NORTHERN MANOR MULTICARE, INC., v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:05-cv-00683-MMS
District Judge Margaret M. Sweeney, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo NORTHERN MANOR MULTICARE, INC.,, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Nixon Peabody LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth H. Silverberg +1 202 585 8322 +1 202 585 8080 ksilverberg@nixonpeabody.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Charles Rapp +1 202 307 0503 william.c.rapp2@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 6/21/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 202 - Tax - Declaratory Judgment 28:1507
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County None
Terminated 5/9/2006
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
105-cv-00681-MMS None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, MEMBER
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 5/9/2006, Entered: 5/19/2006 Stipulation of Dismissal
SEE NO. 05-681T FOR STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice filed by all parties. Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii) this day. (dls )
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 1/10/2006, Entered: 1/12/2006 Case Assigned/Reassigned
    Case reassigned to Judge Margaret Sweeney. Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr no longer assigned to the case. (See No. 05-681T for Order and Notice of Reassignment.) (dls )
      LREF
      Blank 11 Filed: 9/30/2005, Entered: 10/3/2005 Answer
      ANSWER to [1] Complaint, filed by USA. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 9/27/2005.(mb2, )
        LREF
        Blank 10 Filed: 7/26/2005, Entered: 7/28/2005 Reply to Response to Motion
        REPLY to Response to Motion re [5] MOTION to Consolidate Cases 05-684, 05-681, 05-682, 05-683 with this case MOTION for Referral to ADR, filed by NORTHERN MANOR MULTICARE, INC. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 7/22/2005.(mb2, )
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 7/19/2005, Entered: 7/21/2005 Set Member Flag
          This case has been consolidated under case number 05-681T pursuant to the order of July 19, 2005. (SEE NO. 05-681T FOR ORDER.) (dls )
            LREF
            Blank 9 Filed: 7/15/2005, Entered: 7/20/2005 Response to Motion
            RESPONSE to [5] MOTION to Consolidate Cases 05-684, 05-681, 05-682, 05-683 with this case MOTION for Referral to ADR, filed by USA. Reply due by 7/29/2005. Service: 7/15/2005.(mb2, )
              LREF
              Blank 7 Filed: 7/13/2005, Entered: 7/14/2005 Notice of ReassignmentCourt Filing
              NOTICE of Reassignment to Senior Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. (dls )
                LREF
                Blank 6 Filed: 7/13/2005, Entered: 7/14/2005 Order Reassigning CaseCourt Filing
                ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Senior Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Edward J. Damich no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (dls )
                  LREF
                  Blank 8 Filed: 7/12/2005, Entered: 7/14/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                  NOTICE of Appearance by William Charles Rapp for USA. Service: 7/12/2005.(mb2, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 5 Filed: 7/1/2005, Entered: 7/6/2005 Terminated:
                    MOTION to Consolidate Cases 05-684, 05-681, 05-682, with this case, MOTION for Referral to ADR filed by NORTHERN MANOR MULTICARE, INC.Service: Copy to defendant. Response due by 7/15/2005. (mb2, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 4 Filed: 6/21/2005, Entered: 6/28/2005 Notice of Indirectly Related Case(s)
                      NOTICE of Indirectly Related Case(s) by NORTHERN MANOR MULTICARE, INC.,. (lg1, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 3 Filed: 6/21/2005, Entered: 6/28/2005 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                        NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Edward J. Damich. (lg1, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 2 Filed: 6/21/2005, Entered: 6/28/2005 Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1
                          Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by NORTHERN MANOR MULTICARE, INC.,. (lg1, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 1 Filed: 6/21/2005, Entered: 6/28/2005 Complaint
                            COMPLAINT against USA (TRE) ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 063102), filed by NORTHERN MANOR MULTICARE, INC.,.Answer Due by 8/22/2005.(lg1, )
                              LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 161 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?