SYSTEMS PLUS, INC. v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:05-cv-01076-EGB
District Judge Eric G. Bruggink, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo SYSTEMS PLUS, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by McKenna Long & Aldridge LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas Christopher Papson +1 202 496 7500 +1 202 496 7756 tpapson@mckennalong.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jerome Anthony Madden
No Logo Netstar-1, Inc., Intervenor-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by COHEN MOHR, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William F. Savarino +1 202 342 2550
Office COFC
Filed 10/11/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 140 - Contract - Injunction (Post Award)
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed
County None
Terminated 10/28/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (21) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 19 Filed: 11/28/2005, Entered: 11/28/2005 Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on October 26, 2005 before Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (dw1)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 11/4/2005, Entered: 11/4/2005
    Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 11/28/2005. (vp1, )
      LREF
      Blank 18 Filed: 10/28/2005, Entered: 10/28/2005
      JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed. No costs. (lld, )
        LREF
        Blank 17 Filed: 10/27/2005, Entered: 10/28/2005 Published Opinion/OrderCourt Filing
        PUBLISHED OPINION denying plaintiff's request for injunctive relief and for declaratory judgment. The Clerk is directed to dismiss the complaint. No costs. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (lld, )
          LREF
          Blank 16 Filed: 10/25/2005, Entered: 10/28/2005 Response to Motion
          REPLY to Intervenor's RESPONSE to [2] MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record, and RESPONSE to [12] CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [2] Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record, filed by SYSTEMS PLUS, INC. Reply due by 11/14/2005. Service: 10/25/2005.(mb2, )
            LREF
            Blank 15 Filed: 10/21/2005, Entered: 10/25/2005 Proposed Additional Facts
            PROPOSED ADDITIONAL FACTS re: [2] Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record, filed by NETSTAR-1, INC. Service: 10/21/2005.(mb2, )
              LREF
              Blank 14 Filed: 10/21/2005, Entered: 10/25/2005 Statement of Facts
              COUNTER STATEMENT OF FACTS re: [5] Statement of Facts, filed by NETSTAR-1, INC. Service: 10/21/2005.(mb2, )
                LREF
                Blank 13 Filed: 10/21/2005, Entered: 10/25/2005 Response to Motion
                RESPONSE to [2] MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record , filed by NETSTAR-1, INC. Reply due by 11/7/2005. Service: 10/21/2005.(mb2, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 12 Filed: 10/21/2005, Entered: 10/25/2005 Terminated:
                  CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [2] Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record, filed by USA. Service: 10/21/2005. Dispositive Motion Response due by 11/21/2005.(mb2, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 9 Filed: 10/17/2005, Entered: 10/17/2005
                    Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement, filed by NETSTAR-1, INC. Service: 10/13/2005.(mb2, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 8 Filed: 10/17/2005, Entered: 10/17/2005, Terminated: 10/13/2005 Motion to Intervene
                      MOTION to Intervene, filed by NETSTAR-1, INC. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE]Service: 10/13/2005. (mb2, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 11 Filed: 10/14/2005, Entered: 10/17/2005 ~Notice (other)
                        NOTICE: Regarding the Administrative Record Material, filed by USA. Service: 10/14/2005.(mb2, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 10 Filed: 10/13/2005, Entered: 10/17/2005 Order on Motion to InterveneCourt Filing
                          ORDER granting [8] Motion to Intervene, and Setting Schedule. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mb2, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 7 Filed: 10/13/2005, Entered: 10/17/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                            NOTICE of Appearance by Jerome Anthony Madden for USA. Service: 10/13/2006.(mb2, )
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 10/13/2005, Entered: 10/17/2005 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                              Set Deadlines/Hearings: Administrative Record due 10/14/2005. Dispositive Motion Response due by 10/21/2005. Reply due by 10/25/2005. Oral Argument set for 10/26/2005 at 9:30 AM in National Courts Building before Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mb2, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 6 Filed: 10/11/2005, Entered: 10/11/2005 Court Filing
                                NOTICE of Assignment to Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (dw1)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 5 Filed: 10/11/2005, Entered: 10/11/2005
                                  STATEMENT OF FACTS re: [2] Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record by SYSTEMS PLUS, INC.. Service by hand: 10/11/2005.(dw1)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 4 Filed: 10/11/2005, Entered: 10/11/2005
                                    Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by SYSTEMS PLUS, INC.. Service by hand: 10/11/2005.(dw1)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 3 Filed: 10/11/2005, Entered: 10/11/2005, Terminated: 10/27/2005 Motion to Expedite
                                      MOTION to Expedite and to shorten time limits filed by SYSTEMS PLUS, INC..Service: 10/11/2005. Response due by 10/28/2005. (dw1)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 2 Filed: 10/11/2005, Entered: 10/11/2005, Terminated: 10/27/2005 Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record
                                        MOTION for Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by SYSTEMS PLUS, INC., filed w/memorandum in support.Service by hand: 10/11/2005. Dispositive Motion Response due by 11/11/2005. (dw1)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 1 Filed: 10/11/2005, Entered: 10/11/2005
                                          COMPLAINT against USA (LAB) (Filing fee $250, Receipt number 063714), filed by SYSTEMS PLUS, INC..Answer Due by 12/12/2005.(dw1)
                                            LREF

                                            Statistics

                                            This case has been viewed 161 times.

                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                            Space
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                             
                                            PlainSite
                                            Sign Up
                                            Need Password Help?