ALION SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:05-cv-01072-LB
District Judge Lawrence J. Block, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Alion Science And Technology Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Louis James D'Agostino +1 703 749 1300 +1 703 749 1301 dagostinoj@gtlaw.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo ADVANCED ENGINEERING & SCIENCES, Intervenor-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by McKenna Long & Aldridge LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas Christopher Papson +1 202 496 7500 +1 202 496 7756 tpapson@mckennalong.com
Office COFC
Filed 10/7/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 140 - Contract - Injunction (Post Award)
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed
County None
Terminated 11/3/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, PROTO
  Entries (50) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 48 Filed: 12/28/2005, Entered: 1/3/2006 TranscriptCourt Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on November 29, 2005 before Judge Lawrence J. Block. (dw1)
    LREF
    Blank 47 Filed: 11/29/2005, Entered: 12/2/2005 Published OpinionCourt Filing
    PUBLISHED OPINION (Originally Issued November, 2 2005) Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (mb2, )
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 11/29/2005, Entered: 11/29/2005
      Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 12/29/2005. (vp1, )
        LREF
        Blank 46 Filed: 11/21/2005, Entered: 11/22/2005 Status Conference OrderCourt Filing
        STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 11/29/2005 at 11:00 AM before Judge Lawrence J. Block. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (mb2, )
          LREF
          Blank 45 Filed: 11/3/2005, Entered: 11/3/2005
          JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, on behalf of defendant and intervenor, dismissing the complaint. (dls )
            LREF
            Sealed Legal Document 44 Filed: 11/2/2005, Entered: 11/2/2005 Court Filing
            **SEALED**OPINION AND ORDER denying plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction, denying plaintiff's motion for judgment on the administrative record, granting the government and the intervenor-defedant's respective motions for judgment on the administrative record and directing the Clerk to enter judgment on behalf of the government and intervenor. Each party shall submit to chambers proposed redactions no later than 11:00 a.m. on Monday, November 14, 2005. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. No costs.(lld, )
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 10/25/2005, Entered: 10/25/2005
              Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 10/24/2005. (vp1, )
                LREF
                Blank 43 Filed: 10/24/2005, Entered: 10/25/2005 TranscriptCourt Filing
                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on October 21, 2005 before Judge Lawrence J. Block. (dw1)
                  LREF
                  Blank 42 Filed: 10/20/2005, Entered: 10/24/2005 Redacted Document
                  REDACTED DOCUMENT, filed by ALION SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION redacting [26] MOTION to Supplement the Administrative Record [22] Administrative Record. Service: 10/17/2005.(mb2, )
                    LREF
                    Sealed Legal Document 41 Filed: 10/20/2005, Entered: 10/24/2005 Reply to Response to Motion
                    **SEALED**REPLY to Response to Motion re [32] CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [28] Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record, filed by USA. Service: 10/20/2005.(mb2, )
                      LREF
                      Sealed Legal Document 40 Filed: 10/20/2005, Entered: 10/24/2005 Response to Motion
                      **SEALED**RESPONSE to [28] MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record , filed by ADVANCED ENGINEERING & SCIENCES. Reply due by 11/7/2005. Service: 10/20/2005.(mb2, )
                        LREF
                        Sealed Legal Document 39 Filed: 10/20/2005, Entered: 10/24/2005 Statement of Facts
                        **SEALED**COUNTER STATEMENT OF FACTS re: [35] Statement of Facts, filed by ALION SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION. Service: 10/20/2005.(mb2, )
                          LREF
                          Sealed Legal Document 38 Filed: 10/20/2005, Entered: 10/24/2005 Statement of Facts
                          **SEALED**COUNTER STATEMENT OF FACTS re: [33] Statement of Facts, filed by ALION SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION. Service: 10/20/2005.(mb2, )
                            LREF
                            Sealed Legal Document 37 Filed: 10/20/2005, Entered: 10/24/2005 Response to Cross Motion
                            **SEALED**RESPONSE and reply to [34] MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record , filed by ALION SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION. Reply due by 11/7/2005. Service: 10/20/2005.(mb2, )
                              LREF
                              Sealed Legal Document 36 Filed: 10/20/2005, Entered: 10/24/2005 Response to Cross Motion
                              **SEALED** RESPONSE and reply to [32] CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [28] Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record, filed by ALION SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION. Reply due by 11/7/2005. Service: 10/20/2005.(mb2, ) Modified on 10/24/2005 (mb2, ).
                                LREF
                                Sealed Legal Document 35 Filed: 10/19/2005, Entered: 10/21/2005 Statement of Facts
                                **SEALED**STATEMENT OF FACTS re: [34] Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record, filed by ADVANCED ENGINEERING & SCIENCES. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 10/18/2005.(mb2, )
                                  LREF
                                  Sealed Legal Document 34 Filed: 10/19/2005, Entered: 10/21/2005 Terminated:
                                  **SEALED** MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record, filed by ADVANCED ENGINEERING & SCIENCES. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 10/18/2005. Dispositive Motion Response due by 11/18/2005.(mb2, )
                                    LREF
                                    Sealed Legal Document 33 Filed: 10/19/2005, Entered: 10/21/2005 Statement of Facts
                                    **SEALED**STATEMENT OF FACTS re: [32] Cross Motion, filed by USA. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 10/18/2005.(mb2, )
                                      LREF
                                      Sealed Legal Document 32 Filed: 10/19/2005, Entered: 10/21/2005 Terminated:
                                      **SEALED**CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [28] Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record, filed by USA. Service: 10/18/2005. Dispositive Motion Response due by 11/18/2005.(mb2, )
                                        LREF
                                        Sealed Legal Document 31 Filed: 10/19/2005, Entered: 10/21/2005 Proposed Redacted Document
                                        **SEALED**PROPOSED REDACTED DOCUMENT: Redaction of [29] Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact, filed by ALION SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 10/18/2005.(mb2, )
                                          LREF
                                          Sealed Legal Document 30 Filed: 10/19/2005, Entered: 10/21/2005 Proposed Redacted Document
                                          **SEALED**PROPOSED REDACTED DOCUMENT: Redaction of [28] MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record, filed by ALION SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 10/18/2005.(mb2, )
                                            LREF
                                            Sealed Legal Document 29 Filed: 10/19/2005, Entered: 10/21/2005 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                            **SEALED**PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact RE: [28] MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record, filed by ALION SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 10/18/2005.(mb2, )
                                              LREF
                                              Sealed Legal Document 28 Filed: 10/19/2005, Entered: 10/21/2005 Terminated:
                                              **SEALED** MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record, filed by ALION SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 10/18/2005. Dispositive Motion Response due by 10/20/2005 at noon. (mb2, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 27 Filed: 10/18/2005, Entered: 10/19/2005 Order on Motion to Supplement the Administrative RCourt Filing
                                                ORDER granting [26] Motion to Supplement the Administrative Record. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (mb2, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Sealed Legal Document 26 Filed: 10/18/2005, Entered: 10/19/2005, Terminated: 10/18/2005 Terminated:
                                                  **SEALED** MOTION to Supplement the Administrative Record [22] Administrative Record, filed by ALION SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 10/17/2005. Response due by 11/3/2005. (mb2, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 25 Filed: 10/13/2005, Entered: 10/17/2005 Terminated:
                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Applications for Access to Information Under Protective Order by Outside Counsel, filed by ALION SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION. Service: 10/13/2006. Response due by 10/31/2005. (mb2, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 24 Filed: 10/12/2005, Entered: 10/14/2005 Terminated:
                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Applications for Access to Information Under Protective Order by Outside Counsel, filed by ALION SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION. Service: 10/11/2005. Response due by 10/28/2005. (mb2, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 23 Filed: 10/12/2005, Entered: 10/14/2005 ~Notice (other)
                                                        NOTICE of Filing re [22] Administrative Record, filed by USA. Service: 10/12/2005.(mb2, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Sealed Legal Document 22 Filed: 10/12/2005, Entered: 10/14/2005 Administrative Record
                                                          **SEALED** ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD, filed by USA. Service: 10/12/2005.(mb2, ) Modified on 10/14/2005 (mb2, ).
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 21 Filed: 10/12/2005, Entered: 10/14/2005 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                            ORDER granting [19] Motion for Leave to File Telefaxed Signatures. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (mb2, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 20 Filed: 10/12/2005, Entered: 10/14/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER GRANTING ACCESS TO PROTECTED MATERIALS. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (mb2, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 19 Filed: 10/12/2005, Entered: 10/14/2005, Terminated: 10/12/2005 Terminated:
                                                                MOTION for Leave to File Telefaxed Signatures, filed by USA. Service: 10/12/2005. Response due by 10/31/2005. (mb2, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 18 Filed: 10/12/2005, Entered: 10/14/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Reid Prouty for USA. Service: 10/12/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 17 Filed: 10/11/2005, Entered: 10/12/2005 Application for Access to Protected Material
                                                                    APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Jason N. Workmaster by ADVANCED ENGINEERING & SCIENCES. Service: 10/11/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 16 Filed: 10/11/2005, Entered: 10/12/2005 Application for Access to Protected Material
                                                                      APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Thomas C. Papson by ADVANCED ENGINEERING & SCIENCES. Service: 10/11/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 15 Filed: 10/11/2005, Entered: 10/12/2005 Application for Access to Protected Material
                                                                        APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Kara M. Klaas by ADVANCED ENGINEERING & SCIENCES. Service: 10/11/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 14 Filed: 10/11/2005, Entered: 10/11/2005, Terminated: 10/11/2005 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                          MOTION for Agreed-Upon Protective Order filed by ALION SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION.Service: 10/10/05. (dls )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 13 Filed: 10/11/2005, Entered: 10/11/2005 Court Filing
                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER directing defendant to file the Administrative Record by noon on 10/12/2005; plaintiff to contact defendant by 5:00 pm on 10/12/05 to discuss any perceived deficiencies or omissions in the record and file any attendant motion by 5:00 pm on 10/13/05; parties to file motions for judgment on the administrative record by noon on 10/18/05; parties to file their responses by 10:00 am on 10/20/2005; and scheduling a hearing at 11:00 am on 10/21/2005. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (dls, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 12 Filed: 10/11/2005, Entered: 10/11/2005 Court Filing
                                                                              PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (dls )
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 11 Filed: 10/11/2005, Entered: 10/11/2005
                                                                                Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement filed by ADVANCED ENGINEERING & SCIENCES. Service: 10/11/05.(dls)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 10 Filed: 10/11/2005, Entered: 10/11/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                  ORDER memorializing telephone conference held on October 7, 2005; granting [4] Motion for Leave to File complaint [and other papers] under seal; granting [9] Motion to Intervene by Advanced Engineering & Sciences, a division of ITT Industries, Inc. (AES); and scheduling a status conference on October 11, 2005 at 10:00 am. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (dls)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 9 Filed: 10/11/2005, Entered: 10/11/2005, Terminated: 10/11/2005 Motion to Intervene
                                                                                    MOTION to Intervene filed by ADVANCED ENGINEERING & SCIENCES [by leave of the judge].Service: 10/11/05. (dls )
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 8 Filed: 10/7/2005, Entered: 10/11/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                      MOTION for Protective Order filed by ALION SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION. (dls )
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 7 Filed: 10/7/2005, Entered: 10/11/2005 Redacted Document
                                                                                        **SEALED**REDACTED MEMORANDUM filed by ALION SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION redacting [6] Memorandum. Service: 10/7/05.(dls )
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 6 Filed: 10/7/2005, Entered: 10/11/2005 Memorandum
                                                                                          **SEALED**MEMORANDUM in support of [5] Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Motion for TRO by ALION SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION. Service: 10/7/05.(dls)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 5 Filed: 10/7/2005, Entered: 10/11/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                            MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by ALION SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION.Service: 10/7/05. Response due by 10/24/2005. (jat, )
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 4 Filed: 10/7/2005, Entered: 10/11/2005, Terminated: 10/11/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File complaint under seal filed by ALION SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION. (dls)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 3 Filed: 10/7/2005, Entered: 10/11/2005 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Lawrence J. Block. (dls )
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 2 Filed: 10/7/2005, Entered: 10/11/2005 Redacted Document
                                                                                                  **SEALED**REDACTED COMPLAINT by ALION SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION redacting [1] Complaint. (dls)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 1 Filed: 10/7/2005, Entered: 10/11/2005 Complaint
                                                                                                    **SEALED**COMPLAINT against USA (DOD) ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 063707) filed by ALION SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION.Answer Due by 12/6/2005.(dls)
                                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 57 times.

                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                       
                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                      Need Password Help?