ADELPHIA CABLEVISION, LLC, v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:05-cv-01014-JPW
District Judge John P. Wiese, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Adelphia Cablevision, L.L.C., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Anderson & Gulotta, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anthony Gulotta +1 717 635 7145 +1 717 541 5434 tgulotta@fbstax.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space G. Robson Stewart +1 202 307 6493 +1 202 514 9440 george.r.stewart@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 9/20/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 206 - Tax - Excise
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County None
Terminated 8/21/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 18 Filed: 8/21/2007, Entered: 8/22/2007 Stipulation of Dismissal
STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice, filed by all parties. Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii) this day. (dls)
    LREF
    Blank 17 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: 7/12/2007 Joint Status Report
    JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. Service: 7/9/07.(vro)
      LREF
      Blank 16 Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: 5/11/2007 Joint Status Report
      JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (vro)
        LREF
        Blank 15 Filed: 3/6/2007, Entered: 3/9/2007 Joint Status Report
        JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. Service: 3/6/2007.(hw1, )
          LREF
          Blank 14 Filed: 1/5/2007, Entered: 1/11/2007 Status Report
          JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. Status Report due by 3/6/2007 (every 60 days). (dls )
            LREF
            Blank 13 Filed: 11/6/2006, Entered: 11/8/2006 Status Report
            JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. Status Report due by 1/5/2007 (every 60 days).(dls )
              LREF
              Blank 12 Filed: 9/5/2006, Entered: 9/6/2006 Status Report
              JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. Status Report due by 11/6/2006 (every 60 days)(dls )
                LREF
                Blank 11 Filed: 7/5/2006, Entered: 7/7/2006 Joint Status Report
                JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by ADELPHIA CABLEVISION, LLC. (mb2, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 10 Filed: 6/1/2006, Entered: 6/2/2006 TranscriptCourt Filing
                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on May 3, 2006 before Senior Judge John P. Wiese. (dw1)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 5/12/2006, Entered: 5/12/2006
                    Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 6/5/2006. (vp1, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 9 Filed: 5/3/2006, Entered: 5/9/2006 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                      STATUS REPORT ORDER: Status Report due by 7/3/2006 and every 60 days thereafter. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (mb2, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 8 Filed: 4/27/2006, Entered: 5/2/2006 Status Conference OrderCourt Filing
                        STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 5/3/2006 at 11:00 AM in National Courts Building before Senior Judge John P. Wiese. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (mb2, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 7 Filed: 1/18/2006, Entered: 1/23/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER: On or before 5/19/2006 the parties are directed to contact the court to schedule a follow-up status conference. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (mb2, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 6 Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: 1/12/2006 Joint Preliminary Status Report
                            JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT. (mb2, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 5 Filed: 11/21/2005, Entered: 11/22/2005 Answer
                              ANSWER to [1] Complaint , filed by USA. Service: 11/21/2005. JPSR due by 1/12/2006.(mb2, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 4 Filed: 10/25/2005, Entered: 10/26/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                ORDER (i) directing parties to confer and arrange for preliminary status conference; (ii) identifying filing requirements for conference; and (iii) precluding filing of dispositive motions until after conference has been held. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (jat, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 3 Filed: 10/3/2005, Entered: 10/5/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                  NOTICE of Appearance by G. Robson Stewart for USA Service: 10/03/05.(vro, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 2 Filed: 9/20/2005, Entered: 9/20/2005 Court Filing
                                    NOTICE of Assignment to Judge John P. Wiese. (lg1, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 1 Filed: 9/20/2005, Entered: 9/20/2005
                                      COMPLAINT against USA (TRE) ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 063603), filed by ADELPHIA CABLEVISION, LLC,.Answer Due by 11/21/2005.(lg1, )
                                        LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 160 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?