ASIA PACIFIC AIRLINES v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:05-cv-00711-CFL
District Judge Charles F. Lettow, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ASIA PACIFIC AIRLINES, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Louis James D'Agostino +1 703 749 1300 +1 703 749 1301 dagostinoj@gtlaw.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Michael Mager +1 202 616 2377 +1 202 305 7643 steven.mager@usdoj.gov
No Logo Aloha Airlines, Inc., Intervenor-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by McKenna Long & Aldridge LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scott Thomas Kragie +1 202 626 6830
No Logo ALPINE AIR, Intervenor-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Miller & Chevalier Chartered

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Keith Huffman +1 202 626 5824 +1 202 628 0858 rhuffman@milchev.com
No Logo CORPORATE AIR, Intervenor-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Miller & Chevalier Chartered

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Keith Huffman +1 202 626 5824 +1 202 628 0858 rhuffman@milchev.com
Office COFC
Filed 7/1/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 138 - Contract - (Pre Award) Injunctions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County None
Terminated 10/6/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case '06-5044'[]
Def Custody Status
Flags APPEAL, CLOSED, PROTO
  Entries (96) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 85 Filed: 3/22/2006, Entered: 3/23/2006 CAFC Mandate Dismissing
MANDATE of CAFC dismissing [82] Notice of Cross Appeal filed by USA. (hw1, )
    LREF
    Blank 84 Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: 3/8/2006 Terminated:
    MANDATE of CAFC dismissing [79] Notice of Appeal filed by CORPORATE AIR, ALOHA AIRLINES, INC., [82] Notice of Cross Appeal filed by USA, (hw1, )
      LREF
      Blank 83 Filed: 1/4/2006, Entered: 1/9/2006 Terminated:
      CAFC Case Number 06-5044 for [82] Notice of Cross Appeal filed by USA. (hw1, )
        LREF
        Blank 82 Filed: 12/21/2005, Entered: 12/23/2005 Terminated:
        NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL, filed by USA. Copy to parties. (hw1, )
          LREF
          Blank 81 Filed: 12/15/2005, Entered: 12/20/2005 Order on Motion to StayCourt Filing
          ORDER denying [80] Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (mb2, )
            LREF
            Sealed Legal Document 86 Filed: 12/9/2005, Entered: 7/1/2006 Response to Motion
            **SEALED**RESPONSE to [80] MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal of the Court's Orders Requiring Resolicitation of the Lihue Lane , filed by USA. Service: 12/9/05.(dls, )
              LREF
              Sealed Legal Document 80 Filed: 11/22/2005, Entered: 11/29/2005, Terminated: 12/15/2005 Terminated:
              **SEALED** MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal of the Court's Orders Requiring Resolicitation of the Lihue Lane , filed by ALPINE AIR, CORPORATE AIR. Service: 11/22/2005. Response due by 12/9/2005. (mb2, )
                LREF
                Blank 79 Filed: 11/8/2005, Entered: 11/8/2005, Terminated: 2/28/2006 Notice of Appeal
                NOTICE OF APPEAL, filed by CORPORATE AIR, and ALPINE AIR. Copies to judge, opposing party and CAFC. Fee not submitted. (hw1, ) Modified on 11/29/2005 (hw1, ).
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 11/8/2005, Entered: 11/8/2005, Terminated: 2/28/2006 CAFC Appeal Fees
                  CAFC Appeal Fees received $255.00, receipt number 063883 re [79] Notice of Appeal filed by CORPORATE AIR, ALOHA AIRLINES, INC. (hw1, )
                    LREF
                    Sealed Legal Document 78 Filed: 10/28/2005, Entered: 11/2/2005 Reply to Response to Motion
                    **SEALED**REPLY to Response to Motion re [74] MOTION for Reconsideration re [69] Sealed Order/Opinion, , filed by ALPINE AIR, CORPORATE AIR. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 10/24/2005.(mb2, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 77 Filed: 10/27/2005, Entered: 10/31/2005 ERRATA
                      ERRATA correcting [69] Sealed Order/Opinion. (mb2, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 76 Filed: 10/24/2005, Entered: 10/26/2005 Order on Motion for ReconsiderationCourt Filing
                        ORDER denying [74] Motion for Reconsideration re [69] Sealed Order/Opinion. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (dw1)
                          LREF
                          Blank 75 Filed: 10/20/2005, Entered: 10/24/2005 Response to Motion
                          RESPONSE to [74] MOTION for Reconsideration re [69] Sealed Order/Opinion, filed by ALOHA AIRLINES, INC. Reply due by 11/3/2005. Service: 10/20/2005.(mb2, )
                            LREF
                            Sealed Legal Document 74 Filed: 10/17/2005, Entered: 10/19/2005, Terminated: 10/24/2005 Terminated:
                            **SEALED** MOTION for Partial Reconsideration re [69] Sealed Order/Opinion, filed by ALPINE AIR, CORPORATE AIR. Service: 10/5/2005. Response due by 11/3/2005. (mb2, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 73 Filed: 10/14/2005, Entered: 10/18/2005 Published OpinionCourt Filing
                              PUBLISHED OPINION (Originally Filed October 5, 2005). Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (mb2, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 72 Filed: 10/14/2005, Entered: 10/14/2005 Court Filing
                                ORDER granting [71] Motion for Leave to File Proposed Public Version of Opinion and Order. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (mb2, )
                                  LREF
                                  Sealed Legal Document 71 Filed: 10/12/2005, Entered: 10/14/2005, Terminated: 10/14/2005 Terminated:
                                  **SEALED** MOTION for Leave to File Proposed Public Version of Opinion and Order, filed by ASIA PACIFIC AIRLINES. Service: 10/12/2005. Response due by 10/31/2005. (mb2, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 70 Filed: 10/6/2005, Entered: 10/6/2005
                                    JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that plaintiff is entitled to injunctive relief. The results of the current Solicitation are set aside and declared invalid. The Postal Service is enjoined to re-solicit proposals for the transportation by air of mail on each of the six lanes encompassed by the Solicitation, except that the court grants leave to the Postal Service to exercise discretion whether to issue contracts for the Honolulu (HNL) - Kamuela (MUE) and Honolulu (HNL) - Lanai (LNY) - Hoolehua (MKK) - Kalaupapa (LUP) lanes, or to include those lanes in its re-solicitation. No costs. (lld, )
                                      LREF
                                      Sealed Legal Document 69 Filed: 10/5/2005, Entered: 10/6/2005 Sealed Opinion/OrderCourt Filing
                                      **SEALED**SEALED ORDER and OPINION denying the government's motion to dismiss, denying [49] CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [45] Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by ASIA PACIFIC AIRLINES, filed by USA, denying, [62] MOTION to Strike filed by ASIA PACIFIC AIRLINES, granting [63] MOTION to Supplement the Administrative Record [11] Administrative Record filed by CORPORATE AIR,, ALPINE AIR, granting [67] MOTION to Supplement the Administrative Record [11] Administrative Record filed by ASIA PACIFIC AIRLINES, granting [68] MOTION for Leave to File Original Declaration filed by ASIA PACIFIC AIRLINES, denying [51] CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [45] Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by ASIA PACIFIC AIRLINES, filed by CORPORATE AIR,, ALPINE AIR, and granting, [45] MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by ASIA PACIFIC AIRLINES,. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment. No costs.The parties shall review the decision and file proposed redactions on or before 10/12/2005. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (lld, )
                                        LREF
                                        Sealed Legal Document 68 Filed: 9/23/2005, Entered: 9/27/2005 Terminated:
                                        **SEALED** MOTION for Leave to File Original Declaration, filed by ASIA PACIFIC AIRLINES. Service: 9/16/2005. Response due by 10/3/2005. (mb2, )
                                          LREF
                                          Sealed Legal Document 67 Filed: 9/23/2005, Entered: 9/27/2005 Terminated:
                                          **SEALED** MOTION to Supplement the Administrative Record [11] Administrative Record, filed by ASIA PACIFIC AIRLINES. Service: 9/16/2005. Response due by 10/3/2005. (mb2, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 66 Filed: 9/23/2005, Entered: 9/27/2005 Reply to Response to Motion
                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re [63] MOTION to Supplement the Administrative Record [11] Administrative Record, filed by ASIA PACIFIC AIRLINES. Service: 9/23/2005.(mb2, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 65 Filed: 9/20/2005, Entered: 9/21/2005 Response to Motion
                                              RESPONSE to [63] MOTION to Supplement the Administrative Record [11] Administrative Record, filed by ALOHA AIRLINES, INC. Reply due by 10/3/2005. Service: 9/19/2005.(mb2, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 64 Filed: 9/16/2005, Entered: 9/16/2005 Court Filing
                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on September 8-9, 2005 before Judge Charles F. Lettow. (dw1)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 9/15/2005, Entered: 9/15/2005
                                                  Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 9/14/2005. (vp1, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Sealed Legal Document 63 Filed: 9/7/2005, Entered: 9/12/2005 Terminated:
                                                    **SEALED** MOTION to Supplement the Administrative Record re: [11] Administrative Record, filed by ALPINE AIR, CORPORATE AIR. Service: 9/7/2005. Response due by 9/26/2005. (mb2, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 62 Filed: 9/6/2005, Entered: 9/12/2005 Terminated:
                                                      MOTION to Strike Declarations, filed by ASIA PACIFIC AIRLINES. Service: 9/6/2005. Response due by 9/23/2005. (mb2, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 61 Filed: 8/26/2005, Entered: 8/30/2005 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER: Trial set for 9/8/2005 at 10:00 AM in National Courts Building before Judge Charles F. Lettow. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (mb2, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Sealed Legal Document 60 Filed: 8/23/2005, Entered: 8/25/2005 ~Notice (other)
                                                          **SEALED**NOTICE of Filing Index to Appendix re [51] CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [45] Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record, filed by ALPINE AIR, CORPORATE AIR. Service: 8/23/2005.(mb2, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Sealed Legal Document 59 Filed: 8/23/2005, Entered: 8/25/2005 ~Notice (other)
                                                            **SEALED**NOTICE of Filing of Original Declaration of Patrick Pomeroy, filed by ALPINE AIR, CORPORATE AIR. Service: 8/23/2005.(mb2, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Sealed Legal Document 58 Filed: 8/23/2005, Entered: 8/25/2005 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                              **SEALED**REPLY to Response to Motion re [49] CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [45] Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by ASIA PACIFIC AIRLINES, filed by USA. Service: 8/23/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Sealed Legal Document 57 Filed: 8/23/2005, Entered: 8/25/2005 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                **SEALED**REPLY to Response to Motion re [51] CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [45] Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by ASIA PACIFIC AIRLINES, filed by ALPINE AIR, CORPORATE AIR. Service: 8/23/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 56 Filed: 8/23/2005, Entered: 8/25/2005 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                  **SEALED**REPLY to Response to Motion re [47] MOTION to Supplement the Administrative Record [11] Administrative Record, filed by ALOHA AIRLINES, INC. Service: 8/23/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 55 Filed: 8/19/2005, Entered: 8/24/2005 Response to Cross Motion
                                                                    **SEALED**RESPONSE and reply to [49] CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [45] Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by ASIA PACIFIC AIRLINES, [51] CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [45] Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by ASIA PACIFIC AIRLINES, filed by ASIA PACIFIC AIRLINES. Reply due by 9/7/2005. Service: 8/19/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 54 Filed: 8/19/2005, Entered: 8/23/2005 ~Notice (other)
                                                                      **SEALED**NOTICE of Filing of Original Declaration of Eugene Mallette, filed by ALPINE AIR, CORPORATE AIR. Service: 8/19/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 53 Filed: 8/18/2005, Entered: 8/19/2005 Response to Motion
                                                                        **SEALED**RESPONSE to [49] CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [45] Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record, filed by ALOHA AIRLINES, INC. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Reply due by 9/15/2005. Service: 5/15/2005.(mb2, ) Modified on 8/19/2005 (mb2, ).
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 52 Filed: 8/17/2005, Entered: 8/18/2005 Statement of Facts
                                                                          **SEALED**STATEMENT OF FACTS re: [51] Cross Motion [Dispositive], Filed by ALPINE AIR, CORPORATE AIR. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 8/15/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 51 Filed: 8/17/2005, Entered: 8/18/2005 Terminated:
                                                                            **SEALED**CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [45] Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record, filed by ALPINE AIR, CORPORATE AIR. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 8/15/2005. Dispositive Motion Response due by 8/19/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 50 Filed: 8/17/2005, Entered: 8/18/2005 Statement of Facts
                                                                              **SEALED**COUNTER STATEMENT OF FACTS re: [46] Statement of Facts, filed by USA. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 8/15/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 49 Filed: 8/17/2005, Entered: 8/18/2005, Terminated: 10/5/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                **SEALED**CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [45] Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record, filed by USA. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 8/15/2005. Dispositive Motion Response due by 8/19/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 48 Filed: 8/17/2005, Entered: 8/18/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                  ORDER: Allowing the Filing of Pleadings Received 8/16/2005. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (mb2, )
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 47 Filed: 8/17/2005, Entered: 8/18/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                    MOTION to Supplement the Administrative Record re: [11] Administrative Record, filed by USA. Service: 8/17/2005. Response due by 9/6/2005. (mb2, )
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 46 Filed: 8/9/2005, Entered: 8/10/2005 Statement of Facts
                                                                                      **SEALED** STATEMENT OF FACTS re: [45] Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record, filed by ASIA PACIFIC AIRLINES. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 8/8/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 45 Filed: 8/9/2005, Entered: 8/10/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                        **SEALED** MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record, filed by ASIA PACIFIC AIRLINES. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 8/8/2005. Dispositive Motion Response due by 8/15/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 8/3/2005, Entered: 8/4/2005 Transcript
                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (Pg 1-49) held on 7/19/05 before Judge Charles F. Lettow. (eph, )
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 8/3/2005, Entered: 8/3/2005
                                                                                            Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 8/18/2005. (vp1, )
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 44 Filed: 7/29/2005, Entered: 8/2/2005 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                              NOTICE of Filing re: [43] [Public Version] ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD, filed by USA. Service: 7/29/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 43 Filed: 7/29/2005, Entered: 8/2/2005 Administrative Record
                                                                                                [Public Version] ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD (two volumes), filed by USA. Service: 7/29/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 42 Filed: 7/26/2005, Entered: 7/28/2005 Proposed Redacted Document
                                                                                                  **SEALED**PROPOSED REDACTED DOCUMENT, FILED by ASIA PACIFIC AIRLINES. Redaction of [41] Response FILED UNDER SEAL. Service: 7/22/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 41 Filed: 7/26/2005, Entered: 7/28/2005 Response
                                                                                                    **SEALED**REPLY to [37] Response to Motion, filed by ASIA PACIFIC AIRLINES. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 7/22/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 40 Filed: 7/25/2005, Entered: 7/27/2005 Order on Motion for DiscoveryCourt Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER granting in part and denying in part [30] Motion for Discovery. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (mb2, )
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 39 Filed: 7/25/2005, Entered: 7/26/2005 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                        NOTICE of Correction re [37] Response to Motion, filed by USA. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE]Service: 7/21/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 7/25/2005, Entered: 7/27/2005 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                                                                          Set Deadlines/Hearings: Dispositive Motion(s) due by 8/8/2005. Cross Motions due by 8/15/2005. Response due by 8/19/2005. Reply due by 8/23/2005. Trial set for 8/31/2005 at 10:00 AM in National Courts Building before Judge Charles F. Lettow. (mb2, )
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 7/22/2005, Entered: 7/22/2005
                                                                                                            Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 8/3/2005. (vp1, )
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 38 Filed: 7/20/2005, Entered: 7/22/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                              Consented MOTION to Substitute Attorney Scott T. Kragie in place of Karen R. Harbaugh, filed by ALOHA AIRLINES, INC. Service: 7/20/2005. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 37 Filed: 7/20/2005, Entered: 7/22/2005 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                **SEALED**RESPONSE to [30] MOTION for Discovery, filed by USA. Reply due by 8/1/2005. Service: 7/20/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 7/20/2005, Entered: 7/22/2005 Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                                                                                  ***Attorney Scott Thomas Kragie for ALOHA AIRLINES, INC. added. Attorney Karen R. Harbaugh terminated. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 36 Filed: 7/18/2005, Entered: 7/20/2005 Order on Motion for HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [35] Motion for Status Conference. Hearing set for 7/19/2005 at 2:00 PM in National Courts Building before Judge Charles F. Lettow. The deadline for filing motion for summary judgment on the administrative record is suspended pending the status conference. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 35 Filed: 7/18/2005, Entered: 7/20/2005, Terminated: 7/18/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time until 7/25/2005 to File a Dispositive Motion, MOTION for Status Conference, filed by USA.Service: 7/15/2005. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 34 Filed: 7/15/2005, Entered: 7/19/2005 Administrative Record (Supplement)
                                                                                                                        **SEALED**SUPPLEMENT (volume III) to the ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD, filed by USA. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 33 Filed: 7/15/2005, Entered: 7/19/2005 Order on Motion to Supplement the Administrative RCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [19] Motion to Supplement the Administrative Record. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 32 Filed: 7/15/2005, Entered: 7/19/2005 Order on Motion to ExpediteCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [29] Motion to Expedite Admissions Under the Protective Order. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 31 Filed: 7/15/2005, Entered: 7/19/2005 Redacted Document
                                                                                                                              **SEALED**PROPOSED REDACTED DOCUMENT by ASIA PACIFIC AIRLINES redacting [30] MOTION for Discovery. Service: 7/15/2005 by hand.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 30 Filed: 7/15/2005, Entered: 7/19/2005, Terminated: 7/25/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                **SEALED** MOTION for Limited Discovery, filed by ASIA PACIFIC AIRLINES. Service: 7/15/2005 by hand. Response due by 7/29/2005. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 29 Filed: 7/14/2005, Entered: 7/18/2005, Terminated: 7/15/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Expedite Admissions Under the Protective Order, filed by ALOHA AIRLINES, INC. Service: 7/14/2005. Response due by 8/1/2005. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 28 Filed: 7/14/2005, Entered: 7/18/2005 Application for Access to Protected Material
                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Marshall S. Sinick by ALOHA AIRLINES, INC. Service: 7/14/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 27 Filed: 7/14/2005, Entered: 7/18/2005 Application for Access to Protected Material
                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Karen R. Harbaugh by ALOHA AIRLINES, INC. Service: 7/14/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 26 Filed: 7/14/2005, Entered: 7/18/2005 Application for Access to Protected Material
                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Scott T. Kragie by ALOHA AIRLINES, INC. Service: 7/14/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 25 Filed: 7/14/2005, Entered: 7/18/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Expedite Admission Under Protective Order, filed by ALPINE AIR, CORPORATE AIR. Service: 7/13/2005. Response due by 8/1/2005. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 24 Filed: 7/14/2005, Entered: 7/18/2005 Application for Access to Protected Material
                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by L. James D'Agostino by ASIA PACIFIC AIRLINES. Service: 7/8/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 23 Filed: 7/14/2005, Entered: 7/18/2005 Application for Access to Protected Material
                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Richard L. Moorhouse by ASIA PACIFIC AIRLINES. Service: 7/8/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 22 Filed: 7/14/2005, Entered: 7/18/2005 Application for Access to Protected Material
                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by David T. Hickey by ASIA PACIFIC AIRLINES. Service: 7/8/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 21 Filed: 7/14/2005, Entered: 7/18/2005 Order on Motion to InterveneCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [15] Motion to Intervene, granting [16] Motion to Intervene, granting [18] Motion For Access to Information Under Protective Order by Outside Counsel (Joanne W. Young and David M. Kirstein) and Waiver of Two Business Day Requirement Under July 5, 2005 Protective Order, granting [20] Motion for Leave to File Facsimile Signature. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 20 Filed: 7/13/2005, Entered: 7/15/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Facsimile Signature, filed by ASIA PACIFIC AIRLINES. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE]Service: 7/1/2005. Response due by 7/18/2005. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 19 Filed: 7/13/2005, Entered: 7/14/2005, Terminated: 7/15/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Supplement the Administrative Record re: [11] Administrative Record, filed by USA. Service: 7/13/2005. Response due by 8/1/2005. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 18 Filed: 7/13/2005, Entered: 7/14/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                        MOTION For Access to Information Under Protective Order by Outside Counsel (Joanne W. Young and David M. Kirstein) and Waiver of Two Business Day Requirement Under July 5, 2005 Protective Order, filed by ASIA PACIFIC AIRLINES. Service: 7/11/2005. Response due by 7/28/2005. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 17 Filed: 7/11/2005, Entered: 7/14/2005 Proposed Redacted Document
                                                                                                                                                          PROPOSED REDACTED Memorandum in Support of [16] MOTION to Intervene filed by ALOHA AIRLINES, INC.. FILED UNDER SEAL. Service: 7/11/05 by hand.(dls )
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 16 Filed: 7/11/2005, Entered: 7/14/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Intervene filed by ALOHA AIRLINES, INC..Service: 7/11/05 by hand. Response due by 7/25/2005. FILED UNDER SEAL.(dls )
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 15 Filed: 7/11/2005, Entered: 7/13/2005, Terminated: 7/14/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Intervene, filed by ALPINE AIR, CORPORATE AIR.Service: 7/11/2005. Response due by 7/28/2005. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 14 Filed: 7/8/2005, Entered: 7/12/2005 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT, filed by USA. Service: 7/5/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 13 Filed: 7/8/2005, Entered: 7/12/2005 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [10] Motion for Leave to File Status Report. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 12 Filed: 7/8/2005, Entered: 7/11/2005 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of filing re [11] Administrative Record, filed by USA.Service: 7/8/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 11 Filed: 7/8/2005, Entered: 7/11/2005 Administrative Record
                                                                                                                                                                      **SEALED**ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD (two volumes), filed by USA. Service: 7/8/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 10 Filed: 7/6/2005, Entered: 7/8/2005, Terminated: 7/8/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Status Report, filed by USA. Service: 7/5/2005. Response due by 7/22/2005. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 7/6/2005, Entered: 7/11/2005 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT(pg 1-48) of Proceedings held on 7/1/05 before Judge Charles F. Lettow. (eph, )
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 9 Filed: 7/5/2005, Entered: 7/7/2005 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER: Administrative Record due 7/8/2005. Dispositive Motion(s) due by 7/18/2005. Cross Motions due by 7/22/2005. Response due by 7/26/2005. Reply due by 7/29/2005. Motion Hearing set for 8/3/2005 at 10:00 AM in National Courts Building before Judge Charles F. Lettow. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 8 Filed: 7/5/2005, Entered: 7/7/2005 Protective OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 7 Filed: 7/5/2005, Entered: 7/7/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Michael Mager for USA. Service: 7/5/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 6 Filed: 7/1/2005, Entered: 7/6/2005 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [3] Motion for Leave to File Complaint Under Seal. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 5 Filed: 7/1/2005, Entered: 7/6/2005 Order Setting Oral Argument/Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion [4] MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order: Motion Hearing set for 7/1/2005 at 3:00 PM in National Courts Building before Judge Charles F. Lettow. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 4 Filed: 7/1/2005, Entered: 7/1/2005, Terminated: 10/5/2005 Motion for TRO
                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by ASIA PACIFIC AIRLINES.Service: 7/1/05 by hand. Response due by 7/15/2005. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 3 Filed: 7/1/2005, Entered: 7/1/2005, Terminated: 7/1/2005 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Complaint Under Seal filed by ASIA PACIFIC AIRLINES. (Service - by hand - 7/1/2005) Response due by 7/15/2005. (jat, ) Modified on 7/1/2005 (jat, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 2 Filed: 7/1/2005, Entered: 7/1/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          Case Assigned to Judge Charles F. Lettow. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 7/1/2005, Entered: 7/1/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT against USA (PS) ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 063154), filed by ASIA PACIFIC AIRLINES.Answer Due by 8/30/2005.(jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 7/1/2005, Entered: 7/1/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                              Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 7/6/2005. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 7/1/2005, Entered: 7/1/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 7/15/2005. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 326 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?