ABSTON et al v. SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:05-vv-00673-UNJ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ALEXANDER JAMES FAIRCHILD, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas P. Gallagher +1 609 926 6450 +1 609 926 6455 thomasgallagherlawfirm@aol.com
No Logo JASON FAIRCHILD, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas P. Gallagher +1 609 926 6450 +1 609 926 6455 thomasgallagherlawfirm@aol.com
No Logo NANCIE ABSTON, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas P. Gallagher +1 609 926 6450 +1 609 926 6455 thomasgallagherlawfirm@aol.com
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ryan Daniel Pyles +1 202 616 9847 +1 202 353 2988 ryan.pyles@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 6/20/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 483 - Death - Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 300 Vaccine Injury Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Vaccine - Judgment in Lump Sum
County None
Terminated 10/19/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (84) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 78 Filed: 12/4/2007, Entered: 12/4/2007
JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Vaccine Rule 11(a), that petitioners are awarded attorney's fees and costs in the amount of $34,128.47, in addition to the October 19, 2007 judgment of compensation. Petitioners' attorney of record, Thomas P. Gallagher, Esq., may collect $34,128.47 from petitioners. (lld)
    LREF
    Blank 77 Filed: 12/3/2007, Entered: 12/4/2007 Notice Not to Seek Review
    NOTICE Not to Seek Review, filed by NANCIE ABSTON, JASON FAIRCHILD, ALEXANDER JAMES FAIRCHILD re [74] DECISION of Special Master - Fees. Service: 11/26/07.(Neal, Alonzo)
      LREF
      Blank 75 Filed: 11/26/2007, Entered: 12/3/2007 Notice Not to Seek Review
      NOTICE Not to Seek Review, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES re [74] DECISION of Special Master - Fees. Service: 11/26/07.(Neal, Alonzo)
        LREF
        Blank 76 Filed: 11/21/2007, Entered: 12/3/2007 Remark
        Remark. Decision of Special Master dated 11/21/07 sent to Petitioner's counsel via Federal Express Priority Overnight Delivery on 11/21/07. Tracking no. 8634 5658 9502. (tjk, )
          LREF
          Blank 74 Filed: 11/21/2007, Entered: 11/27/2007 DECISION of Special Master - Fees
          DECISION on Attorney's Fees and Costs Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
            LREF
            Blank 73 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: 11/21/2007 Joint Status Report
            JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by NANCIE ABSTON, JASON FAIRCHILD, ALEXANDER JAMES FAIRCHILD, SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 11/19/07.(Neal, Alonzo)
              LREF
              Blank 72 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/14/2007 Status Report/Order
              STATUS REPORT ORDER. By no later than 11/28/07, the parties shall file a Joint Status Report informing the special master about the parties' progress in addressing an appropriate award for attorney's fees, attorney's costs and personal expenses as defined by General Order No. 9. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                LREF
                Blank 71 Filed: 11/8/2007, Entered: 11/9/2007 Terminated:
                MOTION for Attorney Fees, filed by NANCIE ABSTON, JASON FAIRCHILD, ALEXANDER JAMES FAIRCHILD. Service: 10/31/07.Response due by 11/19/2007. (tjk, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 70 Filed: 10/26/2007, Entered: 10/29/2007 Petitioner's Election to Accept Judgment
                  Petitioner's Election to Accept [69] Judgment,. Service: 10/13/07.(Neal, Alonzo)
                    LREF
                    Blank 69 Filed: 10/19/2007, Entered: 10/19/2007
                    JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Vaccine Rule 11(a), that petitioners are awarded a lump sum compensation in the amount of $75,000.00, in the form of a check payable to petitioners as legal representatives of Alexander James Fairchild's estate. (dls)
                      LREF
                      Blank 68 Filed: 10/18/2007, Entered: 10/19/2007 Notice Not to Seek Review
                      NOTICE Not to Seek Review, filed by NANCIE ABSTON, JASON FAIRCHILD, ALEXANDER JAMES FAIRCHILD re [66] DECISION of Special Master. Service: 9/28/07.(tjk, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 67 Filed: 9/25/2007, Entered: 9/28/2007 Notice Not to Seek Review
                        NOTICE Not to Seek Review, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES re [66] DECISION of Special Master. Service: 9/25/07.(tjk, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 66 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: 9/25/2007 DECISION of Special Master
                          DECISION Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: 9/25/2007 Remark
                            Remark. Decision dated 9/21/07, sent via Federal Express Priority Overnight Delivery to petitioner's counsel on 9/21/07. Tracking no. 8619 2827 7980 (tjk, )
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: 9/24/2007 Remark
                              Remark (tjk, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 65 Filed: 9/20/2007, Entered: 9/23/2007 Stipulation
                                STIPULATION, filed by NANCIE ABSTON, JASON FAIRCHILD, ALEXANDER JAMES FAIRCHILD, SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (tjk, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 64 Filed: 9/17/2007, Entered: 9/18/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Daniel Pyles for SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 9/17/07.(tjk, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 63 Filed: 9/14/2007, Entered: 9/17/2007 Terminated:
                                    MOTION for Extension of Time until 9/28/07 to file the stipulation, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 9/14/07.Response due by 10/1/2007. (tjk, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 62 Filed: 9/12/2007, Entered: 9/13/2007 Status Report
                                      STATUS REPORT, filed by NANCIE ABSTON, JASON FAIRCHILD, ALEXANDER JAMES FAIRCHILD. Service: 9/5/07.(Neal, Alonzo)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 61 Filed: 9/6/2007, Entered: 9/10/2007 Description not available
                                        SCHEDULING ORDER:Respondent shall file Stipulation by 9/18/2007. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (Neal, Alonzo)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 60 Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: 9/5/2007 Status Report
                                          STATUS REPORT, filed by NANCIE ABSTON, JASON FAIRCHILD, ALEXANDER JAMES FAIRCHILD. Service: 8/28/07.(tjk, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 59 Filed: 8/23/2007, Entered: 8/24/2007 Status Report/Order
                                            STATUS REPORT ORDER Petitioners shall file a Status Report due by 9/7/2007, regarding petitioners' progress in reviewing the stipulation, signing the stipulation and returning the stipulation to respondent. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 58 Filed: 8/21/2007, Entered: 8/23/2007 Status Report
                                              STATUS REPORT, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 8/21/07.(Neal, Alonzo)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 57 Filed: 5/18/2007, Entered: 5/21/2007 Order
                                                ORDER Respondent shall deliver a stipulation to petitioner fro signature by 8/23/07. Respondent shall fill a status report when repondent sends the stipulation to petitioner for signature. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (Neal, Alonzo)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 56 Filed: 5/17/2007, Entered: 5/21/2007 Status Report
                                                  STATUS REPORT, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 5/17/07.(tjk, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 55 Filed: 5/4/2007, Entered: 5/5/2007 Status Report/Order
                                                    STATUS REPORT ORDER The parties shall file a JointStatus Report due by 5/18/2007 Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 54 Filed: 5/1/2007, Entered: 5/4/2007 Joint Status Report
                                                      JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 5/01/07.(tjk, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 53 Filed: 4/30/2007, Entered: 5/1/2007 notice of filing
                                                        NOTICE OF FILING Exhibit H by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 4/30/07.(Neal, Alonzo)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 52 Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: 4/23/2007 Description not available
                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER: By 5/04/07: Petitioners and Respondent shall file medical literature in reference to their respective experts' reports due 5/04/07. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report due by 5/04/07, regarding the potential for litigative-risk resolution of the case and proposed dates in August 2007 for a hearing on entitlement. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank -- Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: 4/17/2007
                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master John F. Edwards: Status Conference held on 04/17/2007. Thomas Gallagher, Esq., appeared for petitioners. Mark Raby, Esq., appeared for respondent. The special master discussed, in part, the potential for a negotiated resolution of the case based upon notations in the records; and the scheduling of a hearing on entitlement. (Edwards, John)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 51 Filed: 4/4/2007, Entered: 4/8/2007 Status Conference Order
                                                              STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference set for 4/17/2007 11:00 AM before Special Master John F. Edwards. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 50 Filed: 3/30/2007, Entered: 4/5/2007 Expert Report
                                                                NOTICE OF FILING: EXPERT REPORT of Lucy Rorke-Adams, CV and Medical Literature (Ex. no. D-G) filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 3/30/07.(tjk, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 49 Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: 4/5/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File (Vac
                                                                  ORDER granting [48] Motion for Extension of Time Expert Report due by 3/30/2007. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 48 Filed: 3/20/2007, Entered: 3/26/2007, Terminated: 3/23/2007 Terminated:
                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time until 3/30/07 to file his expert neuropathologist's opinion, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 3/20/07.Response due by 4/6/2007. (tjk, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 47 Filed: 3/5/2007, Entered: 3/8/2007 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                      AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, filed by NANCIE ABSTON, JASON FAIRCHILD, ALEXANDER JAMES FAIRCHILD re [46] Notice of Filing. (tjk, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 46 Filed: 2/14/2007, Entered: 2/19/2007 notice of filing
                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING [Exhibit #3] by NANCIE ABSTON, JASON FAIRCHILD, ALEXANDER JAMES FAIRCHILD. Service: 2/09/07.(tjk, )
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 45 Filed: 2/12/2007, Entered: 2/14/2007 Status Report
                                                                          STATUS REPORT, filed by NANCIE ABSTON, JASON FAIRCHILD, ALEXANDER JAMES FAIRCHILD. Service: 2/09/07.(tjk, )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 44 Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: 2/4/2007 Description not available
                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER: Petitioners shall file a Status Report due by 2/09/07. Respondent shall file a Medical Opinion from a pediatric pathologist due by 3/16/07. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 43 Filed: 1/17/2007, Entered: 1/20/2007 Expert Report
                                                                              EXPERT REPORT of Marcel Kinsbourne, M.D. (Ex. no. 2) filed by NANCIE ABSTON, JASON FAIRCHILD, ALEXANDER JAMES FAIRCHILD. Service: 1/03/07.(tjk, )
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 42 Filed: 12/13/2006, Entered: 12/14/2006 Status Report
                                                                                STATUS REPORT, filed by NANCIE ABSTON, JASON FAIRCHILD, ALEXANDER JAMES FAIRCHILD. Service: 12/11/06.(tjk, )
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 41 Filed: 12/8/2006, Entered: 12/10/2006 Status Report/Order
                                                                                  STATUS REPORT ORDER Petitioners shall file a Status Report due by 1/5/2007 Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 40 Filed: 12/4/2006, Entered: 12/6/2006 Status Report
                                                                                    STATUS REPORT, filed by NANCIE ABSTON, JASON FAIRCHILD, ALEXANDER JAMES FAIRCHILD. Service: 11/29/06.(tjk, )
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 39 Filed: 12/4/2006, Entered: 12/6/2006 Description not available
                                                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER: Respondent shall file a medical opinion due by 1/31/07. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 38 Filed: 11/29/2006, Entered: 12/2/2006 Status Report
                                                                                        STATUS REPORT, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 11/29/06.(tjk, )
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 37 Filed: 11/13/2006, Entered: 11/15/2006 Status Report/Order
                                                                                          STATUS REPORT ORDER By 11/29/06, each party shall file a status report. Each party shall inform the special master about the party's progress in pursuing additional medical opinion. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 11/13/2006, Entered: 11/13/2006
                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master John F. Edwards: A telephonic Status Conference was held on 11/13/06. Thomas Gallagher appeared for petitioners. Mark C. Raby appeared for respondent. (Edwards, John)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 36 Filed: 11/1/2006, Entered: 11/2/2006 Description not available
                                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 11/13/2006 10:00 AM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Special Master John F. Edwards. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (mij, )
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 35 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: 10/12/2006 Expert Report
                                                                                                EXPERT REPORT of John J. Shane (Ex. no. 1) filed by NANCIE ABSTON, JASON FAIRCHILD, ALEXANDER JAMES FAIRCHILD. Service: 10/04/06.(tjk, )
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 34 Filed: 9/13/2006, Entered: 9/19/2006 Description not available
                                                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER: Petitioners shall file the Medical Expert Report due by 9/29/2006. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 33 Filed: 9/11/2006, Entered: 9/14/2006 Status Report
                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT, filed by NANCIE ABSTON, JASON FAIRCHILD, ALEXANDER JAMES FAIRCHILD. Service: 9/06/06.(tjk, )
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 32 Filed: 8/21/2006, Entered: 8/23/2006 Status Report/Order
                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT ORDER Petitioner shall file a Status Report due by 9/8/2006 Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 31 Filed: 8/15/2006, Entered: 8/17/2006 Status Report
                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT, filed by NANCIE ABSTON, JASON FAIRCHILD. Service: 8/11/06.(dls )
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 30 Filed: 6/22/2006, Entered: 6/28/2006 Description not available
                                                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER: Medical Expert Opinion due by 8/2/2006. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (mij, )
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 29 Filed: 6/19/2006, Entered: 6/22/2006 Terminated:
                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time of 45 days to obtain the expert opinion , filed by NANCIE ABSTON, JASON FAIRCHILD, ALEXANDER JAMES FAIRCHILD. Service: 6/16/06.Response due by 7/3/2006. (tjk, )
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 28 Filed: 5/5/2006, Entered: 5/8/2006 Description not available
                                                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER: Petitioners shall file the Expert Report due by 6/16/2006. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 27 Filed: 5/1/2006, Entered: 5/2/2006 Status Report
                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT, filed by NANCIE ABSTON, JASON FAIRCHILD, ALEXANDER JAMES FAIRCHILD. Service: 4/28/06.(tjk, )
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 26 Filed: 3/27/2006, Entered: 3/30/2006 Notice of Intent to Remain in the Program
                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF INTENT to Remain in the Program by Petitioner. Service: 3/21/2006.(mij, )
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 25 Filed: 3/10/2006, Entered: 3/14/2006 Status Report
                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 3/10/06.(tjk, )
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 24 Filed: 3/3/2006, Entered: 3/9/2006 Description not available
                                                                                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties shall exchange informally the autopsy slides. Petitioners shall file an Expert Report due by 4/28/2006. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 23 Filed: 3/1/2006, Entered: 3/8/2006 Status Report/Order
                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT ORDER. Respondent shall file a Status Report due by 3/10/2006 regarding the pathologist and inform the special master about progress in obtaining autopsy slides. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 22 Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: 3/7/2006 Notice Regarding Statutory Requirement
                                                                                                                          ORDER re: the statutory time period for the special master's issuance of a decision in this case has expired. Petitioner may submit a notice continuing or withdrawing the petition and such notice shall be filed within 30 days. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 21 Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: 3/3/2006 Status Report
                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 2/28/2006.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 20 Filed: 2/8/2006, Entered: 2/13/2006 Description not available
                                                                                                                              STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference set for 2/28/2006 01:00 PM before Special Master John F. Edwards. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 19 Filed: 2/1/2006, Entered: 2/3/2006 Description not available
                                                                                                                                STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: The Rule 5 conference is scheduled for 2/27/2006 01:00 PM before Special Master John F. Edwards. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 18 Filed: 1/27/2006, Entered: 1/31/2006 Respondent's Report
                                                                                                                                  Respondent's Report, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 1/27/06. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 17 Filed: 1/27/2006, Entered: 1/31/2006 Expert Report
                                                                                                                                    EXPERT REPORT of Michael Kohrman, M.D. (Ex. B) and Mr. Kohrman's Curriculum Vitae (Ex. C) filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 1/27/06.(tjk, )
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 16 Filed: 11/16/2005, Entered: 11/17/2005 Description not available
                                                                                                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER: By no later than 1/20/06, respondent shall file a Rule 4 report. The special master expects respondent to provide with the Rule 4 report a medical expert's opinion. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 11/15/2005, Entered: 11/15/2005
                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master John F. Edwards: Status Conference held on 11/15/05, at 2:00 p.m. (ps2, )
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 15 Filed: 11/8/2005, Entered: 11/9/2005 Status Report
                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 11/08/05.(tjk, )
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 14 Filed: 10/31/2005, Entered: 11/4/2005 Description not available
                                                                                                                                            STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference set for 11/15/2005 02:00 PM (EST) before Special Master John F. Edwards. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 13 Filed: 10/21/2005, Entered: 10/27/2005 notice of filing
                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING [Exhibit A] by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 10/21/05.(tjk, )
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 12 Filed: 10/12/2005, Entered: 10/18/2005 Order
                                                                                                                                                ORDER By no later than 10/28/05, respondent shall file the coroner's investigation report. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 11 Filed: 9/30/2005, Entered: 10/4/2005 Joint Status Report
                                                                                                                                                  JOINT STATUS REPORT by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 9/30/05.(tjk, )
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 10 Filed: 9/7/2005, Entered: 9/8/2005 Status Report/Order
                                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT ORDER: Status Report due by 9/30/2005. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 9 Filed: 9/2/2005, Entered: 9/7/2005 Joint Status Report
                                                                                                                                                      JOINT STATUS REPORT by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 9/02/05.(tjk, )
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 8 Filed: 8/10/2005, Entered: 8/16/2005 Status Report/Order
                                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT ORDER The parties shall file a Joint Status Report due by 9/2/2005 Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 7 Filed: 8/8/2005, Entered: 8/16/2005 Joint Status Report
                                                                                                                                                          JOINT STATUS REPORT by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 8/08/05.(tjk, )
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 7/26/2005, Entered: 7/28/2005 Status Report/Order
                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT ORDER: Joint Status Report due by 8/8/2005. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 7/26/2005, Entered: 7/26/2005
                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master John F. Edwards: Status Conference held on 07/26/05, at 11:00 a.m. (ps2, )
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 5 Filed: 7/21/2005, Entered: 7/23/2005 Description not available
                                                                                                                                                                STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference set for 7/26/2005 11:00 AM (EDT) before Special Master John F. Edwards. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 4 Filed: 7/19/2005, Entered: 7/21/2005 notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                  SECOND SUBMISSION OF REQUIRED DOCUMENTS [Exhibits F,G,H] by NANCIE ABSTON, JASON FAIRCHILD, ALEXANDER JAMES FAIRCHILD. Service: 7/14/05.(tjk, )
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 3 Filed: 7/1/2005, Entered: 7/6/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Curtis Raby for SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 7/01/05.(tjk, )
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 2 Filed: 6/20/2005, Entered: 6/22/2005 Notice Of Assignment
                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Assignment to Special Master John Edwards. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 6/20/2005, Entered: 6/22/2005 Petition
                                                                                                                                                                        PETITION against SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 063096) , filed by NANCIE ABSTON, JASON FAIRCHILD, ALEXANDER JAMES FAIRCHILD.Respondents Report Due by 9/19/2005.(tjk, )
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 124 times.

                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?