AMERICAN FUEL CELL AND COATED FABRICS COMPANY v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:05-cv-00741-BAF
District Judge Bohdan A. Futey, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo American Fuel Cell And Coated Fabrics Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by kkcnet.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert A. Klimek, Jr. +1 202 785 0491 +1 202 659 9852 rklimek@kkcnet.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Frank Jefferson Hughes +1 202 305 3067 +1 202 514 8640 jeff.hughes@usdoj.gov
No Logo Gta Containers, Inc., Intervenor-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by McKenna Long & Aldridge LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas Christopher Papson +1 202 496 7500 +1 202 496 7756 tpapson@mckennalong.com
Office COFC
Filed 7/11/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 140 - Contract - Injunction (Post Award)
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County None
Terminated 9/6/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 11 Filed: 9/6/2005, Entered: 9/12/2005 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by AMERICAN FUEL CELL AND COATED FABRICS COMPANY. Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(i) this day. (dls )
    LREF
    Blank 10 Filed: 8/2/2005, Entered: 8/4/2005 Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1
    Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement, filed by GTA CONTAINERS, INC. Service: 7/25/2005.(mb2, )
      LREF
      Blank 9 Filed: 8/2/2005, Entered: 8/4/2005 Order on Motion to InterveneCourt Filing
      ORDER granting [8] Motion to Intervene. Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (mb2, )
        LREF
        Blank 8 Filed: 7/25/2005, Entered: 7/27/2005, Terminated: 8/2/2005 Terminated:
        MOTION to Intervene, filed by GTA CONTAINERS, INC. Service: 7/25/2005. Response due by 8/11/2005. (mb2, )
          LREF
          Blank 7 Filed: 7/19/2005, Entered: 7/22/2005 Order on Motion to WithdrawCourt Filing
          ORDER granting [6] Motion to Withdraw [2] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (mb2, )
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 7/19/2005, Entered: 7/22/2005 Set/Reset Deadlines:
            Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer Due by 9/9/2005. GTA Container Inc., the awardee, may by motion, intervene in this case and thereafter file its response to plaintiff's complaint by 9/9/2005. (mb2, )
              LREF
              Blank 6 Filed: 7/15/2005, Entered: 7/19/2005, Terminated: 7/19/2005 Terminated:
              MOTION to Withdraw [2] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, filed by AMERICAN FUEL CELL AND COATED FABRICS COMPANY.Service: 7/15/2005. Response due by 8/1/2005. (mb2, ) Modified to correct Response due date on 7/19/2005 (mb2, ).
                LREF
                Blank 5 Filed: 7/13/2005, Entered: 7/15/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER: Plaintiff shall inform the Court by 7/18/2005 of its intention concerning further proceedings. Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (mb2, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 4 Filed: 7/12/2005, Entered: 7/14/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                  NOTICE of Appearance by Frank Jefferson Hughes for USA. Service: 7/12/2005.(mb2, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 3 Filed: 7/11/2005, Entered: 7/11/2005 Court Filing
                    NOTICE of Assignment to Senior Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (dw1)
                      LREF
                      Blank 2 Filed: 7/11/2005, Entered: 7/11/2005, Terminated: 9/6/2005 Motion for Preliminary Injunction
                      MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by AMERICAN FUEL CELL AND COATED FABRICS COMPANY, w/memorandum in support. Service by hand: 7/11/05. Response due by 7/25/2005. (dw1)
                        LREF
                        Blank 1 Filed: 7/11/2005, Entered: 7/11/2005
                        COMPLAINT against USA (ARM) (Filing fee $250, Receipt number 063199), filed by USA. Answer Due by 9/9/2005.(dw1)
                          LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 137 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?