LACHAPELLE et al v. SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:05-vv-01106-UNJ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo JESTINE LACHAPELLE, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas P. Gallagher +1 609 926 6450 +1 609 926 6455 thomasgallagherlawfirm@aol.com
No Logo JOSHUA LACHAPELLE, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas P. Gallagher +1 609 926 6450 +1 609 926 6455 thomasgallagherlawfirm@aol.com
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Glenn Alexander MacLeod +1 202 616 4122 glenn.macleod@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 10/13/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 483 - Death - Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 300 Vaccine Injury Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Vaccine - Dismissed by Special Master
County None
Terminated 1/23/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (79) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 71 Filed: 2/21/2008, Entered: 2/21/2008
JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Vaccine Rule 11(a), that petitioner is awarded attorney's fees and costs and personal expenses in the amount of $62,000.00. Ms. Lachapelle's attorney of record, Thomas P. Gallagher, Esq., may collect $60,500.00 from Ms. Lachapelle. (lld)
    LREF
    Blank 70 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: 2/20/2008 Notice Not to Seek Review
    NOTICE Not to Seek Review, filed by JESTINE LACHAPELLE, JOSHUA LACHAPELLE re [68] DECISION of Special Master - Fees. Service: 2/13/08.(tjk, )
      LREF
      Blank 69 Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: 2/17/2008 Notice Not to Seek Review
      NOTICE Not to Seek Review, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES re [68] DECISION of Special Master - Fees. Service: 02/13/2008.(tjk, )
        LREF
        Blank 68 Filed: 2/6/2008, Entered: 2/7/2008 DECISION of Special Master - Fees
        DECISION on Attorney's Fees and Costs. Fedex on 2/6/08, tracking number 865183147098. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (Neal, Alonzo)
          LREF
          Blank 67 Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: 2/5/2008 Petitioner's Election to File Civil Action
          Petitioner's Election to File Civil Action re: [64] Judgment. Service: 1/30/08.(tjk, )
            LREF
            Blank 66 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: 2/5/2008 Status Report
            STATUS REPORT, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 2/1/08.(Neal, Alonzo)
              LREF
              Blank 65 Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: 1/31/2008 Terminated:
              MOTION to Amend/Appication for fees and costs, filed by JESTINE LACHAPELLE, JOSHUA LACHAPELLE. Service: 1/24/08.Response due by 2/15/2008. (Neal, Alonzo)
                LREF
                Blank 64 Filed: 1/23/2008, Entered: 1/23/2008
                JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Vaccine Rule 11(a), that the petition is dismissed. (lld)
                  LREF
                  Blank 63 Filed: 1/15/2008, Entered: 1/16/2008 ~Notice (other)
                  SUPPLEMENTAL STATMENT (pursuant to General Order No. 9), filed by JESTINE LACHAPELLE, JOSHUA LACHAPELLE re [62] MOTION for Attorney Fees. Service: 1/10/08.(tjk, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 62 Filed: 1/10/2008, Entered: 1/14/2008 Terminated:
                    MOTION for Attorney Fees, filed by JESTINE LACHAPELLE, JOSHUA LACHAPELLE. Service: 1/07/08.Response due by 1/24/2008. (tjk, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 61 Filed: 12/12/2007, Entered: 12/12/2007
                      DECISION Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 12/12/2007, Entered: 12/13/2007 Remark
                        Remark. A copy of the Decision of the Special Master dated 12/12/07 was sent to Petitioner's Counsel on 12/12/07 via Federal Express Priority Overnight Delivery. Tracking no. 8634 5658 9281 (tjk, )
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 12/11/2007, Entered: 12/11/2007
                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master John F. Edwards: Status Conference held on 12/7/2007. Thomas Gallagher, Esq., represented petitioner. Glenn Macleod, Esq., represented respondent.(yh)
                            LREF
                            Blank 60 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: 11/26/2007 notice of filing
                            NOTICE OF FILING X Submission of Required Documents, Exhibit No.4 Patient Care Report from Kent County and Affidavit of Thomas P. Gallagher. by JESTINE LACHAPELLE, JOSHUA LACHAPELLE. Service: 11/7/07.(Neal, Alonzo)
                              LREF
                              Blank 59 Filed: 10/22/2007, Entered: 10/23/2007 Status Report
                              STATUS REPORT, filed by JESTINE LACHAPELLE, JOSHUA LACHAPELLE. Service: 10/16/07.(Neal, Alonzo)
                                LREF
                                Blank 58 Filed: 9/14/2007, Entered: 9/18/2007 Transcript
                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-132) held on August 16, 2007 before Special Master John Edwards. (dw1)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 57 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: 9/11/2007 Order on Motion to Issue Subpoena
                                  ORDER granting [55] Motion to Issue Subpoena. The purpose of the subpoena is to obtain all emergency medical records from 10/30/03, pertaining to Joshua LaChapelle. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 56 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: 9/11/2007 Description not available
                                    SCHEDULING ORDER: By no later than 10/15/2007, petitioner shall file all emergency medical services/ambulance records that petitioner obtains in response to subpoena. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 9/7/2007, Entered: 9/11/2007 Remark
                                      Remark. Decision dated 9/07/07 sent Federal Express Priority Overnight Delivery to Petitioner's counsel on 9/07/07. Tracking no. 8619-2827-8162 (tjk, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 55 Filed: 9/6/2007, Entered: 9/10/2007, Terminated: 9/10/2007 Terminated:
                                        MOTION to Issue Subpoena, filed by JESTINE LACHAPELLE, JOSHUA LACHAPELLE. Service: 8/28/07.Response due by 9/24/2007. (Neal, Alonzo)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 54 Filed: 8/23/2007, Entered: 8/28/2007 Description not available
                                          SCHEDULING ORDER: The special master enlarges to 8/29/2007, the parties' time within which to move jointly for authority to issue a subpoena directed to the entity that maintains a transcribed record of the telephone call that Matthew Lachapelle placed to 911 on 10/30/03, and for authority to issue a subpoena directed to the entity that maintains the 10/30/03 emergency medical service/ambulance records regarding Joshua Lachapelle. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (Neal, Alonzo)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 53 Filed: 8/23/2007, Entered: 8/28/2007 Medical Literature
                                            MEDICAL LITERATURE [Exhibit #M] filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 8/23/07.(Neal, Alonzo)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 52 Filed: 8/20/2007, Entered: 8/20/2007
                                              SCHEDULING ORDER: By no later than 8/22/07, parties shall move jointly for authority to issue a subpoena directed to the entity that maitains a transcribed record of the telephone call that Matthew Lachapelle placed to 911 on 10/30/03, and for authority to issue a subpoena directed to the entity that maintains the 10/30/03 emergency medical service/ambulance records regarding Joshua Lachapelle. Motion(s) due by 8/22/2007. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (Neal, Alonzo)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 8/20/2007, Entered: 8/20/2007
                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master John F. Edwards: Hearing held on 8/16/07 in Boston, Massachusetts. Thomas Gallagher, Esq., represented petitioner. Glenn A. MacLeod, Esq., represented respondent.(Edwards, John)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 8/13/2007, Entered: 8/13/2007
                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master John F. Edwards: Status Conference held on 8/13/07. Thomas Gallagher, Esq., represented petitioner. Glenn MacLeod, Esq., represented respondent. The special master discussed final details regarding the hearing scheduled for August 16-17, 2007, in Boston, Massachusetts. (Edwards, John)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 51 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: 8/9/2007 Witness List
                                                    Revised Witness List, filed by JESTINE LACHAPELLE, JOSHUA LACHAPELLE. Service: 8/2/07.(Neal, Alonzo)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 50 Filed: 7/27/2007, Entered: 7/31/2007 Prehearing Submissions
                                                      PREHEARING MEMORANDUM, WITNESS LIST and MEDICAL LITERATURE by JESTINE LACHAPELLE, JOSHUA LACHAPELLE. Service: 7/26/07.(tjk, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 49 Filed: 7/26/2007, Entered: 7/31/2007 Expert Report
                                                        EXPERT REPORT of Dr. Shane (Ex. no. 3) filed by JESTINE LACHAPELLE, JOSHUA LACHAPELLE. Service: 7/23/07.(tjk, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 48 Filed: 7/20/2007, Entered: 7/24/2007 Prehearing Submissions
                                                          PREHEARING SUBMISSIONS by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 7/20/07.(Neal, Alonzo)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 47 Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: 7/3/2007 Hearing Order
                                                            HEARING ORDER: An Entitlement Hearing is set for 8/16/2007-8/17/07 at 10:00 AM, in Boston, Massachusetts ath the Thomas P. O'Neill Federal Building, 10 Causeway Street before Special Master John F. Edwards. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 46 Filed: 6/20/2007, Entered: 6/26/2007 Order
                                                              ORDER: Prehearing memoranda due 7/27/07. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (Neal, Alonzo)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 45 Filed: 6/19/2007, Entered: 6/25/2007 Hearing Order
                                                                HEARING ORDER: Entitlement Hearing set for 8/16/2007-8/17/07 at 10:00 AM before Special Master John F. Edwards. The special master will inform the parties of the exact location of the hearing by later order. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 44 Filed: 6/15/2007, Entered: 6/19/2007 Order
                                                                  ORDER: Respondent shall contact informally the special master's law clerk Denise Starr by 6/19/07 to confirm that one of respondent's medical experts, Enid Golbert-Barness, will be available by telephone durning the morning on 8/16/07, to listen to the fact testimony. Petitioner shall file any support for her pathologist's assertion that there exists an established relationship between cerebral edema and vaccine injury by 7/19/07. Parties shall file a comprehensive prehearing memorandum by 7/27/07. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (Neal, Alonzo)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 43 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: 6/4/2007 Status Report
                                                                    Joint STATUS REPORT, filed by JESTINE LACHAPELLE, JOSHUA LACHAPELLE, SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 6/1/07.(Neal, Alonzo)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 42 Filed: 5/23/2007, Entered: 5/23/2007
                                                                      STATUS REPORT ORDER The parties time to file the Joint Status Report is enlarged to 6/01/07. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 41 Filed: 5/18/2007, Entered: 5/21/2007 Joint Status Report
                                                                        JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 5/18/07.(tjk, )
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 40 Filed: 5/4/2007, Entered: 5/5/2007 Status Report/Order
                                                                          STATUS REPORT ORDER The parties time within which to file a Joint Status Report is englarged to 5/18/2007. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 39 Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: 4/23/2007 Status Report/Order
                                                                            STATUS REPORT ORDER The parties shall file a Joint Status Report due by 5/4/2007 proposing dates beginning in August 2007 that the parties have confirmed with all witnesses for a hearing on entitlement in Washington, D.C. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: 4/17/2007
                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master John F. Edwards: Status Conference held on 04/17/2007. Thomas Gallagher, Esq., appeared for petitioner. Glenn MacLeod, Esq., appeared for respondent. The special master discussed the scheduling of a hearing on entitlement for August 2007 in Washington, D.C., and the anticipated scope of a hearing on entitlement. (Edwards, John)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 38 Filed: 3/29/2007, Entered: 4/5/2007 Status Conference Order
                                                                                STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference set for 4/17/2007 11:00 AM before Special Master John F. Edwards. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 37 Filed: 3/26/2007, Entered: 3/29/2007 Expert Report
                                                                                  EXPERT REPORT of Marcel Kinsbourne, M.D. (Ex. no. 2) filed by JESTINE LACHAPELLE, JOSHUA LACHAPELLE. Service: 3/19/07.(tjk, )
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 36 Filed: 2/27/2007, Entered: 3/5/2007 Description not available
                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER: Petitioner's Expert Report from Dr. Kinsbourne is due by 3/16/2007. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 1/19/2007, Entered: 1/19/2007
                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master John F. Edwards : A Status Conference was held on January 19, 2007. Mr. Thomas Gallagher appeared via telephone for petitioner. Mr. Glenn Macleod appeared via telephone for respondent. The Special Master reviewed petitioner's progress in obtaining an expert opinion. (ds2, )
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 35 Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: 1/20/2007 Status Report
                                                                                        STATUS REPORT, filed by JESTINE LACHAPELLE, JOSHUA LACHAPELLE. Service: 1/11/07.(tjk, )
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 34 Filed: 11/13/2006, Entered: 11/16/2006 Medical Literature
                                                                                          MEDICAL LITERATURE [Exhibit #F-L] filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 11/13/06.(tjk, )
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 33 Filed: 11/13/2006, Entered: 11/16/2006 notice of filing
                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING Exhibit E- Updated CV of Enid Gilbert-Barness, M.D. by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 11/13/06.(tjk, )
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 32 Filed: 11/6/2006, Entered: 11/6/2006
                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT (VII Submission of Required Documents, Exhibit No. 1) by JESTINE LACHAPELLE, JOSHUA LACHAPELLE. Service: 11/03/06.(tjk, )
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 31 Filed: 11/3/2006, Entered: 11/6/2006 Status Report
                                                                                                STATUS REPORT, filed by JESTINE LACHAPELLE, JOSHUA LACHAPELLE. Service: 10/31/06.(tjk, )
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 30 Filed: 10/16/2006, Entered: 10/17/2006 Description not available
                                                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER: Petitioner shall file her Supplemental Affidavit due by 10/31/2006. Respondent shall file all materials supporting the Expert Report due by 11/13/06. Petitioner shall file a Supplemental Expert Report due by 12/01/06. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 29 Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: 10/2/2006 Joint Status Report
                                                                                                    JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 9/29/06.(tjk, )
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 9/21/2006, Entered: 9/21/2006
                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master John F. Edwards : A Status Conference was held on September 15, 2006. Mr. Thomas Gallagher appeared via telephone for petitioner. Mr. Glenn Macleod appeared via telephone for respondent. (ds2, )
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 28 Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: 9/20/2006 Status Report/Order
                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT ORDER The parties shall file a Joint Status Report due by 9/29/2006. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 27 Filed: 9/14/2006, Entered: 9/19/2006 notice of filing
                                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING Curriculum Vitae of Marcel Kinsbourne, M.D. and the Curriculum Vitae of John J. Shane, M.D. by JESTINE LACHAPELLE, JOSHUA LACHAPELLE. Service: 9/06/06.(tjk, )
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 26 Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: 9/5/2006 Rule 5 Order
                                                                                                            RULE 5 ORDER: Rule 5 Conference set for 9/15/2006 11:00 AM before Special Master John F. Edwards. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 25 Filed: 8/25/2006, Entered: 8/30/2006 Expert Report
                                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING: EXPERT REPORT of Dr. Michael Kohrman, M.D. (Ex. A) and Curriculum Vitae (Ex. B) filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 8/25/06.(tjk, )
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 24 Filed: 8/25/2006, Entered: 8/30/2006 Respondent's Report
                                                                                                                Respondent's Report, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 8/25/06. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 23 Filed: 8/25/2006, Entered: 8/30/2006 Expert Report
                                                                                                                  EXPERT REPORT of Dr. Enid Gilbert-Barness, M.D. (Ex. C) and (Curriculum Vitae Ex. D) filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 8/25/06.(tjk, )
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 22 Filed: 8/8/2006, Entered: 8/9/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File (Vac
                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [21] Motion for Extension of Time Respondents Report due by 8/25/2006. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 21 Filed: 8/4/2006, Entered: 8/7/2006, Terminated: 8/8/2006 Terminated:
                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time until 8/25/06 to file the Rule 4 Report , filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 8/04/06.Response due by 8/21/2006. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 20 Filed: 6/21/2006, Entered: 6/23/2006 Status Report
                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 6/21/06.(tjk, )
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 19 Filed: 6/15/2006, Entered: 6/16/2006 Notice Regarding Statutory Requirement
                                                                                                                          ORDER re: the statutory time period for the special master's issuance of a decision in this case has expired. Petitioner may submit a notice continuing or withdrawing the petition and such notice shall be filed within 30 days. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 18 Filed: 6/14/2006, Entered: 6/15/2006 Description not available
                                                                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER: Respondent's Rule 4 Report due by 7/28/2006. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 17 Filed: 6/12/2006, Entered: 6/14/2006 Expert Report
                                                                                                                              EXPERT REPORT of Marcel Kinsbourne, M.D. filed by JESTINE LACHAPELLE, JOSHUA LACHAPELLE.[Fifth submission of required documents] Service: 6/09/06.(tjk, )
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 16 Filed: 5/12/2006, Entered: 5/15/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [15] Motion for Extension of Time Expert Report due by 6/30/2006. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 15 Filed: 5/11/2006, Entered: 5/15/2006, Terminated: 5/12/2006 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time of 45 days to file the expert opinion , filed by JESTINE LACHAPELLE, JOSHUA LACHAPELLE. Service: 5/08/06.Response due by 5/30/2006. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 14 Filed: 4/14/2006, Entered: 4/18/2006 Status Report
                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT, filed by JESTINE LACHAPELLE, JOSHUA LACHAPELLE. Service: 4/12/2006.(mij, )
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 13 Filed: 3/23/2006, Entered: 3/27/2006 Description not available
                                                                                                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER: The special master enlarges petitioner's time within to file a medical expert opinion now due by 5/10/06. The Rule 4 report will be scheduled by later order. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 12 Filed: 3/21/2006, Entered: 3/23/2006 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time until 45 days to Pruposes of obtaining an expert opinion , filed by JESTINE LACHAPELLE, JOSHUA LACHAPELLE. Service: 3/17/2006. Response due by 4/4/2005. (mij, )
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 11 Filed: 2/27/2006, Entered: 3/7/2006 notice of filing
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING [Pursuant to the Order of 1/31/06, Fourth Submission of Required Documents] by JESTINE LACHAPELLE, JOSHUA LACHAPELLE. Service: 2/22/06.(tjk, )
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 10 Filed: 2/14/2006, Entered: 2/21/2006 notice of filing
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING (Third Submission of required documents Affidavit of Matthew Lachapelle, and Police report pages 75-77) by JESTINE LACHAPELLE, JOSHUA LACHAPELLE. Service: 2/14/06.(tjk, )
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 9 Filed: 1/31/2006, Entered: 2/3/2006 Description not available
                                                                                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER: Petitioner shall file: affidavits from all potential fact witnesses; all outstanding records and a medical expert's opinion due by 3/10/06. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 8 Filed: 1/26/2006, Entered: 1/31/2006 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT, filed by JESTINE LACHAPELLE, JOSHUA LACHAPELLE. Service: 1/23/06.(tjk, )
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 11/21/2005, Entered: 11/28/2005 notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING [Second submission of required documents - Affidavit of Jestine Lachapelle] by JESTINE LACHAPELLE, JOSHUA LACHAPELLE. Service: 11/14/05.(tjk, )
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 6 Filed: 11/18/2005, Entered: 11/22/2005 Description not available
                                                                                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER: By no later than 1/13/06, petitoner shall file: affidavits from all potential fact witnesses; all outstanding records and a medical expert's opinion that supports the petition. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 11/17/2005, Entered: 11/21/2005 Joint Status Report
                                                                                                                                                      JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 11/17/05.(tjk, )
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 10/24/2005, Entered: 10/28/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Glenn Alexander MacLeod for SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 10/24/05.(tjk, )
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 10/18/2005, Entered: 10/24/2005 Status Report/Order
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER re The parties shall file a Joint Status Report due by 11/17/2005. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 2 Filed: 10/13/2005, Entered: 10/14/2005 Notice Of Assignment
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Assignment to Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 10/13/2005, Entered: 10/14/2005 Petition
                                                                                                                                                              PETITION against SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES [Filed with one volume of records, Exhibits A and B], ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 063755) , filed by JESTINE LACHAPELLE, JOSHUA LACHAPELLE.Respondents Report Due by 1/11/2006.(tjk, )
                                                                                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 133 times.

                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?