EVENLINK, LLC, v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:05-cv-01105-TCW
District Judge Thomas C. Wheeler, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo EVENLINK, LLC,, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Anderson & Gulotta, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anthony Gulotta +1 717 635 7145 +1 717 541 5434 tgulotta@fbstax.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space G. Robson Stewart +1 202 307 6493 +1 202 514 9440 george.r.stewart@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 10/13/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand $5000
Nature of Suit 206 - Tax - Excise
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County None
Terminated 6/25/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ECF
  Entries (25) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 24 Filed: 6/25/2008, Entered: 6/25/2008
STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice, filed by all parties.. (Stewart, G.)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 6/25/2008, Entered: 6/28/2008 Terminated Case - Public
    Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii) this day. (dls)
      LREF
      Legal Document 23 Filed: 4/28/2008, Entered: 4/28/2008 Court Filing
      ORDER STAYING CASE: Status Report due by 6/30/2008. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck)
        LREF
        Legal Document 22 Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: 4/25/2008
        JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Stewart, G.)
          LREF
          Legal Document 21 Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: 10/2/2007 Court Filing
          ORDER STAYING CASE Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck)
            LREF
            Legal Document 20 Filed: 8/23/2007, Entered: 8/23/2007
            JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Comcation Decision)(Stewart, G.)
            LREF
            Legal Document 19 Filed: 8/1/2007, Entered: 8/1/2007
            JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Stewart, G.)
              LREF
              Legal Document 18 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: 6/1/2007
              JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Stewart, G.)
                LREF
                Legal Document 17 Filed: 5/3/2007, Entered: 5/3/2007
                JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Stewart, G.)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 16 Filed: 4/2/2007, Entered: 4/2/2007
                  JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Stewart, G.)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 15 Filed: 2/1/2007, Entered: 2/1/2007
                    JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Stewart, G.)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 14 Filed: 11/30/2006, Entered: 11/30/2006 Court Filing
                      ORDER STAYING CASE. Status Report due by 2/1/2007 Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck1)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 13 Filed: 11/28/2006, Entered: 11/28/2006
                        JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Stewart, G.)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 12 Filed: 8/1/2006, Entered: 8/1/2006
                          STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Stewart, G.)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 11 Filed: 6/12/2006, Entered: 6/12/2006 Court Filing
                            ORDER STAYING CASE Status Report due by 8/1/2006 Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ck1)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 10 Filed: 3/7/2006, Entered: 3/7/2006
                              NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (mb2, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 9 Filed: 3/6/2006, Entered: 3/7/2006 Order Designating ECF CaseCourt Filing
                                ORDER directing the Clerk to designate this case as an electronic (ECF) case. All future filings will be in electronic form. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (mb2, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 8 Filed: 2/9/2006, Entered: 2/13/2006 Status Conference OrderCourt Filing
                                  STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 6/12/2006 at 10:00 AM before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (mb2, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 7 Filed: 1/31/2006, Entered: 2/1/2006 Joint Preliminary Status Report
                                    JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] (mb2, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 6 Filed: 12/12/2005, Entered: 12/16/2005 Answer
                                      ANSWER to [1] Complaint , filed by USA. Service: 12/12/2005. JPSR due by 2/2/2006.(mb2, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 5 Filed: 12/8/2005, Entered: 12/12/2005 Notice of ReassignmentCourt Filing
                                        NOTICE of Reassignment. Case reassigned to Judge Thomas C. Wheeler for all further proceedings. Judge Lawrence J. Block no longer assigned to case. (dls )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 4 Filed: 12/8/2005, Entered: 12/12/2005 Order Reassigning CaseCourt Filing
                                          ORDER reassigning case to Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. Block. (dls )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 3 Filed: 11/2/2005, Entered: 11/4/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                            NOTICE of Appearance by G. Robson Stewart for USA Service: 11/2/2005.(mb2, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 2 Filed: 10/13/2005, Entered: 10/14/2005 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                                              NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Lawrence J. Block. (lg1, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 1 Filed: 10/13/2005, Entered: 10/14/2005 Complaint
                                                COMPLAINT against USA (TRE) ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 063754), filed by EVENLINK, LLC,.Answer Due by 12/12/2005.(lg1, )
                                                  LREF

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 121 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?