McKESSON CORPORATION v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:05-cv-01180-MMS
District Judge Margaret M. Sweeney, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

McKesson Corporation McKesson Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Stein, Mitchell & Mezines, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David U. Fierst +1 202 737 7777 +1 202 296 8312 dfierst@steinmitchell.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space G. Robson Stewart +1 202 307 6493 +1 202 514 9440 george.r.stewart@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 11/7/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand $980000
Nature of Suit 206 - Tax - Excise
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County None
Terminated 7/2/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ECF
  Entries (31) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 30 Filed: 7/2/2007, Entered: 7/2/2007
STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice, filed by all parties.. (Stewart, G.)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 7/2/2007, Entered: 7/5/2007 Terminated Case - Public
    Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii) this day. (dls)
      LREF
      Legal Document 29 Filed: 5/10/2007, Entered: 5/10/2007 Court Filing
      ORDER. Status Report indicating compliance due by 6/1/2007. Signed by Judge Margaret M. Sweeney. (kb1)
        LREF
        Legal Document 28 Filed: 5/3/2007, Entered: 5/3/2007 Court Filing
        ORDER: The court DISMISSES, WITHOUT PREJUDICE, plaintiff's claims related to all taxable quarters ending December 31, 1999, through December 31, 2002, EXCEPT for the claim related to the taxable quarter ending June 30, 2000. Plaintiff's deadline for filing an amended complaint is VACATED. Joint Status Report due by 6/29/2007. Signed by Judge Margaret M. Sweeney. (kb1)
          LREF
          Legal Document 27 Filed: 4/30/2007, Entered: 4/30/2007
          STIPULATION for Partial Dismissal without Prejudice, filed by all parties. (Stewart, G.)
            LREF
            Legal Document 26 Filed: 4/30/2007, Entered: 4/30/2007
            JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Stewart, G.)
              LREF
              Legal Document 25 Filed: 1/24/2007, Entered: 1/24/2007 Court Filing
              SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Complaint due by 4/30/2007. Signed by Judge Margaret M. Sweeney. (kb1, )
                LREF
                Legal Document 24 Filed: 1/24/2007, Entered: 1/24/2007
                JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Stewart, G.)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 23 Filed: 11/15/2006, Entered: 11/15/2006 Court Filing
                  SCHEDULING ORDER: 60-day enlargement of time granted. Amended Complaint due by 1/30/2007. Signed by Judge Margaret M. Sweeney. (kb1, )
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 22 Filed: 11/9/2006, Entered: 11/9/2006
                    JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Stewart, G.)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 21 Filed: 9/20/2006, Entered: 9/20/2006 Court Filing
                      SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Complaint due by 11/30/2006. Signed by Judge Margaret M. Sweeney. (kb1, )
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 20 Filed: 9/19/2006, Entered: 9/19/2006
                        JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Stewart, G.)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 19 Filed: 9/12/2006, Entered: 9/12/2006 Court Filing
                          STATUS REPORT ORDER Joint Status Report due by 9/19/2006. Signed by Judge Margaret M. Sweeney. (kb1, )
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 18 Filed: 5/26/2006, Entered: 5/26/2006 Court Filing
                            STATUS REPORT ORDER Joint Status Report due by 9/8/2006. Signed by Judge Margaret M. Sweeney. (kb1, )
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 17 Filed: 5/25/2006, Entered: 5/25/2006
                              STATUS REPORT and Notice of Change of Position, filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit IRS Notice 2006-50)(Stewart, G.)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 16 Filed: 5/19/2006, Entered: 5/19/2006 Court Filing
                                ORDER The Revised Joint Preliminary Status Report is filed by leave of court. However, in the future, the court will reject a filing if it is not signed by the counsel of record. Signed by Judge Margaret M. Sweeney. (kb1, )
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 15 Filed: 5/10/2006, Entered: 5/10/2006
                                  JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT (FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE) Revised Joint Preliminary Status Report. (Rosen, Stephen) Modified on 5/18/2006 (vro, ).
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 14 Filed: 4/7/2006, Entered: 4/7/2006 Court Filing
                                    STATUS REPORT ORDERThe parties shall, within two weeks after the decisions are issued, notify this court of the Federal Circuit's rulings in Honeywell International, Inc. v. United States, No. 05-5145, and America Online, Inc. v. United States, No. 05-5138. Then, within 30 days of filing their notice, the parties shall file a joint status report. Signed by Judge Margaret M. Sweeney. (kb1, )
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 13 Filed: 3/30/2006, Entered: 3/30/2006 Court Filing
                                      PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Order A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for 4/5/2006 at 11:00 AM before Judge Margaret M. Sweeney. Signed by Judge Margaret M. Sweeney. (kb1, )
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 12 Filed: 3/7/2006, Entered: 3/7/2006 Court Filing
                                        DISCOVERY SCHEDULING ORDER: Joint Status Report due by 9/8/2006. The parties shall contact the court by 3/24/2006 to schedule a status conference. Signed by Judge Margaret M. Sweeney. (kb1, )
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 11 Filed: 3/7/2006, Entered: 3/7/2006 Court Filing
                                          ORDER granting [10] Motion for Leave to File Corrected Joint Preliminary Status Report. Signed by Judge Margaret M. Sweeney. (kb1, )
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 10 Filed: 3/3/2006, Entered: 3/3/2006, Terminated: 3/7/2006 Motion for Leave to File
                                            MOTION for Leave to File Joint Preliminary Status Report, filed by USA. Response due by 3/20/2006. (Attachments: # (1))(Stewart, G.)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 9 Filed: 3/3/2006, Entered: 3/3/2006
                                              JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT. (Stewart, G.)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 7 Filed: 1/10/2006, Entered: 1/10/2006
                                                ANSWER to [1] Complaint, filed by USA. JPSR due by 3/3/2006.(Stewart, G.)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 8 Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: 1/10/2006 Notice of ReassignmentCourt Filing
                                                  NOTICE of Reassignment. Case reassigned to Judge Margaret Sweeney for all further proceedings. Judge Marian Blank Horn no longer assigned to case. (dls )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 6 Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: 1/9/2006 Court Filing
                                                    ORDER reassigning case to Judge Sweeney. Signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn. (vh1,)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 5 Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: 1/6/2006 Court Filing
                                                      ORDER RETURNING UNFILED: Defendant's Answer received January 5, 2006. Defendant shall file its answer in electronic form on or before January 13, 2006. Signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn. (sf1)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 4 Filed: 11/22/2005, Entered: 11/22/2005
                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by G. Robson Stewart for USA. (Stewart, G.)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 3 Filed: 11/7/2005, Entered: 11/8/2005 Notice of Designation of Electronic Case
                                                          NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (lg1, ).
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 2 Filed: 11/7/2005, Entered: 11/8/2005 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                                                            NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Marian Blank Horn. (lg1, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 11/7/2005, Entered: 11/8/2005 Complaint
                                                              COMPLAINT against USA (TRE) ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 063879), filed by McKESSON CORPORATION.Answer Due by 1/6/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(lg1, )
                                                              LREF

                                                              Statistics

                                                              This case has been viewed 225 times.

                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                              Space
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                               
                                                              PlainSite
                                                              Sign Up
                                                              Need Password Help?