BRYAN v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:05-cv-00734-RHH
District Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr., presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo ROBERTA J. BRYAN, Plaintiff

Represented by Law Office of E D Lerman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kevin Andrew Snider +1 901 751 3777 +1 901 759 0041 snider@lawyer.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Sinclair Groat +1 202 616 8260 +1 202 514 7965 jack.groat@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 7/8/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 354 - Military Pay - SBP
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed
County None
Terminated 7/23/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ECF
  Entries (28) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 28 Filed: 7/23/2007, Entered: 7/23/2007
JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed. (lld)
    LREF
    Legal Document 27 Filed: 7/23/2007, Entered: 7/23/2007 Court Filing
    UNPUBLISHED OPINION and ORDER. The Clerk is directed to dismiss this case effective today and enter judgment. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (SWF)
      LREF
      Legal Document 26 Filed: 6/12/2007, Entered: 6/12/2007 Court Filing
      STATUS REPORT ORDER Status Report due by 6/21/2007 Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (kmg)
        LREF
        Legal Document 25 Filed: 2/22/2007, Entered: 2/22/2007 Court Filing
        STATUS REPORT ORDER Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (kmg, )
          LREF
          Legal Document 24 Filed: 2/21/2007, Entered: 2/21/2007
          STATUS REPORT, filed by ROBERTA J. BRYAN. (Groat, John)
            LREF
            Legal Document 23 Filed: 2/8/2007, Entered: 2/8/2007 Court Filing
            STATUS REPORT ORDER Status Report due by 2/16/2007 Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (kmg, )
              LREF
              Legal Document 22 Filed: 8/1/2006, Entered: 8/2/2006 Terminated:
              Unopposed MOTION to Stay all proceedings , filed by USA. Service: 7/26/2006.Response due by 8/18/2006.(mij, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/2/2006 (mij, ).
                LREF
                Legal Document 21 Filed: 8/1/2006, Entered: 8/1/2006 Court Filing
                ORDER Defendant's unopposed motion to stay proceedings is GRANTED. Status report is due no later than August 16. Reminder to parties that all future filings must be filed electronically. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (swf, )
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 20 Filed: 7/17/2006, Entered: 7/17/2006
                  NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (mb2, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 19 Filed: 7/17/2006, Entered: 7/17/2006 Court Filing
                    ORDER directing the Clerk to designate this case as an electronic (ECF) case. All future filings will be in electronic form. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (mb2, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 18 Filed: 7/11/2006, Entered: 7/13/2006 Order on Motion to ContinueCourt Filing
                      ORDER granting [17] Motion to Continue Parties shall file Status Report no later than 7/29/2006. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (lld, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 17 Filed: 7/7/2006, Entered: 7/10/2006, Terminated: 7/11/2006 Terminated:
                        MOTION to Continue the Stay of all Proceedings, filed by USA. Service: 7/7/2006.Response due by 7/24/2006.(mb2, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 16 Filed: 5/30/2006, Entered: 6/5/2006 Order on Motion to StayCourt Filing
                          ORDER granting [15] Motion to Stay. Status Report due by 7/8/2006. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (mb2, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 15 Filed: 5/22/2006, Entered: 5/30/2006, Terminated: 5/30/2006 Terminated:
                            MOTION to Stay the proceedings , filed by USA. Service: 5/22/2006.Response due by 6/8/2006.(mb2, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 14 Filed: 5/16/2006, Entered: 5/22/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                              ORDER granting [13] Motion for Extension of Time.Dispositive Motion(s) due by 5/22/2006. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (mb2, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 13 Filed: 5/8/2006, Entered: 5/15/2006, Terminated: 5/16/2006 Terminated:
                                MOTION for Extension of Time until 5/22/2006 to File a Dispositive Motion , filed by USA. Service: 5/8/2006.Response due by 5/25/2006.(mb2, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 12 Filed: 5/3/2006, Entered: 5/9/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                                  ORDER granting [11] Motion for Extension of Time.Dispositive Motion(s) due by 5/8/2006. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (mb2, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 11 Filed: 4/27/2006, Entered: 5/1/2006, Terminated: 5/3/2006 Terminated:
                                    MOTION for Extension of Time until 5/8/2006 to File a Dispositive Motion , filed by USA. Service: 4/27/2006. Response due by 5/15/2006.(mb2, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 10 Filed: 2/27/2006, Entered: 3/2/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                                      ORDER granting [9] Motion for Extension of Time. Dispositive Motion(s) due by 4/28/2006. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (mb2, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 9 Filed: 2/23/2006, Entered: 2/27/2006, Terminated: 2/27/2006 Terminated:
                                        MOTION for Extension of Time until 4/28/2006 to File a Dispositive Motion , filed by USA. Service: 2/23/2006. Response due by 3/13/2006. (mb2, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 8 Filed: 2/23/2006, Entered: 2/24/2006 Decision by Agency
                                          DECISION on Remand by the Department of the Navy. Copy to parties and judge. (dls)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 7 Filed: 10/27/2005, Entered: 11/14/2005 Order on Motion to RemandCourt Filing
                                            ORDER granting [6] Motion to Remand; directing the Clerk to remand this case to the Board for Correction of Naval Records for a period not to exceed six months, with defendant's answer to be due concurrently with the remand deadline if the parties do not resolve this matter before then. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. Certified copy of order forwarded to the BCNR. (dls)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 6 Filed: 10/21/2005, Entered: 10/25/2005, Terminated: 10/27/2005 Terminated:
                                              MOTION to Remand, filed by USA. Service: 10/21/2005. Response due by 11/7/2005. (mb2, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 5 Filed: 9/1/2005, Entered: 9/1/2005
                                                ORDER granting [4] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer Due by 10/21/2005. (signed by the Clerk) (dls )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 4 Filed: 8/31/2005, Entered: 9/1/2005, Terminated: 9/1/2005 Terminated:
                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint until 10/21/2005 filed by USA.Service: 8/31/05. (dls )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 3 Filed: 7/25/2005, Entered: 7/27/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by John Sinclair Groat for USA. Service: 7/25/2005.(mb2, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 2 Filed: 7/8/2005, Entered: 7/11/2005 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                                                      NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.. (dw1)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 7/8/2005, Entered: 7/11/2005 Complaint
                                                        COMPLAINT against USA (NAV) (Filing fee $250, Receipt number 063190), filed by ROBERT A. BRYAN. Answer Due by 9/6/2005.(dw1)
                                                          LREF

                                                          Statistics

                                                          This case has been viewed 92 times.

                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                          Space
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                           
                                                          PlainSite
                                                          Sign Up
                                                          Need Password Help?