QUADRAMED CORPORATION, v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:05-cv-01103-CCM
District Judge Christine O.C. Miller, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo QuadraMed Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Anderson & Gulotta, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anthony Gulotta +1 717 635 7145 +1 717 541 5434 tgulotta@fbstax.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space G. Robson Stewart +1 202 307 6493 +1 202 514 9440 george.r.stewart@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 10/13/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand $38000
Nature of Suit 206 - Tax - Excise
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County None
Terminated 11/17/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 14 Filed: 11/21/2006, Entered: 11/27/2006 Remark
Case Closed (lg1, )
    LREF
    Blank 13 Filed: 11/17/2006, Entered: 11/21/2006 Stipulation of Dismissal
    STIPULATION of Dismissal without prejudice, filed by all plaintiffs. Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii) this day.. Service: 11/20/2006.(lg1, )
      LREF
      Blank 12 Filed: 8/18/2006, Entered: 8/21/2006 Status Report
      JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (dls )
        LREF
        Blank 11 Filed: 5/26/2006, Entered: 6/1/2006 Status Report
        STATUS REPORT, filed by USA. Service: 5/26/2006.(mb2, )
          LREF
          Blank 10 Filed: 5/11/2006, Entered: 5/11/2006 Court Filing
          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-7) held on April 19, 2006 before Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (dw1)
            LREF
            Blank 9 Filed: 4/26/2006, Entered: 4/28/2006 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
            STATUS REPORT ORDER:Joint Status Report due within 90 days or 15 days of issuance of a decision in related cases. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (mb2, )
              LREF
              Blank 8 Filed: 2/8/2006, Entered: 2/10/2006 Status Conference OrderCourt Filing
              STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 4/19/2006 at 2:00 PM in National Courts Building before Judge Christine O.C. Miller. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (mb2, )
                LREF
                Blank 7 Filed: 2/7/2006, Entered: 2/9/2006 Joint Preliminary Status Report
                JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] (mb2, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 6 Filed: 1/3/2006, Entered: 1/4/2006 Answer
                  ANSWER to [1] Complaint , filed by USA. Service: 12/16/2005. JPSR due by 2/24/2006.(mb2, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 5 Filed: 1/3/2006, Entered: 1/4/2006 Order on Motion for Leave to File Out of TimeCourt Filing
                    ORDER granting [4] Motion for Leave to File Out of Time. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (mb2, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 4 Filed: 12/19/2005, Entered: 12/23/2005, Terminated: 1/3/2006 Terminated:
                      MOTION for Leave to File Attached Answer Out of Time , filed by USA. Service: 12/16/2005. Response due by 1/5/2006. (lld, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 3 Filed: 11/2/2005, Entered: 11/4/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                        NOTICE of Appearance by G. Robson Stewart for USA. Service: 11/2/2005.(mb2, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 2 Filed: 10/13/2005, Entered: 10/14/2005 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                          NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (lg1, ).
                            LREF
                            Blank 1 Filed: 10/13/2005, Entered: 10/14/2005 Complaint
                            COMPLAINT against USA (TRE) ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 063752), filed by QUADRAMED CORPORATION,.Answer Due by 12/12/2005.(lg1, )
                              LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 133 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?