FASTNET CORPORATION v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:05-cv-01019-LMB
District Judge Lawrence M. Baskir, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Fastnet Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Anderson & Gulotta, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anthony Gulotta +1 717 635 7145 +1 717 541 5434 tgulotta@fbstax.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space G. Robson Stewart +1 202 307 6493 +1 202 514 9440 george.r.stewart@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 9/21/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 206 - Tax - Excise
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County None
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
105-cv-01019-LMB None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Pending Status ADRstart
Flags ADR, AUTO, ECF, LEAD, STAYED
  Entries (30) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 29 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: 9/15/2008
JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Stewart, G.)
    LREF
    Legal Document 28 Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: 7/18/2008
    JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Stewart, G.)
      LREF
      Legal Document 27 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: 5/19/2008
      JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Stewart, G.)
        LREF
        Legal Document 26 Filed: 3/18/2008, Entered: 3/18/2008
        JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Stewart, G.)
          LREF
          Legal Document 25 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: 1/22/2008
          JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Stewart, G.)
            LREF
            Legal Document 24 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: 11/19/2007
            JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Stewart, G.)
              LREF
              Legal Document 23 Filed: 9/18/2007, Entered: 9/18/2007
              JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Comcation Decision)(Stewart, G.)
              LREF
              Legal Document 22 Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: 7/19/2007
              JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Stewart, G.)
                LREF
                Legal Document 21 Filed: 5/21/2007, Entered: 5/21/2007
                JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Stewart, G.)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 20 Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: 3/23/2007
                  JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Stewart, G.)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 19 Filed: 1/29/2007, Entered: 1/29/2007
                    JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Stewart, G.)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 18 Filed: 11/28/2006, Entered: 11/28/2006
                      JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Stewart, G.)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 17 Filed: 9/25/2006, Entered: 9/25/2006
                        STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Stewart, G.)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 16 Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: 9/25/2006 Notice of Designation of Electronic Case
                          NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (vro)
                            LREF
                            Blank 15 Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: 9/18/2006 Order Designating ECF CaseCourt Filing
                            ORDER directing the Clerk to designate this case as an electronic (ECF) case. All future filings will be in electronic form. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (vro, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 14 Filed: 8/22/2006, Entered: 8/23/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                              ORDER Consolidating this case with No. 05-1109T, with all future filings to be in this case. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dls )
                                LREF
                                Blank 13 Filed: 8/22/2006, Entered: 8/22/2006 Court Filing
                                ORDER STAYING CASE Joint Status Report due by 9/25/2006 and every 60 days therafter Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (vro, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 12 Filed: 5/3/2006, Entered: 5/3/2006 Court Filing
                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on April 12, 2006 before Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dw1)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 11 Filed: 4/12/2006, Entered: 4/18/2006 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                    SCHEDULING ORDER:Fact Discovery due by 8/14/2006. Status Report due by 8/21/2006. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (mb2, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 4/12/2006, Entered: 4/12/2006
                                      Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 5/12/2006. (vp1, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 10 Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: 3/3/2006 Status Conference OrderCourt Filing
                                        STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 4/12/2006 at 10:00 AM before Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (mb2, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 9 Filed: 2/17/2006, Entered: 2/23/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                          ORDER: The parties are Ordered to contact the Court with three proposed conference dates. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (mb2, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 8 Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: 1/12/2006 Joint Preliminary Status Report
                                            JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT. Service: 1/9/2006.(mb2, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 7 Filed: 1/5/2006, Entered: 1/10/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                              ORDER: List of Cases discussed during the ADR status conference due by 1/12/2006. Signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn. (mb2, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 6 Filed: 11/21/2005, Entered: 11/22/2005 Answer
                                                ANSWER to [1] Complaint , filed by USA. Service: 11/21/2005. JPSR due by 1/12/2006.(mb2, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 10/7/2005, Entered: 10/11/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  SPECIAL PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (mb2, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 10/3/2005, Entered: 10/5/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by G. Robson Stewart for USA Service: 10/03/05.(vro, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 9/21/2005, Entered: 9/21/2005 Court Filing
                                                      NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Marian Blank Horn for ADR Pilot proceedings. (lg1, ).
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 9/21/2005, Entered: 9/21/2005 Court Filing
                                                        NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (lg1, ).
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 9/21/2005, Entered: 9/21/2005
                                                          COMPLAINT against USA (TRE) ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 063609), filed by FASTNET CORPORATION(lg1, ).
                                                            LREF

                                                            Statistics

                                                            This case has been viewed 158 times.

                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                            Space
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                             
                                                            PlainSite
                                                            Sign Up
                                                            Need Password Help?