GROUP SEVEN ASSOCIATES, LLC. v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:05-cv-00867-EGB
District Judge Eric G. Bruggink, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo GROUP SEVEN ASSOCIATES, LLC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by phslegal.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Timothy Aloysius Sullivan +1 215 542 2777 +1 215 542 2779 tas@phslegal.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory Thomas Jaeger +1 202 353 7955 +1 202 353 7988 gregory.jaeger@usdoj.gov
No Logo Caci, Inc., Intervenor-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Arent Fox LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard John Webber +1 202 857 6254 +1 202 857 6395 webberr@arentfox.com
Office COFC
Filed 8/5/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 140 - Contract - Injunction (Post Award)
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed
County None
Terminated 9/23/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, PROTO
  Entries (37) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 31 Filed: 10/13/2005, Entered: 10/17/2005 Published OpinionCourt Filing
PUBLISHED OPINION (Originally Filed September 23, 2005). Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mb2, )
    LREF
    Blank 30 Filed: 10/7/2005, Entered: 10/7/2005 Court Filing
    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on September 20, 2005 before Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (dw1)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 9/29/2005, Entered: 9/29/2005
      Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 10/20/2005. (vp1, )
        LREF
        Blank 29 Filed: 9/23/2005, Entered: 9/23/2005
        JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rulr 58, that the complaint is dismissed. No costs. (lld, )
          LREF
          Sealed Legal Document 28 Filed: 9/23/2005, Entered: 9/23/2005 Court Filing
          **SEALED**ORDER denying plaintiff's motion and granting defendant's and directing the Clerk to dismiss the case. No costs. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (lld, )
            LREF
            Sealed Legal Document 27 Filed: 9/16/2005, Entered: 9/20/2005 Response
            **SEALED** RESPONSE to [24] Proposed Additional Facts filed by GROUP SEVEN ASSOCIATES, LLC. Service: 9/16/2005.(mb2, )
              LREF
              Sealed Legal Document 26 Filed: 9/16/2005, Entered: 9/20/2005 Response
              **SEALED** RESPONSE to Defedant-Intervenor's Proposed Additional Facts, filed by GROUP SEVEN ASSOCIATES, LLC. Service: 9/15/2005.(mb2, )
                LREF
                Sealed Legal Document 25 Filed: 9/16/2005, Entered: 9/20/2005 Response to Cross Motion
                **SEALED**RESPONSE and reply to [23] CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [18] Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by GROUP SEVEN ASSOCIATES, LLC.. Reply due by 10/3/2005. Service: 9/16/2005.(mb2, )
                  LREF
                  Sealed Legal Document 24 Filed: 9/15/2005, Entered: 9/19/2005 Statement of Facts
                  **SEALED** COUNTER STATEMENT OF FACTS and Proposed Additional Facts re: [20] Statement of Facts, filed by USA. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 9/9/2005.(mb2, ) Modified on 9/20/2005 (mb2, ).
                    LREF
                    Sealed Legal Document 23 Filed: 9/15/2005, Entered: 9/19/2005 Terminated:
                    **SEALED** CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [18] Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by USA. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 9/9/2005. Dispositive Motion Response due by 10/11/2005.(mb2, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 22 Filed: 9/14/2005, Entered: 9/16/2005 Application for Access to Protected Material
                      APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Michael H. Payne by GROUP SEVEN ASSOCIATES, LLC. Service: 5-867.(mb2, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 21 Filed: 9/12/2005, Entered: 9/14/2005 Terminated:
                        CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [18] Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by CACI, INC. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 9/9/2005. Dispositive Motion Response due by 10/11/2005.(mb2, ) Modified on 9/14/2005 (mb2, ).
                          LREF
                          Blank 17 Filed: 9/2/2005, Entered: 9/6/2005 Application for Access to Protected Material
                          APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Timothy A. Sullivan by GROUP SEVEN ASSOCIATES, LLC. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] (mb2, )
                            LREF
                            Sealed Legal Document 20 Filed: 8/31/2005, Entered: 9/7/2005 Statement of Facts
                            **SEALED**STATEMENT OF FACTS re: [18] Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by GROUP SEVEN ASSOCIATES, LLC. Service: 8/31/2005.(mb2, )
                              LREF
                              Sealed Legal Document 19 Filed: 8/31/2005, Entered: 9/7/2005 Memorandum
                              **SEALED**MEMORANDUM re: [18] Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by GROUP SEVEN ASSOCIATES, LLC. Service: 8/31/2005.(mb2, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 18 Filed: 8/31/2005, Entered: 9/7/2005 Terminated:
                                MOTION for Summary Judgment, filed by GROUP SEVEN ASSOCIATES, LLC. Service: 8/31/2005. Dispositive Motion Response due by 9/16/2005.(mb2, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 8/31/2005, Entered: 8/31/2005
                                  TRANSCRIPT (Pg 1-18)of Proceedings held on 8/9/05 before Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (eph, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 16 Filed: 8/30/2005, Entered: 8/31/2005 Application for Access to Protected Material
                                    APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Richard J. Webber by CACI, INC. Service: 8/30/2005.(mb2, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 15 Filed: 8/30/2005, Entered: 8/31/2005 Application for Access to Protected Material
                                      APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Lisa K. Miller by CACI, INC. Service: 8/30/2005.(mb2, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 14 Filed: 8/30/2005, Entered: 8/31/2005 Application for Access to Protected Material
                                        APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Craig S. King by CACI, INC. Service: 8/30/2005.(mb2, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 8/30/2005, Entered: 8/31/2005 Transcript
                                          TRANSCRIPT (Pg 1-25)of Proceedings held on 8/17/05 before Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (eph, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 8/25/2005, Entered: 8/25/2005
                                            Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 9/9/2005. (vp1, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 8/25/2005, Entered: 8/25/2005
                                              Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 9/19/2005. (vp1, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 13 Filed: 8/24/2005, Entered: 8/26/2005 Protective OrderCourt Filing
                                                PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese for Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mb2, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 12 Filed: 8/17/2005, Entered: 8/18/2005 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER: Draft Protective Order due by 8/19/2005. Dispositive Motion due by 9/9/2005. Cross Motion and Response due by 9/16/2005. Oral Argument set for 9/20/2005 at 10:00 AM in National Courts Building before Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mb2, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 9 Filed: 8/17/2005, Entered: 8/17/2005 Court Filing
                                                    ORDER granting [7] Motion to Intervene. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (dls )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 11 Filed: 8/16/2005, Entered: 8/18/2005 ~Notice (other)
                                                      NOTICE of Filing re [10] Administrative Record, filed by USA.Service: 8/16/2005.(mb2, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Sealed Legal Document 10 Filed: 8/16/2005, Entered: 8/18/2005 Administrative Record
                                                        **SEALED**ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD (two volumes), filed by USA. Service: 8/16/2005.(mb2, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 8 Filed: 8/15/2005, Entered: 8/16/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Thomas Jaeger for USA. Service: 8/15/2005.(dw1)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 7 Filed: 8/15/2005, Entered: 8/15/2005, Terminated: 8/17/2005 Motion to Intervene
                                                            MOTION to Intervene by CACI, INC. filed [by leave of the judge].Service: 8/11/05. Response due by 8/29/2005. (dls )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 6 Filed: 8/9/2005, Entered: 8/10/2005 Order on Motion for TROCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER denying [3] Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mb2, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank -- Filed: 8/9/2005, Entered: 8/10/2005 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                                Set Deadlines/Hearings: Administrative Record due 8/16/2005. Motion Hearing set for 8/17/2005 at 10:00 AM before Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mb2, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 8/8/2005, Entered: 8/9/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle Eric Chadwick for USA. Service: 8/8/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 8/5/2005, Entered: 8/5/2005, Terminated: 9/23/2005 Motion for Preliminary Injunction
                                                                    MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by GROUP SEVEN ASSOCIATES, LLC..Service: 8/5/2005. Response due by 8/22/2005. (lg1, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 8/5/2005, Entered: 8/5/2005, Terminated: 8/9/2005 Motion for TRO
                                                                      MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by GROUP SEVEN ASSOCIATES, LLC..Service: 8/5/2005. Response due by 8/22/2005. (lg1, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 8/5/2005, Entered: 8/5/2005 Court Filing
                                                                        NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (lg1, )
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 8/5/2005, Entered: 8/5/2005
                                                                          COMPLAINT against USA (ARM) ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 063367), filed by GROUP SEVEN ASSOCIATES, LLC..Answer Due by 10/4/2005.(lg1, )
                                                                            LREF

                                                                            Space Space

                                                                            Statistics

                                                                            This case has been viewed 153 times.

                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                            Space
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                             
                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                            Need Password Help?