TEXTRON, INC., v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:05-cv-01188-MBH
District Judge Marian Blank Horn, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Textron, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kelley Drye & Warren, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul L. Kattas +1 973 503 5924 +1 973 503 5950 pkattas@kelleydrye.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jacob Earl Christensen +1 202 307 0878 +1 202 514 9440 jacob.e.christensen@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 11/10/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 206 - Tax - Excise
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed
County None
Terminated 8/31/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ECF
  Entries (50) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 48 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: 8/31/2007
JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii) that the claims in this case are dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs, expenses, and attorneys fees. (lld)
    LREF
    Legal Document 47 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: 8/30/2007 Court Filing
    ORDER directing the Clerk to dismiss the case. Signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn. (rpc)
      LREF
      Legal Document 46 Filed: 8/8/2007, Entered: 8/8/2007
      STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice, filed by USA.. (Christensen, Jacob)
        LREF
        Legal Document 45 Filed: 7/10/2007, Entered: 7/10/2007 Court Filing
        STATUS REPORT ORDER:Joint Status Report due by 8/9/2007. Signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn. (rpc)
          LREF
          Legal Document 44 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: 7/9/2007
          JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by USA. (Christensen, Jacob)
            LREF
            Legal Document 43 Filed: 6/6/2007, Entered: 6/6/2007
            JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by USA. (Christensen, Jacob)
              LREF
              Legal Document 42 Filed: 5/9/2007, Entered: 5/9/2007
              JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by USA. (Christensen, Jacob)
                LREF
                Legal Document 41 Filed: 4/6/2007, Entered: 4/6/2007 Court Filing
                SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Reports due by 5/9/2007 (and monthly thereafter), Status Conference set for 6/12/2007 10:30 AM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Judge Marian Blank Horn. Signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn. (ah1) Modified on 6/7/2007 to add docket text. (Samler, Debbie).
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 40 Filed: 4/6/2007, Entered: 4/6/2007
                  JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by USA. (Christensen, Jacob)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 39 Filed: 3/8/2007, Entered: 3/8/2007
                    JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by USA. (Christensen, Jacob)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 38 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: 2/9/2007 Court Filing
                      STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 4/12/2007 10:30 AM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Judge Marian Blank Horn. Joint Status Reports due by 3/8/2007, 4/9/2007. Signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn. (rpc)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 37 Filed: 2/8/2007, Entered: 2/8/2007
                        JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by USA. (Christensen, Jacob)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 36 Filed: 1/8/2007, Entered: 1/8/2007
                          JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by USA. (Christensen, Jacob)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 35 Filed: 12/7/2006, Entered: 12/7/2006 Court Filing
                            SCHEDULING ORDER: Joint Status Report due by 1/8/2007, and monthly thereafter. Signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn. (rpc)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 34 Filed: 12/6/2006, Entered: 12/6/2006
                              JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by USA. (Christensen, Jacob)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 33 Filed: 11/29/2006, Entered: 11/29/2006 Court Filing
                                STATUS REPORT ORDER: Joint Status Report due by 12/6/2006, and at monthly intervals thereafter, the next status report being due on January 8, 2007. Signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn. (rpc) Modified on 12/5/2006 to include language re: future status reports. (dls ).
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 32 Filed: 11/6/2006, Entered: 11/6/2006
                                  JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by TEXTRON, INC.,. (Kattas, Paul)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 31 Filed: 10/6/2006, Entered: 10/6/2006
                                    JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by USA. (Christensen, Jacob)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 30 Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: 9/6/2006 Court Filing
                                      STATUS REPORT ORDER . Joint status report due Friday, October 6, 2006. Signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn.(ah1)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 29 Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: 9/6/2006
                                        JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by USA. (Christensen, Jacob)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 28 Filed: 7/7/2006, Entered: 7/7/2006
                                          NOTICE, filed by USA RE: MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED ANSWER (Christensen, Jacob)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 27 Filed: 7/6/2006, Entered: 7/6/2006, Terminated: 8/31/2007 Motion to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15
                                            MOTION to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15, filed by USA. Response due by 7/24/2006. (Attachments: # (1))(Christensen, Jacob)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 26 Filed: 7/5/2006, Entered: 7/5/2006 Court Filing
                                              ORDER granting [25] Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn. (rpc)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 25 Filed: 6/29/2006, Entered: 6/29/2006, Terminated: 7/5/2006 Motion for Protective Order
                                                MOTION for Protective Order, filed by TEXTRON, INC.,.Response due by 7/17/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order [proposed] Protective Order# (2) Affidavit of John H. Braken in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for a Protective Order# (3) Exhibit A to Affidavit of John H. Braken)(Kattas, Paul)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 24 Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: 6/16/2006 Court Filing
                                                STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 7/5/2006, 10:30 AM, in Chambers (Telephonic) before Judge Marian Blank Horn. Joint Status Report due by 9/6/2006.Signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn. (rpc)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: 6/19/2006 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                  Set Deadlines: If issues are not resolved, plaintiff may file a motion for protective order by 10:00 a.m. on 6/30/2006; Additional Status Report due by 10/6/2006. (dls )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 23 Filed: 6/9/2006, Entered: 6/9/2006
                                                    JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by USA. (Christensen, Jacob)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 22 Filed: 6/5/2006, Entered: 6/5/2006 Court Filing
                                                      STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER:Telephonic Status Conference rescheduled from 6/14/2006 to 6/16/2006 2:30 PM before Judge Marian Blank Horn. Signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn. (vh1)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 21 Filed: 5/30/2006, Entered: 5/30/2006 Court Filing
                                                        STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 6/14/2006 at 3:30 PM before Judge Marian Blank Horn. Signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn. (sf1)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 20 Filed: 5/25/2006, Entered: 5/25/2006
                                                          STATUS REPORT, filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Christensen, Jacob)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 19 Filed: 5/25/2006, Entered: 5/25/2006
                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Earl Christensen for USA. (Christensen, Jacob)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank -- Filed: 5/25/2006, Entered: 6/12/2006 Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                              *** Attorney G. Robson Stewart terminated. (dls )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 18 Filed: 5/5/2006, Entered: 5/5/2006
                                                                NOTICE, filed by TEXTRON, INC., Amended Notice of Appearance of Paul Kattas (Kattas, Paul)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 17 Filed: 5/4/2006, Entered: 5/4/2006 Court Filing
                                                                  ORDER granting [13] Motion, granting [16] Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Paul L. Kattas for TEXTRON, INC.. Attorney George J. Marchese terminated. Signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn. (sf1, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 16 Filed: 5/3/2006, Entered: 5/3/2006, Terminated: 5/4/2006 Motion to Substitute Attorney
                                                                    MOTION to Substitute Attorney Paul L. Kattas in place of George Marchese, filed by TEXTRON, INC.,.Response due by 5/22/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Appointment)(Marchese, George)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 15 Filed: 4/19/2006, Entered: 4/19/2006
                                                                      AFFIDAVIT re [13] MOTION to Change Attorney of Record Affidavit of Appointment by TEXTRON, INC.,. (Kattas, Paul)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 14 Filed: 4/18/2006, Entered: 4/18/2006
                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Paul L. Kattas for TEXTRON, INC.,. (Kattas, Paul)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 13 Filed: 4/13/2006, Entered: 4/13/2006, Terminated: 5/4/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                          MOTION to Change Attorney of Record from George Marchese to Paul Kattas filed by TEXTRON, INC.,.(Marchese, George) Modified on 4/14/2006 to add names of attorneys. (dls ).
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 12 Filed: 4/5/2006, Entered: 4/5/2006 Court Filing
                                                                            STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 4/20/2006 10:30 AM before Judge Marian Blank Horn. Signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn.(sf1)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 11 Filed: 3/31/2006, Entered: 3/31/2006 Court Filing
                                                                              STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER:Status Conference set for 4/6/2006 10:30 AM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Judge Marian Blank Horn. Signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn. (vh1)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 10 Filed: 3/20/2006, Entered: 3/20/2006
                                                                                JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT. (Stewart, G.)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 9 Filed: 1/25/2006, Entered: 1/25/2006
                                                                                  ANSWER to [1] Complaint, filed by USA. JPSR due by 3/20/2006.(Stewart, G.)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 8 Filed: 1/24/2006, Entered: 1/24/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                    ORDER granting [7] Motion for Leave to File Out of Time. Signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn.(sf1)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 7 Filed: 1/20/2006, Entered: 1/20/2006, Terminated: 1/24/2006 Motion for Leave to File Out of Time
                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Attached Answer Out of Time, filed by USA. Response due by 2/6/2006. (Attachments: # (1))(Stewart, G.)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 6 Filed: 1/11/2006, Entered: 1/11/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                        ORDER RETURNING UNFILED: Defendant's Answer to the Complaint received 01/09/2006. All cases are to be filed electronically. Ordered to file a correct answer on or before 01/18/2006, in electronic form. Signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn. (vh1)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 5 Filed: 12/22/2005, Entered: 12/22/2005
                                                                                          Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement, filed by TEXTRON, INC.,. (Marchese, George)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 4 Filed: 11/23/2005, Entered: 11/23/2005
                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by G. Robson Stewart for USA. (Stewart, G.)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 3 Filed: 11/10/2005, Entered: 11/14/2005 Notice of Designation of Electronic Case
                                                                                              NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (lg1, )
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 2 Filed: 11/10/2005, Entered: 11/14/2005 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Marian Blank Horn. (lg1, )
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 11/10/2005, Entered: 11/14/2005 Complaint
                                                                                                  COMPLAINT against USA (TRE) ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 063583), filed by TEXTRON, INC.,.Answer Due by 1/9/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(lg1, )
                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 152 times.

                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                   
                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                  Need Password Help?