NORTHERN RIVERVIEW, INC., v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:05-cv-00681-MMS
District Judge Margaret M. Sweeney, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo NORTHERN RIVERVIEW, INC.,, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Nixon Peabody LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth H. Silverberg +1 202 585 8322 +1 202 585 8080 ksilverberg@nixonpeabody.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Charles Rapp +1 202 307 0503 william.c.rapp2@usdoj.gov
No Logo FOUNTAINVIEW AT COLLEGE ROAD, INC.,, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Nixon Peabody LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth H. Silverberg +1 202 585 8322 +1 202 585 8080 ksilverberg@nixonpeabody.com
No Logo NORTHERN MANOR MULTICARE, INC.,, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Nixon Peabody LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth H. Silverberg +1 202 585 8322 +1 202 585 8080 ksilverberg@nixonpeabody.com
No Logo NORTHERN METROPOLITAN, INC.,, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Nixon Peabody LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth H. Silverberg +1 202 585 8322 +1 202 585 8080 ksilverberg@nixonpeabody.com
Office COFC
Filed 6/21/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 202 - Tax - Declaratory Judgment 28:1507
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County None
Terminated 5/9/2006
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
105-cv-00681-MMS None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, LEAD
  Entries (44) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 41 Filed: 5/9/2006, Entered: 5/19/2006 Stipulation of Dismissal
STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice filed by all parties. Complaints (in this, 05-682T, 05-683T, 05-684T, and 05-802T) dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii) this day. (dls )
    LREF
    Blank 40 Filed: 5/2/2006, Entered: 5/8/2006 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
    STATUS REPORT ORDER: Joint Status Report due by 5/12/2006. Signed by Judge Margaret M. Sweeney. (dw1)
      LREF
      Blank 39 Filed: 4/27/2006, Entered: 5/1/2006 Joint Status Report
      JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by NORTHERN RIVERVIEW, INC. Service: 4/27/2006.(mb2, )
        LREF
        Blank 38 Filed: 4/18/2006, Entered: 4/20/2006 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
        STATUS REPORT ORDER: Status Report due by 4/28/2006. Signed by Judge Margaret M. Sweeney. (mb2, )
          LREF
          Blank 37 Filed: 4/14/2006, Entered: 4/19/2006 Status Report
          STATUS REPORT, filed by NORTHERN RIVERVIEW, INC. Service: 4/14/2006.(mb2, )
            LREF
            Blank 36 Filed: 3/28/2006, Entered: 3/29/2006 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
            STATUS REPORT ORDER: Status Report due by 4/14/2006. Signed by Judge Margaret M. Sweeney. (mb2, )
              LREF
              Blank 35 Filed: 3/24/2006, Entered: 3/27/2006 Joint Status Report
              JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by NORTHERN RIVERVIEW, INC. Service: 3/24/2006.(mb2, )
                LREF
                Blank 34 Filed: 3/13/2006, Entered: 3/15/2006 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                STATUS REPORT ORDER: Status Report due by 3/24/2006. Signed by Judge Margaret M. Sweeney. (mb2, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 33 Filed: 3/10/2006, Entered: 3/13/2006 Joint Status Report
                  JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by NORTHERN RIVERVIEW, INC. Service: 3/10/2006.(mb2, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 32 Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: 3/3/2006 Order on Motion to ContinueCourt Filing
                    ORDER granting [31] Motion to Continue Suspension of Proceedings. Signed by Judge Margaret M. Sweeney. (mb2, )
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: 3/3/2006 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                      Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 3/10/2006. (mb2, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 31 Filed: 2/24/2006, Entered: 2/28/2006, Terminated: 2/28/2006 Terminated:
                        MOTION to Continue Suspension of Proceedings, filed by NORTHERN RIVERVIEW, INC. Service: 2/24/2006. Response due by 3/13/2006. (mb2, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 30 Filed: 2/21/2006, Entered: 2/24/2006 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                          STATUS REPORT ORDER: Status Report due by 2/24/2006. Signed by Judge Margaret M. Sweeney. (mb2, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 29 Filed: 2/10/2006, Entered: 2/14/2006 Joint Status Report
                            JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by NORTHERN RIVERVIEW, INC. Service: 2/10/2006.(mb2, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 28 Filed: 1/20/2006, Entered: 1/24/2006 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                              STATUS REPORT ORDER: Status Report due by 2/10/2006. Signed by Judge Margaret M. Sweeney. (mb2, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 27 Filed: 1/13/2006, Entered: 1/19/2006 Joint Status Report
                                JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by USA. Service: 1/13/2006.(mb2, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 26 Filed: 1/10/2006, Entered: 1/12/2006 Order Reassigning CaseCourt Filing
                                  CORRECTED ORDER reassigning case to Judge Margaret M. Sweeney filed (in this, 05-681T, 05-682T, 05-683T, 05-684T and 05-802T). Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (dls)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 25 Filed: 1/10/2006, Entered: 1/12/2006 Notice of ReassignmentCourt Filing
                                    NOTICE of Reassignment. Case reassigned to Judge Margaret Sweeney for all further proceedings (in this, 05-682T, 05-683T, 05-684T and 05-802T). Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr no longer assigned to case. (dls ) Modified on 1/12/2006 to include Case No. 05-802T. (dls).
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 24 Filed: 1/10/2006, Entered: 1/12/2006 Order Reassigning CaseCourt Filing
                                      ORDER reassigning case to Judge Margaret M. Sweeney (filed in this, 05-682T, 05-683T, and 05-684T). Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (dls )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 23 Filed: 12/9/2005, Entered: 12/14/2005 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                                        STATUS REPORT ORDER: Status Report due by 1/13/2006. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (mb2, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 22 Filed: 12/2/2005, Entered: 12/6/2005 Joint Status Report
                                          JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by NORTHERN RIVERVIEW, INC. Service: 12/2/2005 by hand.(mb2, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 21 Filed: 11/9/2005, Entered: 11/14/2005 Order on Motion to StayCourt Filing
                                            ORDER granting [20] Motion to Stay. Status Report due by 12/2/2005. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (mb2, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 20 Filed: 11/3/2005, Entered: 11/7/2005, Terminated: 11/9/2005 Terminated:
                                              MOTION to Stay the Proceedings , filed by NORTHERN RIVERVIEW, INC. Service: 11/3/2005. Response due by 11/21/2005. (mb2, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 19 Filed: 10/12/2005, Entered: 10/17/2005 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact RE: [18] MOTION for Summary Judgment by NORTHERN RIVERVIEW, INC., FOUNTAINVIEW AT COLLEGE ROAD, INC., NORTHERN MANOR MULTICARE, INC., NORTHERN METROPOLITAN, INC. Service: 10/11/2005.(mb2, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 18 Filed: 10/12/2005, Entered: 10/17/2005 Terminated:
                                                  MOTION for Summary Judgment (with four volumes of appendices), filed by NORTHERN RIVERVIEW, INC., FOUNTAINVIEW AT COLLEGE ROAD, INC., NORTHERN MANOR MULTICARE, INC., NORTHERN METROPOLITAN, INC.Service: 10/11/2005 by hand. Dispositive Motion Response due by 11/8/2005.(mb2, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 17 Filed: 9/27/2005, Entered: 9/29/2005 Answer
                                                    ANSWER to [1] Complaint, filed by USA. Service: 9/27/2005. JPSR due by 11/18/2005.(mb2, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 8/26/2005, Entered: 8/31/2005 Transcript
                                                      TRANSCRIPT (Pg 1-61) of Proceedings held on 8/25/05 before Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.. (eph, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 8/25/2005, Entered: 8/25/2005
                                                        Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 9/26/2005. (vp1, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 16 Filed: 8/23/2005, Entered: 8/25/2005 Status Conference OrderCourt Filing
                                                          STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 8/25/2005 at 10:00 AM in National Courts Building before Sr. Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (mb2, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 15 Filed: 8/18/2005, Entered: 8/19/2005 Terminated:
                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint until 9/27/2005, filed by USA. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE FROM CASE NO. 05-683] Service: 8/16/2005. Response due by 9/2/2005. (mb2, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 14 Filed: 8/18/2005, Entered: 8/19/2005 Terminated:
                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint until 9/27/2005, filed by USA. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE FROM CASE NO. 05-682] Service: 8/16/2005. Response due by 9/2/2005. (mb2, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 13 Filed: 8/18/2005, Entered: 8/19/2005 Terminated:
                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint until 9/27/2005, filed by USA. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE FROM CASE NO. 05-684] Service: 8/16/2005. Response due by 9/2/2005. (mb2, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 12 Filed: 8/18/2005, Entered: 8/19/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER: Directing the Clerk to File Defendant's Motions with the Lead Case. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (mb2, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 11 Filed: 8/16/2005, Entered: 8/18/2005 Terminated:
                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint until 9/27/2005, filed by USA. Service: 8/16/2005. Response due by 9/2/2005. (mb2, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 10 Filed: 7/26/2005, Entered: 7/28/2005 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re [5] MOTION to Consolidate Cases 05-684, 05-682, 05-683 with this case MOTION for Referral to ADR, filed by NORTHERN RIVERVIEW, INC. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 7/22/2005.(mb2, ) Modified on 7/28/2005 (mb2, ).
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 9 Filed: 7/20/2005, Entered: 7/25/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER: Defendant is asked to submit substantive answers in a timely manner. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (mb2, )
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 8 Filed: 7/19/2005, Entered: 7/21/2005 Order on Motion to Consolidate CasesCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER granting [5] Motion to Consolidate Cases. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (dls )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 7 Filed: 7/15/2005, Entered: 7/20/2005 Response to Motion
                                                                            RESPONSE to [5] MOTION to Consolidate Cases 05-684, 05-682, 05-683 with this case, MOTION for Referral to ADR, filed by USA. Reply due by 7/29/2005. Service: 7/15/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 6 Filed: 7/12/2005, Entered: 7/14/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by William Charles Rapp for USA. Service: 7/12/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 5 Filed: 7/1/2005, Entered: 7/6/2005, Terminated: 7/19/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                MOTION to Consolidate Cases 05-684, 05-682, 05-683 with this case, MOTION for Referral to ADR filed by NORTHERN RIVERVIEW, INC.Service: copy to defendant. Response due by 7/15/2005. (mb2, )
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 4 Filed: 6/21/2005, Entered: 6/28/2005 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                  NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. (lg1, )
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 3 Filed: 6/21/2005, Entered: 6/28/2005 Notice of Indirectly Related Case(s)
                                                                                    NOTICE of Indirectly Related Case(s) by NORTHERN RIVERVIEW, INC.,. (lg1, )
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 2 Filed: 6/21/2005, Entered: 6/28/2005 Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1
                                                                                      Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by NORTHERN RIVERVIEW, INC.,. Service: 6/21/2005.(lg1, )
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 6/21/2005, Entered: 6/28/2005 Complaint
                                                                                        COMPLAINT against USA (TRE) ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 063104), filed by NORTHERN RIVERVIEW, INC.,.Answer Due by 8/22/2005.(lg1, ).
                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                          This case has been viewed 131 times.

                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                          Space
                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                           
                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                          Need Password Help?