LAUDER et al v. SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:05-vv-00721-UNJ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo KRISTA LAUDER, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Whitfield Sharp & Sharp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elaine Whitfield Sharp +1 781 629 1862 +1 781 333 4157 elainesharp@sharplaw.biz
No Logo Thomas Cook Intellectual Property, Petitioner
Officially listed as "THOMAS COOK"

Toggle Switch Represented by Whitfield Sharp & Sharp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elaine Whitfield Sharp +1 781 629 1862 +1 781 333 4157 elainesharp@sharplaw.biz
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lynn Elizabeth Ricciardella +1 202 616 4356 lynn.ricciardella@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 7/5/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 483 - Death - Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 300 Vaccine Injury Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Vaccine - Dismissed by Special Master
County None
Terminated 7/5/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ECF
  Entries (43) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/27/2007, Entered: 3/29/2007 Notice of Designation of Electronic Case
NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (tjk, )
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 39 Filed: 3/27/2007, Entered: 3/29/2007 Order
    ORDER re This case is hereby converted to ECF. All subsequent filings shall be submitted through the CM/ECF System. Signed by Special Master Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. (tjk, )
      LREF
      Blank 38 Filed: 3/22/2007, Entered: 4/4/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
      MOTION to convert to ECF, filed by KRISTA LAUDER, THOMAS COOK. Service: 3/14/07. (tjk, ) ).
        LREF
        Blank 37 Filed: 10/2/2006, Entered: 10/2/2006
        ORDER re Petitioner's outstanding motion to amend the case caption. Signed by Special Master Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. (tjk, )
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 9/26/2006, Entered: 9/26/2006
          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Patricia E. Campbell-Smith : A telephonic Status Conference was held on 9/20/2006 from 2:00 until 2:15. Ms. Elaine Sharpe represented petitioner and Ms. Lynn Ricciardella represented respondent. (cc2, )
            LREF
            Blank 36 Filed: 8/21/2006, Entered: 8/24/2006 Petitioner's Election to Accept Judgment
            Petitioner's Election to Accept [32] Judgment. Service: 8/18/06.(tjk, )
              LREF
              Blank 35 Filed: 8/21/2006, Entered: 8/24/2006 Motion to Amend/Correct
              MOTION to Amend the case caption , filed by KRISTA LAUDER, THOMAS COOK. Service: 8/18/06.Response due by 9/7/2006. (tjk, )
                LREF
                Blank 34 Filed: 8/21/2006, Entered: 8/24/2006 Petitioner's Election to Accept Judgment
                Petitioner's Election to Accept [32] Judgment. Service: 8/18/06.(dls )
                  LREF
                  Blank 33 Filed: 8/21/2006, Entered: 8/24/2006 Motion to Amend/Correct
                  MOTION to Amend Caption to substitute Robert Lauder as the Administrator in place of Thomas Cook , filed by KRISTA LAUDER, THOMAS COOK. Service: 8/18/06.Response due by 9/5/2006. (dls )
                    LREF
                    Blank 32 Filed: 7/5/2006, Entered: 7/5/2006
                    JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Vaccine Rule 11(a), that the petition is dismissed without prejudice for lack of jurisdiction. (lld, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 31 Filed: 6/13/2006, Entered: 6/15/2006 ERRATA
                      ERRATA correcting [30] Decision. Signed by Special Master Patricia Campbell-Smith. (tjk, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 30 Filed: 5/31/2006, Entered: 5/31/2006
                        DECISION Signed by Special Master Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. (tjk, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 29 Filed: 5/4/2006, Entered: 5/8/2006 Order
                          ORDER re Petitioner's fax received by the court on 4/3/06 is attached to this order and filed by leave of the Special Master. Signed by Special Master Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. (tjk, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 28 Filed: 4/20/2006, Entered: 4/21/2006 notice of filing
                            NOTICE OF FILING Affidavit of Philip A. Ignelzi by KRISTA LAUDER, THOMAS COOK. Service: 4/10/06.(tjk, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 27 Filed: 4/6/2006, Entered: 4/12/2006 Notice of Intent to Remain in the Program
                              NOTICE OF FILING: NOTICE OF INTENT to Remain in the Program by Petitioner. Service: 3/04/06.(tjk, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 26 Filed: 4/5/2006, Entered: 4/12/2006 Order
                                ORDER re: Petitioner's Exhibit #10- Affidavit of Attorney Philip A. Ignelzi is hereby filed by leave of the special master and attached to this order. Signed by Special Master Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. (tjk, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 25 Filed: 4/4/2006, Entered: 4/12/2006 Order
                                  ORDER re: The 3/30/06 letter from petitioner's counsel attached to this order is hereby filed by leave of the undersigned. Signed by Special Master Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. (tjk, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 24 Filed: 3/31/2006, Entered: 4/6/2006 Order
                                    ORDER re Upon issuance of a decision in this matter should further proceedings to be necessary, the court will contact the parties. Signed by Special Master Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. (tjk, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 23 Filed: 3/30/2006, Entered: 4/5/2006 Response
                                      RESPONSE to [22] Notice of Filing , filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 3/30/06. (tjk, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 22 Filed: 3/30/2006, Entered: 4/4/2006 notice of filing
                                        NOTICE OF FILING Brief on "Relation Back" of the facts within a complaint to the filing of a Pennsylvania Praecipe for a Writ of Summons by KRISTA LAUDER, THOMAS COOK. Service: 3/23/06.(tjk, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 21 Filed: 3/30/2006, Entered: 4/4/2006 Terminated:
                                          MOTION for alternative relief in the form of an extention of time in which to clarify the record in the Pennsylvania Courts , filed by KRISTA LAUDER, THOMAS COOK. Service: 3/24/06. Response due by 4/10/2006. (tjk, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 3/30/2006, Entered: 3/30/2006
                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Patricia E. Campbell-Smith : A Telephonic Status Conference was held on March 30, 2006, from 2:00 to 3:00 p.m. Ms. Elaine Whitfield Sharp represented petitioner and Ms. Lynn Ricciardella represented respondent. (als, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 20 Filed: 3/7/2006, Entered: 3/14/2006 Description not available
                                              ORDER: Peitioner's counsel's brief shall be faxed to the court and to respondent's counsel by no later than 10:00 AM on Monday, 3/27/06, and mailed for filing the same day. Respondent's brief shall be faxed to petitioner's counsel by no later than 10:00 AM on Thursday, 3/30/06. The Brief shall be mailed the same day. Telephonic Status Conference set for 3/30/2006 02:00 PM before Special Master Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. Signed by Special Master Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. (tjk, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 3/6/2006, Entered: 3/6/2006
                                                Minute Entry or proceedings held before Special Master Patricia E. Campbell-Smith : A Telephonic Status Conference was held on March 6, 2006, at 2:00 p.m. Ms. Elaine Whitfield Sharp represented petitioner and Ms. Lynn Ricciardella represented respondent. (als, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 19 Filed: 3/2/2006, Entered: 3/8/2006 Notice Regarding Statutory Requirement
                                                  ORDER re: the statutory 240-day time period for the special master's issuance of a decision in this case has expired. Petitioner may submit a notice continuing or withdrawing the petition and such notice shall be filed within 30 days. Signed by Special Master Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. (tjk, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 18 Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: 3/7/2006 Description not available
                                                    STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference set for 3/6/2006 02:00 PM before Special Master Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. Signed by Special Master Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. (tjk, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 17 Filed: 2/24/2006, Entered: 2/27/2006 Description not available
                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER: Petitioner's counsel shall file a Response to respondent's February 9, 2006 Response to Petitioner's Reply Brief by no later than 2/24/06. Signed by Special Master Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. (tjk, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 16 Filed: 2/23/2006, Entered: 2/27/2006 Surreply
                                                        SUR-REPLY re [11] Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, [5] Order to Show Cause, [3] Order to Show Cause,, [10] MOTION for Extension of Time until 2/16/2006 to File Response or Reply as to [9] Response to Supplemental Brief, filed by KRISTA LAUDER, THOMAS COOK. Service: 2/23/06. (tjk, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 15 Filed: 2/16/2006, Entered: 2/22/2006 Description not available
                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER: Petitioner's counsel shall file a Response to Respondent's 2/09/06 Response to Petitioner's Reply Brief no later than 2/23/06. Signed by Special Master Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. (tjk, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 14 Filed: 2/9/2006, Entered: 2/13/2006 Response
                                                            RESPONSE to [12] Petitioner's Reply Brief, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 2/09/06. (tjk, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 13 Filed: 2/8/2006, Entered: 2/10/2006 Order Reassigning Case Special Master
                                                              ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Special Master Patricia E. Campbell-Smith for all further proceedings. Special Master Margaret M. Sweeney no longer assigned to case Signed by Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. (tjk, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 12 Filed: 1/17/2006, Entered: 1/18/2006 notice of filing
                                                                NOTICE OF FILING [Petitioner's Reply Brief to [9] arguing why this case should not be dismissed or in the alternative, should be dismissed without prejudice] by KRISTA LAUDER, THOMAS COOK. Service: 1/13/06.(tjk, ) Modified on 1/18/2006 (tjk, ).
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 11 Filed: 1/4/2006, Entered: 1/6/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER granting [10] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [9] Response to Supplemental Brief. Reply due by 2/15/2006. Signed by Judge Gary J. Golkiewicz. (mb2, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 10 Filed: 12/29/2005, Entered: 1/3/2006, Terminated: 1/4/2006 Terminated:
                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time until 2/16/2006 to File Response or Reply as to [9] Response to Supplemental Brief , filed by KRISTA LAUDER. Service: 12/27/2005. Response due by 1/13/2006. (mb2, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 9 Filed: 12/16/2005, Entered: 12/19/2005 Response to Supplemental Brief
                                                                      RESPONDENT'S Responsive brief to [6] PETITIONER'S RESPONSE TO [5] ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 12/16/05. (tjk, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 8 Filed: 11/21/2005, Entered: 11/28/2005 Description not available
                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER: Respondent's counsel shall file a responsive brief to [6] PETITIONER'S RESPONSE TO [5] ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Response due by 12/16/2005. Signed by Special Master Margaret Sweeney. (tjk, )
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 7 Filed: 11/21/2005, Entered: 11/28/2005 notice of filing
                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING Amended/Corrected version of [6] RESPONSE TO [5] ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, by KRISTA LAUDER, THOMAS COOK. Service: 11/17/05.(tjk, ) Modified on 11/28/2005 (tjk, ).
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 11/16/2005, Entered: 11/21/2005 Response to Order to Show Cause
                                                                            RESPONSE TO [5] ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, filed by KRISTA LAUDER, THOMAS COOK. Service: 11/14/05. (tjk, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 10/13/2005, Entered: 11/17/2005 Order to Show Cause
                                                                              ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Petitioner shall file a response to the Order to Show Cause no later than 11/14/05. Signed by Special Master Margaret Sweeney. (tjk, )
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 7/18/2005, Entered: 7/21/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Lynn Elizabeth Ricciardella for SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 7/18/05.(tjk, )
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 7/13/2005, Entered: 7/20/2005 Order to Show Cause
                                                                                  ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE The court directs petitioner, within 90 days by 10/13/05, to show cause why this petition should not be dismissed as untimely filed pursuant to 42 U.S.C. section 300aa-16(a)(3). Upon the filing of petitioner's submission, respondent shall be provided with an opportunity to respond. Signed by Special Master Margaret Sweeney. (tjk, )
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 7/5/2005, Entered: 7/6/2005 Notice Of Assignment
                                                                                    NOTICE of Assignment to Special Master Margaret Sweeney. (tjk, )
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 7/5/2005, Entered: 7/6/2005 Petition
                                                                                      PETITION against SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES [Filed with Volumes I-III] (Filing fee $250, Receipt number 063210) , filed by KRISTA LAUDER, THOMAS COOK.Respondents Report Due by 10/3/2005.(tjk, )
                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                        This case has been viewed 147 times.

                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                        Space
                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                         
                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                        Need Password Help?