BROOKS v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:05-cv-01129-CCM
District Judge Christine O.C. Miller, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo JIMMY D. BROOKS, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas K. Mickle +1 202 307 0383 +1 202 353 7988 douglas.mickle@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 10/20/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 352 - Military Pay - Retirement
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed
County None
Terminated 2/28/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 8 Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: 2/28/2006
JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed, without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. No costs. (lld, )
    LREF
    Blank 7 Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: 2/28/2006 Court Filing
    PUBLISHED MEMORANDUM ORDER and OPINION granting [4] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) filed by USA,. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment dismissing all claims without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. No costs. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (lld, )
      LREF
      Blank 6 Filed: 1/19/2006, Entered: 1/24/2006 Reply to Response to Motion
      REPLY to Response to Motion re [4] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) , filed by USA. Service: 1/19/2006.(mb2, )
        LREF
        Blank 5 Filed: 1/17/2006, Entered: 1/20/2006 Response to Motion
        RESPONSE to [4] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) , filed by JIMMY D. BROOKS. Reply due by 1/30/2006. Service: 1/12/2006.(mb2, )
          LREF
          Blank 4 Filed: 12/19/2005, Entered: 12/23/2005 Terminated: Court Filing
          MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) and Rule 12(b)(6), filed by USA. (filed by leave of Judge C. Miller) Service: 12/14/2005. Dispositive Motion Response due by 1/19/2006, (lld, )
            LREF
            Blank 3 Filed: 11/28/2005, Entered: 12/1/2005 Notice of Appearance/
            NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas K. Mickle for USA. Service: 11/28/2005.(mb2, )
              LREF
              Blank 2 Filed: 10/20/2005, Entered: 10/20/2005 Court Filing
              NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (lg1, )
                LREF
                Blank 1 Filed: 10/20/2005, Entered: 10/20/2005
                COMPLAINT against USA (ARM) ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 063791), filed by JIMMY D. BROOKS.Answer Due by 12/19/2005.(lg1, )
                  LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 124 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?