AMERICAN FUEL CELL AND COATED FABRICS COMPANY v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:05-cv-00870-JPW
District Judge John P. Wiese, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo American Fuel Cell And Coated Fabrics Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by kkcnet.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert A. Klimek, Jr. +1 202 785 0491 +1 202 659 9852 rklimek@kkcnet.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Frank Jefferson Hughes +1 202 305 3067 +1 202 514 8640 jeff.hughes@usdoj.gov
No Logo Gta Containers, Inc., Intervenor-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by McKenna Long & Aldridge LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas Christopher Papson +1 202 496 7500 +1 202 496 7756 tpapson@mckennalong.com
Office COFC
Filed 8/8/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 138 - Contract - (Pre Award) Injunctions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County None
Terminated 9/12/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 9 Filed: 9/12/2005, Entered: 9/22/2005 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by AMERICAN FUEL CELL AND COATED FABRICS COMPANY. Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(i) this day. Service: 9/12/05.(dls)
    LREF
    Blank 8 Filed: 8/23/2005, Entered: 8/25/2005 Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1
    Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement, filed by GTA CONTAINERS, INC. Service: 8/16/2005.(mb2, )
      LREF
      Blank 7 Filed: 8/23/2005, Entered: 8/25/2005 Order on Motion to InterveneCourt Filing
      ORDER granting [6] Motion to Intervene. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (mb2, )
        LREF
        Blank 6 Filed: 8/23/2005, Entered: 8/25/2005, Terminated: 8/23/2005 Terminated:
        MOTION to Intervene, filed by GTA CONTAINERS, INC. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 8/16/2005. Response due by 9/2/2005. (mb2, ) Modified on 8/25/2005 (mb2, ).
          LREF
          Blank 5 Filed: 8/16/2005, Entered: 8/18/2005 Notice of Appearance/
          NOTICE of Appearance by Frank Jefferson Hughes for USA. Service: 8/16/2005.(mb2, )
            LREF
            Blank 4 Filed: 8/10/2005, Entered: 8/11/2005 Status Conference OrderCourt Filing
            STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 8/16/2005 02:30 PM before Senior Senior Judge John P. Wiese. Signed by Senior Judge John P. Wiese. (dw1)
              LREF
              Blank 3 Filed: 8/8/2005, Entered: 8/8/2005 Court Filing
              NOTICE of Assignment to Senior Judge John P. Wiese. (dw1)
                LREF
                Blank 2 Filed: 8/8/2005, Entered: 8/8/2005, Terminated: 9/12/2005 Motion for Preliminary Injunction
                MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by AMERICAN FUEL CELL AND COATED FABRICS COMPANY, filed with a (1) one volume memorandum in support.Service by hand: 8/8/05. Response due by 8/22/2005. (dw1)
                  LREF
                  Blank 1 Filed: 8/8/2005, Entered: 8/8/2005
                  COMPLAINT against USA (ARM) (Filing fee $250, Receipt number 063375), filed by AMERICAN FUEL CELL AND COATED FABRICS COMPANY.Answer Due by 10/7/2005.(dw1)
                    LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 137 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?