STARGATE INDUSTRIES, LLC., v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:05-cv-01109-LMB
District Judge Lawrence M. Baskir, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Stargate Industries, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Anderson & Gulotta, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anthony Gulotta +1 717 635 7145 +1 717 541 5434 tgulotta@fbstax.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space G. Robson Stewart +1 202 307 6493 +1 202 514 9440 george.r.stewart@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 10/13/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand $211000
Nature of Suit 206 - Tax - Excise
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County None
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
105-cv-01019-LMB None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Pending Status ADRstart
Flags ECF, MEMBER, STAYED
  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 18 Filed: 7/15/2008, Entered: 7/15/2008 Court Filing
ORDER granting Parties Stip of Dismissal of this case with prejudice. Parties to bear own costs. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dcl)
    LREF
    Legal Document 17 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/14/2008
    STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice, filed by all parties.. (Stewart, G.)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: 9/25/2006 Notice of Designation of Electronic Case
      SEE NO. 05-1019T FOR NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (vro)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: 9/18/2006 Order Designating ECF Case
        SEE NO. 05-1019T ORDER directing the Clerk to designate this case as an electronic (ECF) case. All future filings will be in electronic form. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (vro, )
          LREF
          Blank 16 Filed: 8/22/2006, Entered: 8/23/2006 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER consolidating this case with Case No. 05-1019T. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dls )
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 8/22/2006, Entered: 8/23/2006 Set Member Flag
            This case has been consolidated under case number 05-1019T pursuant to the order of August 22, 2006. (dls )
              LREF
              Blank 15 Filed: 7/24/2006, Entered: 7/24/2006 Court Filing
              ORDER STAYING CASE Joint Status Report due by 9/25/2006 [ Joint Status Report shall be filed every 60 days begining September 25, 2006] Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (vro, )
                LREF
                Blank 14 Filed: 7/19/2006, Entered: 7/20/2006 Joint Status Report
                JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by STARGATE INDUSTRIES, LLC.,, USA. (vro, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 13 Filed: 4/20/2006, Entered: 4/25/2006 Memorandum
                  Partial List of Related Cases, filed by all parties. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] (mb2, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 12 Filed: 3/24/2006, Entered: 3/27/2006 TranscriptCourt Filing
                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on March 14, 2006 before Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dw1)
                      LREF
                      Blank 11 Filed: 3/15/2006, Entered: 3/20/2006 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                      SCHEDULING ORDER: Parties Fact Discovery due by 7/14/2006. Parties list of related cases due by 3/31/2006. Joint Status Report due by 7/21/2006. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dw1)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 3/15/2006, Entered: 3/15/2006
                        Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 4/14/2006. (vp1, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 10 Filed: 2/9/2006, Entered: 2/13/2006 Status Conference OrderCourt Filing
                          STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 3/14/2006 AT 10:00 AM before Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (mb2, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 9 Filed: 2/1/2006, Entered: 2/6/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                            ORDER: The parties are directed to ontact the Court with possible status conference dates. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (mb2, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 8 Filed: 2/1/2006, Entered: 2/3/2006 Joint Preliminary Status Report
                              JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT. (mb2, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 7 Filed: 12/14/2005, Entered: 12/20/2005 Order Removing Case from ADRCourt Filing
                                ORDER Removing Case from the ADR process. Judge Eric G. Bruggink no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mb2, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 6 Filed: 12/12/2005, Entered: 12/16/2005 Answer
                                  ANSWER to [1] Complaint , filed by USA. Service: 12/12/2005. JPSR due by 2/2/2006.(mb2, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 5 Filed: 12/7/2005, Entered: 12/12/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                    SPECIAL PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (mb2, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 4 Filed: 11/30/2005, Entered: 12/5/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                      NOTICE of Appearance by G. Robson Stewart for USA. Service: 11/30/2005.(mb2, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 3 Filed: 10/13/2005, Entered: 10/17/2005 Notice of Assignment - Auto ADRCourt Filing
                                        NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Eric G. Bruggink for ADR Pilot proceedings. (lg1, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 2 Filed: 10/13/2005, Entered: 10/17/2005 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                                          NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (lg1, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 1 Filed: 10/13/2005, Entered: 10/17/2005 Complaint
                                            COMPLAINT against USA (TRE) ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 063758), filed by STARGATE INDUSTRIES, LLC.,.Answer Due by 12/12/2005.(lg1, )
                                              LREF

                                              Statistics

                                              This case has been viewed 149 times.

                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                              Space
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                               
                                              PlainSite
                                              Sign Up
                                              Need Password Help?