/22/2006, Entered: 2/22/2006 Court Filing
            PUBLISHED OPINION granting [8] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) filed by USA,. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment dismissing the complaint with prejudice. Signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn. (lld, )
              LREF
              Blank 15 Filed: 11/7/2005, Entered: 11/9/2005 Reply to Response to Motion
              REPLY to Response to Motion (with separate appendix) re [8] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) , filed by USA. Service: 11/7/2005.(mb2, )
                LREF
                Blank 14 Filed: 11/3/2005, Entered: 11/7/2005 ~Notice (other)
                NOTICE of Filing of Affidavit of LaVonne Carole, filed by COLLEEN MURPHY. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 10/25/2005.(mb2, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 13 Filed: 10/31/2005, Entered: 11/2/2005 Affidavit
                  AFFIDAVIT of Colleen Murphy, M.D., filed by COLLEEN MURPHY. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 10/24/2005.(mb2, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 12 Filed: 10/31/2005, Entered: 11/2/2005 Response to Motion
                    RESPONSE (with separate appendix) to [8] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) , filed by COLLEEN MURPHY. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Reply due by 11/7/2005. Service: 10/24/2005.(mb2, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 11 Filed: 10/18/2005, Entered: 10/21/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                      ORDER granting [10] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re [8] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1), Response due by 10/26/2005. Reply due by 11/7/2005. Signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn. (mb2, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 10 Filed: 10/11/2005, Entered: 10/13/2005, Terminated: 10/18/2005 Terminated:
                        MOTION for Extension of Time until 10/26/2005 to File Response or Reply as to [8] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1), filed by COLLEEN MURPHY.Service: 10/6/2005. Response due by 10/24/2005. (mb2, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 9 Filed: 9/8/2005, Entered: 9/13/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                          ORDER granting [7] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Answer Due by 9/8/2005. Signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn. (mb2, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 8 Filed: 9/7/2005, Entered: 9/12/2005 Terminated:
                            MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1), filed by USA. Service: 9/7/2005. Dispositive Motion Response due by 10/11/2005.(mb2, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 7 Filed: 9/6/2005, Entered: 9/12/2005, Terminated: 9/8/2005 Terminated:
                              MOTION for Extension of Time until 9/8/2005 to File Answer re [1] Complaint, filed by USA. Service: 9/6/2005. Response due by 9/23/2005. (mb2, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 6 Filed: 7/29/2005, Entered: 8/2/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                ORDER granting [5] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Answer Due by 9/6/2005. Signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn. (mb2, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 5 Filed: 7/21/2005, Entered: 7/25/2005, Terminated: 7/29/2005 Terminated:
                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint until 9/6/2005, filed by USA. Service: 7/21/2005. Response due by 8/8/2005. (mb2, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 4 Filed: 7/1/2005, Entered: 7/5/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas K. Mickle for USA. Service: 7/1/2005.(mb2, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 3 Filed: 5/23/2005, Entered: 5/25/2005 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                                      NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Marian Blank Horn. (dw1)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 2 Filed: 5/23/2005, Entered: 5/25/2005 Notice of Indirectly Related Case(s)
                                        NOTICE of Indirectly Related Case(s) [05-6V] by COLLEEN MURPHY. Service: 5/23/05.(dw1)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 1 Filed: 5/23/2005, Entered: 5/25/2005 Complaint
                                          COMPLAINT against USA (HHS) (Filing fee $250, Receipt number 062935), filed by COLLEEN MURPHY. Answer Due by 7/22/2005.(dw1)
                                            LREF

                                            Statistics

                                            This case has been viewed 157 times.

                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                            Space
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                             
                                            PlainSite
                                            Sign Up
                                            Need Password Help?