ROMINGER v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:05-cv-00742-NBF
District Judge Nancy B. Firestone, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo CHRISTOPHER N. ROMINGER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by PO Box 2517

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James A. Endicott +1 254 698 1500
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Leslie Cayer Ohta +1 202 307 0252 +1 202 307 0972 leslie.ohta@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 7/11/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 352 - Military Pay - Retirement
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County None
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Pending Status ADRstart
Flags ADR, AUTO
  Entries (43) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 42 Filed: 7/30/2008, Entered: 7/31/2008 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
STATUS REPORT ORDER Plaintiff's Status Report due by 8/13/2008. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (bre, )
    LREF
    Blank 41 Filed: 2/12/2008, Entered: 2/13/2008 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER continuing stay of proceedings and directing plaintiff to file a Status Report by 6/30/2008. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (dls)
      LREF
      Blank 40 Filed: 2/8/2008, Entered: 2/8/2008
      SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL STATUS REPORT, filed by CHRISTOPHER N. ROMINGER. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 2/6/2008.(bre, )
        LREF
        Blank 39 Filed: 10/31/2007, Entered: 10/31/2007 Court Filing
        STATUS REPORT ORDER:Plaintiff's Status Report due by 1/28/2008 Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (bre,)
          LREF
          Blank 38 Filed: 10/26/2007, Entered: 10/29/2007 Status Report
          SUPPLEMENTAL STATUS REPORT, filed by CHRISTOPHER N. ROMINGER. Service: 10/26/2007.(bre,)
            LREF
            Blank 37 Filed: 8/1/2007, Entered: 8/2/2007 Notice of Appearance/
            NOTICE of Appearance by Leslie Cayer Ohta for USA. Service: 8/1/2007.(bre,)
              LREF
              Blank 36 Filed: 7/26/2007, Entered: 7/26/2007 Court Filing
              STATUS REPORT ORDERThe above captioned case remains STAYED. Plaintiff Status Report due by 10/26/2007 Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (bre,)
                LREF
                Blank 35 Filed: 7/25/2007, Entered: 7/25/2007
                STATUS REPORT, filed by CHRISTOPHER N. ROMINGER. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 7/13/2007.(bre,)
                  LREF
                  Blank 34 Filed: 3/27/2007, Entered: 3/28/2007 Order on Motion to StayCourt Filing
                  ORDER granting [33] Motion to StayStatus Report due by 7/13/2007 Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (bre,)
                    LREF
                    Blank 33 Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: 3/26/2007, Terminated: 3/27/2007 Terminated:
                    UNOPPOSED MOTION to Stay these proceedings for 120 days to permit plaintiff to receive a reconsideration decision from the Army Board for Correction of Military Records [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE], filed by CHRISTOPHER N. ROMINGER. Service: 3/14/2007.(bre, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 32 Filed: 3/1/2007, Entered: 3/2/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER:The court will consider this case closed unless the plaintiff informs the court that he is seeking further review of the ABCMR's decision by 3/15/2007. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (mb2, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 31 Filed: 2/28/2007, Entered: 2/28/2007 Court Filing
                        DECISION ON REMAND of the Army Board for Correction of Military Records regarding Plaintiff. Copies to the Parties and the Judge. 2/28/2007.(bre,)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 7/21/2006, Entered: 7/21/2006
                          Administrative Record Returned to defendant's counsel for return to agency pursuant to RCFC 52.2(a)(4). (dls )
                            LREF
                            Blank 30 Filed: 7/20/2006, Entered: 7/20/2006 Court Filing
                            PUBLISHED OPINION DENYING [21] MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by USA; DENYING [25] CROSS MOTION filed by CHRISTOPHER N. ROMINGER; and REMANDING case to the ABCMR for a period of 120 days. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (dls )
                              LREF
                              Blank 29 Filed: 5/30/2006, Entered: 6/2/2006 Reply to Response to Motion
                              REPLY to Response to Motion re [25] CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [21] Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by USA, , filed by CHRISTOPHER N. ROMINGER. Service: 5/27/2006.(mb2, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 28 Filed: 5/17/2006, Entered: 5/23/2006 Response to Cross Motion [Dispositive]Court Filing
                                RESPONSE and reply to [25] CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [21] Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by USA, by leave of the Judge.Reply due by 5/30/2006. Service: 5/12/2006.(dw1)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 27 Filed: 5/17/2006, Entered: 5/23/2006 Terminated: Court Filing
                                  MOTION for Extension of Time until May 12, 2006 to File Response to [25] CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [21] Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by USA, by leave of the Judge. Service: 5/11/2006.Response due by 5/30/2006.(dw1)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 26 Filed: 4/6/2006, Entered: 4/10/2006 Statement of Facts
                                    COUNTER STATEMENT OF FACTS re: [22] Statement of Facts, filed by CHRISTOPHER N. ROMINGER. Service: 4/6/2006.(mb2, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 25 Filed: 4/6/2006, Entered: 4/10/2006 Terminated:
                                      CROSS MOTION and separate RESPONSE to [21] Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record, , filed by CHRISTOPHER N. ROMINGER. Service: 4/6/2006. Response due by 5/8/2006.(mb2, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 24 Filed: 3/10/2006, Entered: 3/14/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                        ORDER granting [23] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re [21] MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record. Cross-Motion and Response due by 4/7/2006. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (mb2, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 23 Filed: 3/8/2006, Entered: 3/10/2006, Terminated: 3/10/2006 Terminated:
                                          MOTION for Extension of Time until 4/7/2006 to File Response as to [21] MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record , filed by CHRISTOPHER N. ROMINGER. Service: 3/7/2006. Response due by 3/24/2006. (mb2, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 22 Filed: 2/6/2006, Entered: 2/8/2006 Statement of Facts
                                            STATEMENT OF FACTS re: [21] Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record, filed by USA. Service: 2/6/2006.(mb2, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 21 Filed: 2/6/2006, Entered: 2/8/2006 Terminated:
                                              MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record , filed by USA. Service: 2/6/2006. Response due by 3/10/2006. (mb2, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 20 Filed: 2/1/2006, Entered: 2/6/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                                                ORDER granting [19] Motion for Extension of Time. Brief due by 2/6/2006. Cross Motions due by 3/10/2006. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (mb2, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 19 Filed: 1/30/2006, Entered: 1/31/2006, Terminated: 2/1/2006 Terminated:
                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time until 2/6/2006 to File the Opening Brief , filed by USA. Service: 1/30/2006. Response due by 2/16/2006. (mb2, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 18 Filed: 1/11/2006, Entered: 1/18/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER granting [14] Motion for Extension of Time Brief due by 1/30/2006. Cross Motions due by 3/3/2006. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (mb2, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 17 Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: 1/12/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                      NOTICE of Filing, filed by USA re [16] Administrative Record. Service: 1/9/2006.(mb2, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 16 Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: 1/12/2006 Administrative Record
                                                        ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD, filed by USA. Service: 1/9/2006.(mb2, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 15 Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: 1/12/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER granting [13] Motion for Extension of Time.Administrative Record due 1/10/2006. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (mb2, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 14 Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: 1/10/2006, Terminated: 1/11/2006 Terminated:
                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time until 1/30/2006 to File a Dispositive Motion , filed by USA. Service: 1/6/2005. Response due by 1/23/2006. (mb2, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 13 Filed: 1/3/2006, Entered: 1/5/2006, Terminated: 1/6/2006 Terminated:
                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time until 1/10/2006 to File the Stipulated Administrative Record , filed by USA. Service: 1/3/2006. Response due by 1/20/2006. (mb2, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 12 Filed: 12/19/2005, Entered: 12/23/2005 Terminated:
                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time until 01/03/2006 to File Stipulated Administrative Record , filed by USA. Service: 12/19/2005. Response due by 1/5/2006. (lld, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 11 Filed: 12/15/2005, Entered: 12/20/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER granting [10] Motion for Extension of Time.Administrative Record due 12/18/2005. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (mb2, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 10 Filed: 12/7/2005, Entered: 12/13/2005, Terminated: 12/15/2005 Terminated:
                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time until 12/18/2005 to File the Administrative Record , filed by USA. Service: 12/7/2005. Response due by 12/27/2005. (mb2, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 9 Filed: 11/7/2005, Entered: 11/9/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER: Initiation of ADR proceedings is hereby deferred. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mb2, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 8 Filed: 10/5/2005, Entered: 10/7/2005 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER: Defendant's Administrative Record due 12/7/2005. Defendant Brief due by 1/9/2006. Plaintiff's Cross Motions due by 2/8/2006. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (dw1)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 7 Filed: 9/29/2005, Entered: 9/30/2005 Status Conference OrderCourt Filing
                                                                          STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 10/4/2005 at 10:00 AM before Judge Nancy B. Firestone. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (mb2, )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 9/7/2005, Entered: 9/13/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER granting [5] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Answer Due by 11/11/2005. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (mb2, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 9/2/2005, Entered: 9/13/2005, Terminated: 9/7/2005 Terminated:
                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint until 10/11/2005, filed by USA. Service: 9/2/2005. Response due by 9/19/2005. (mb2, )
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 7/25/2005, Entered: 7/27/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by John Sinclair Groat for USA. Service: 7/25/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 7/11/2005, Entered: 7/11/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                  NOTICE of Assignment to Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink for ADR Pilot proceedings. (dw1)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 7/11/2005, Entered: 7/11/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                    NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (dw1)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 7/11/2005, Entered: 7/11/2005
                                                                                      COMPLAINT against USA (ARM) (Filing fee $250, Receipt number 063200), filed by CHRISTOPHER N. ROMINGER. Answer Due by 9/9/2005.(dw1)
                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                        This case has been viewed 153 times.

                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                        Space
                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                         
                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                        Need Password Help?