LOCUS TELECOMMUNICATIONS, INC., v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:05-cv-01184-RHH
District Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr., presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Locus Telecommunications, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Helein & Marashlian LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles H Helein chh@commlawgroup.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space G. Robson Stewart +1 202 307 6493 +1 202 514 9440 george.r.stewart@usdoj.gov
No Logo KDI DISTRIBUTION, INC., Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Levine, Blaszak, Block and Boothby, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen J. Rosen +1 202 857 2550 srosen@lb3law.com
Office COFC
Filed 11/9/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand $17899000
Nature of Suit 206 - Tax - Excise
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County None
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
105-cv-01184-RHH None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ECF, LEAD
  Entries (41) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 39 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: 9/15/2008
MOTION for Summary Judgment, filed by LOCUS TELECOMMUNICATIONS, INC.,.Response due by 10/16/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Fidings in Support of Motion, # (2) Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, # (3) Appendix, # (4) Tab 1 part 1, # (5) Tab 1 part 2, # (6) Tab 2 a part 1, # (7) Tab 2 a part 2, # (8) Tab 2 b and c, # (9) Tab 2 d, # (10) Tab 2 e, # (11) Tab 2 f-1, # (12) Tab 2 f-2 and 3, # (13) Tab 2 g, # (14) Tab 2 h, # (15) Tab 3 and 4)(Helein, Charles)
LREF
Legal Document 38 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: 8/25/2008
MEMORANDUM, filed by LOCUS TELECOMMUNICATIONS, INC.,. (Helein, Charles)
    LREF
    Legal Document 37 Filed: 8/15/2008, Entered: 8/15/2008
    REPLY to [35] and [36] RESPONSES to [33] Motion to Intervene, filed by KDI DISTRIBUTION, INC.. (Rosen, Stephen) Modified on 8/15/2008 to link to proper document.(dls).
      LREF
      Legal Document 36 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: 8/4/2008
      RESPONSE to [33] MOTION to Intervene , filed by LOCUS TELECOMMUNICATIONS, INC.. Reply due by 8/18/08. (Helein, Charles) Modified on 8/12/2008 to edit docket text. (dls)
        LREF
        Legal Document 35 Filed: 8/1/2008, Entered: 8/1/2008
        RESPONSE to [33] MOTION to Intervene BY KDI DISTRIBUTION, INC, filed by USA.Reply due by 8/15/2008. (Stewart, G.)
          LREF
          Legal Document 34 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: 7/28/2008
          JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Stewart, G.)
            LREF
            Legal Document 33 Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: 7/16/2008
            MOTION to Intervene, filed by KDI Distribution, Inc..Response due by 8/4/2008.(Rosen, Stephen)
              LREF
              Legal Document 32 Filed: 4/28/2008, Entered: 4/28/2008 Court Filing
              ORDER granting [31] Motion to Continue. Stayed until July 28, 2008. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (kb3)
                LREF
                Legal Document 31 Filed: 4/21/2008, Entered: 4/21/2008, Terminated: 4/28/2008 Motion to Continue
                MOTION to Continue, filed by LOCUS TELECOMMUNICATIONS, INC.,.Response due by 5/8/2008. (Attachments: # (1))(Helein, Charles)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 30 Filed: 1/31/2008, Entered: 1/31/2008
                  JUDGMENT entered, as provided in Rule 54(b) that plaintiffs claims for the amounts set forth below are dismissed with prejudice. The parties shall bear their respective costs, including any possible attorneys fees or other expenses of this litigation.200103,$513,454.79;200106,$544,007.20;200109,$630,598.14;200112,$583,133.67;200203,$595,245.34;200206,$626,709.05;200209,$668,018.33;200212,$707,604.92;200303,$711,907.58;200306,$786,882.75;200309,$953,386.66;200312,$760,683.25; (lld)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 29 Filed: 1/25/2008, Entered: 1/25/2008 Court Filing
                    ORDER directing the Clerk to dismiss the case in accordance with [27] Joint Stipulation for Partial Dismissal. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (kb3)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 28 Filed: 1/25/2008, Entered: 1/25/2008 Court Filing
                      ORDER granting [26] Motion to Continue Stay until April 24, 2008. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (kb3)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 27 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: 1/22/2008
                        STIPULATION for Partial Dismissal, filed by LOCUS TELECOMMUNICATIONS, INC.,. (Helein, Charles)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 26 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: 1/22/2008, Terminated: 1/25/2008 Motion to Continue
                          Joint MOTION to Continue and Status Report, filed by LOCUS TELECOMMUNICATIONS, INC.,.Response due by 2/8/2008.(Helein, Charles)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 25 Filed: 10/22/2007, Entered: 10/22/2007 Court Filing
                            ORDER granting [24] Motion to Continue stay until January 21, 2008. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (kb3)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 24 Filed: 10/22/2007, Entered: 10/22/2007, Terminated: 10/22/2007 Motion to Continue
                              Joint MOTION to Continue Suspension of Proceedings, filed by LOCUS TELECOMMUNICATIONS, INC.,.Response due by 11/8/2007.(Helein, Charles)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 23 Filed: 7/24/2007, Entered: 7/24/2007 Court Filing
                                ORDER granting [22] Motion to Continue stay until October 22, 2007 Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (SWF)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 22 Filed: 7/24/2007, Entered: 7/24/2007, Terminated: 7/24/2007 Motion to Continue
                                  MOTION to Continue Suspension of Proceedings, filed by LOCUS TELECOMMUNICATIONS, INC.,.Response due by 8/10/2007.(Helein, Charles)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 21 Filed: 7/23/2007, Entered: 7/23/2007
                                    MOTION to Continue Suspension of Proceedings, filed by LOCUS TELECOMMUNICATIONS, INC.,.Response due by 8/9/2007.(Helein, Charles)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 20 Filed: 4/24/2007, Entered: 4/24/2007 Court Filing
                                      ORDER granting [19] Motion to Continue Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (kmg)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 4/24/2007, Entered: 4/24/2007
                                        Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 7/23/2007 (mij, )
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 19 Filed: 4/23/2007, Entered: 4/23/2007, Terminated: 4/24/2007 Motion to Continue
                                          Joint MOTION to Continue Suspension of Proceedings, filed by LOCUS TELECOMMUNICATIONS, INC.,.Response due by 5/10/2007.(Helein, Charles)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 18 Filed: 1/23/2007, Entered: 1/23/2007 Court Filing
                                            ORDER granting [17] Motion to Continue Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (kmg, )
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 17 Filed: 1/22/2007, Entered: 1/22/2007, Terminated: 1/23/2007 Motion to Continue
                                              Joint MOTION to Continue Suspension of Proceedings, filed by LOCUS TELECOMMUNICATIONS, INC.,.Response due by 2/8/2007.(Helein, Charles)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 16 Filed: 10/27/2006, Entered: 10/27/2006 Court Filing
                                                ORDER granting [15] Motion to Continue. Status report due January 24, 2007. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (swf, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 10/27/2006, Entered: 10/27/2006
                                                  Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 1/24/2007 (mij, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 15 Filed: 10/26/2006, Entered: 10/26/2006, Terminated: 10/27/2006 Motion to Continue
                                                    First MOTION to Continue Suspension of Proceedings, filed by LOCUS TELECOMMUNICATIONS, INC.,.Response due by 11/13/2006.(Helein, Charles)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 14 Filed: 8/1/2006, Entered: 8/1/2006 Court Filing
                                                      ORDER granting [13] Motion to Stay Status Report due by 10/27/2006 Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (swf, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 13 Filed: 7/24/2006, Entered: 7/24/2006, Terminated: 8/1/2006 Motion to Stay
                                                        Joint MOTION to Stay all proceedings, filed by USA.Response due by 8/10/2006.(Stewart, G.)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 12 Filed: 7/17/2006, Entered: 7/17/2006 Court Filing
                                                          STATUS REPORT ORDER Status Report due by 7/24/2006 Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (swf, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 11 Filed: 5/25/2006, Entered: 5/25/2006
                                                            STATUS REPORT and Notice of Change of Position, filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit IRS Notice 2006-50)(Stewart, G.)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 10 Filed: 3/14/2006, Entered: 3/14/2006
                                                              STIPULATION for partial dismissal without prejudice, filed by all parties. (Stewart, G.)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 9 Filed: 3/7/2006, Entered: 3/7/2006 Court Filing
                                                                DISCOVERY SCHEDULING ORDER: If the parties agree that discovery is necessary, the 120-day period begins this date. Discovery would close on July 5. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (swf, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 8 Filed: 3/2/2006, Entered: 3/2/2006
                                                                  JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit IRS Notice# (2) Exhibit Wireline Article)(Stewart, G.)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 7 Filed: 1/11/2006, Entered: 1/11/2006 Court Filing
                                                                    ORDER granting [6] Motion to Amend/Correct Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (swf, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 6 Filed: 1/10/2006, Entered: 1/10/2006, Terminated: 1/11/2006 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                      MOTION to Amend/Correct Exhibits, filed by LOCUS TELECOMMUNICATIONS, INC.,. Response due by 1/27/2006. (Helein, Charles)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 5 Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: 1/9/2006
                                                                        ANSWER to [1] Complaint, filed by USA. JPSR due by 3/2/2006.(Stewart, G.)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 4 Filed: 11/22/2005, Entered: 11/22/2005
                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by G. Robson Stewart for USA. (Stewart, G.)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 3 Filed: 11/9/2005, Entered: 11/9/2005
                                                                            NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (lg1, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 2 Filed: 11/9/2005, Entered: 11/9/2005 Court Filing
                                                                              NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. (lg1, )
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 1 Filed: 11/9/2005, Entered: 11/9/2005
                                                                                COMPLAINT against USA (TRE) ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 063889), filed by LOCUS TELECOMMUNICATIONS, INC.,.Answer Due by 1/9/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(lg1, )
                                                                                LREF

                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                This case has been viewed 164 times.

                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                Space
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                 
                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                Need Password Help?