LOEH v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:05-cv-01208-NBF
District Judge Nancy B. Firestone, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ROBERT L. LOEH, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas K. Mickle +1 202 307 0383 +1 202 353 7988 douglas.mickle@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 11/17/2005
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 352 - Military Pay - Retirement
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed
County None
Terminated 9/15/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags AUTO, CLOSED
  Entries (42) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 42 Filed: 12/5/2006, Entered: 12/5/2006
AMENDED JUDGMENT entered, pursuant ot Rule 58, that plaintiff is not entitled to retirement pay or separation pay and the complaint is dismissed. Each party shall bear its own costs. (lld, )
    LREF
    Blank 41 Filed: 12/4/2006, Entered: 12/5/2006 Order on Motion for Reconsideration - Rule 59(a)Court Filing
    ORDER granting in part [35] Motion for Reconsideration - Rule 59(a) re [34] Judgment. for the limited purpose of clarifying its September 15, 2006 decision. The clerk shall amend the judmnet of September 15, 2006 to include the court's holding that plaintiff is not entitled to separation pay. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (lld, )
      LREF
      Blank 40 Filed: 10/25/2006, Entered: 10/26/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
      ORDER granting [38] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re [38] MOTION for Extension of Time until 11/24/2006 to File Response or Reply as to [36] Scheduling Order Response due by 11/27/2006. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (bre, )
        LREF
        Blank 39 Filed: 10/23/2006, Entered: 10/25/2006 Reply to Response to Motion
        REPLY to Response to Motion re [38] MOTION for Extension of Time until 11/24/2006 to File Response or Reply as to [36] Scheduling Order, [35] MOTION for Reconsideration - Rule 59(a) re [33] Published Opinion/Order , filed by ROBERT L. LOEH. Service: 10/21/2006.(bre, )
          LREF
          Blank 38 Filed: 10/20/2006, Entered: 10/23/2006, Terminated: 10/25/2006 Terminated:
          MOTION for Extension of Time until 11/24/2006 to File Response or Reply as to [36] Scheduling Order , filed by ROBERT L. LOEH. Service: 10/17/2006.Response due by 11/6/2006.(bre, )
            LREF
            Blank 37 Filed: 10/13/2006, Entered: 10/17/2006 Response to Motion [Dispositive]
            RESPONSE to [35] MOTION for Reconsideration - Rule 59(a) re [33] Published Opinion/Order , filed by USA.Reply due by 10/30/2006. Service: 10/13/2006.(bre, )
              LREF
              Blank 36 Filed: 10/2/2006, Entered: 10/2/2006 Court Filing
              SCHEDULING ORDER:Plaintiff's Response due by 10/24/2006. Defendant's Brief due by 10/17/2006 Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (bre, )
                LREF
                Blank 35 Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: 9/29/2006, Terminated: 12/4/2006 Motion for Reconsideration - Rule 59(a)
                MOTION for Reconsideration - Rule 59(a) re [33] Published Opinion/Order, filed by ROBERT L. LOEH. Service: 9/25/2006.(mb2, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 34 Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: 9/15/2006
                  JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed pursuant to RCFC 12(b)(6) for failure to state a claim. Each party shall bear its own costs. (lld, ) Amended per 12/4/2006 Order(lld, ).
                    LREF
                    Blank 33 Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: 9/15/2006 Court Filing
                    PUBLISHED OPINION and ORDER granting [15] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by USA,. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (lld, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 32 Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: 6/20/2006 Surreply
                      SUR-REPLY re [15] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record , filed by ROBERT L. LOEH. Service: 6/12/2006.(mb2, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 31 Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: 6/19/2006 Terminated:
                        MOTION for Leave to File Affidavit from Counsel , filed by USA. Service: 6/16/2006.Response due by 7/3/2006.(mb2, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 30 Filed: 6/9/2006, Entered: 6/12/2006 Reply to Response to Motion
                          REPLY to Response to Motion re [15] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record , filed by USA. Service: 6/2/2006.(mb2, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 29 Filed: 6/9/2006, Entered: 6/12/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                            ORDER granting [27] Motion for Extension of Time, granting [28] Motion for Leave to File Out of Time. Sur-Reply due by 6/30/2006. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (mb2, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 28 Filed: 6/2/2006, Entered: 6/7/2006 Terminated:
                              MOTION for Leave to File Attached Reply to Plaintiff's Response Out of Time , filed by USA. Service: 6/2/2006.Response due by 6/19/2006.(lld, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 27 Filed: 6/2/2006, Entered: 6/7/2006, Terminated: 6/9/2006 Terminated:
                                MOTION for Extension of Time until 6/19/2006 to file Sur-reply , filed by ROBERT L. LOEH. By leave of the judge Service: 5/22/2006.Response due by 6/19/2006.(lld, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 26 Filed: 5/3/2006, Entered: 5/9/2006 Order on Motion for HearingCourt Filing
                                  ORDER granting [24] Motion for Hearing, granting [25] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re [15] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record. Reply due by 5/22/2006. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (mb2, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 25 Filed: 4/28/2006, Entered: 5/3/2006 Terminated:
                                    MOTION for Extension of Time until 5/22/2006 to File Response or Reply as to [15] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record , filed by USA. Service: 4/28/2006.Response due by 5/15/2006.(mb2, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 24 Filed: 4/20/2006, Entered: 4/24/2006, Terminated: 5/3/2006 Terminated:
                                      MOTION for Telephonic Oral Arguments , filed by ROBERT L. LOEH. Service: 4/17/2006. Response due by 5/4/2006.(mb2, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 23 Filed: 4/20/2006, Entered: 4/24/2006 Response to Motion
                                        RESPONSE to [15] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record , filed by ROBERT L. LOEH. Reply due by 5/1/2006. Service: 4/17/2006.(mb2, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 22 Filed: 3/23/2006, Entered: 3/24/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas K. Mickle for USA. Service: 3/23/2006.(mb2, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 21 Filed: 2/24/2006, Entered: 3/1/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                            ORDER granting [17] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re [15] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record. Response due by 5/1/2006. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (mb2, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 20 Filed: 2/24/2006, Entered: 3/1/2006 Administrative Record
                                              ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD (one volume), filed by USA. (mb2, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 19 Filed: 2/24/2006, Entered: 3/1/2006 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                ORDER granting [18] Motion for Leave to File Administrative Record. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (mb2, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 18 Filed: 2/23/2006, Entered: 2/27/2006, Terminated: 2/24/2006 Terminated:
                                                  MOTION for Leave to File The Administrative Record, filed by USA. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Response due by 3/13/2006. (mb2, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 17 Filed: 2/21/2006, Entered: 2/23/2006, Terminated: 2/24/2006 Terminated:
                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time until 5/1/2006 to File Reply as to [1] Complaint , filed by ROBERT L. LOEH. Service: 2/13/2006. Response due by 3/2/2006. (mb2, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 16 Filed: 2/16/2006, Entered: 2/22/2006 Statement of Facts
                                                      STATEMENT OF FACTS re: [15] Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(1), Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(6), Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record, filed by USA. Service: 2/16/2006.(mb2, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 15 Filed: 2/16/2006, Entered: 2/22/2006, Terminated: 9/15/2006 Terminated:
                                                        MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1), MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6), MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record , filed by USA. Service: 2/16/2006. Response due by 3/20/2006. (mb2, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 14 Filed: 1/13/2006, Entered: 1/19/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER granting [13] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Answer Due by 2/16/2006. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (mb2, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 13 Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: 1/12/2006, Terminated: 1/13/2006 Terminated:
                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time until 2/16/2006 to File Answer re [1] Complaint , filed by USA. Service: 1/9/2006. Response due by 1/26/2006. (mb2, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 12 Filed: 1/5/2006, Entered: 1/10/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER: The parties are hereby notified that the Court is available to discuss a means for resolving this action. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mb2, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 11 Filed: 1/4/2006, Entered: 1/5/2006 Response
                                                                RESPONSE to Defendant's Motion for a Protective Order, filed by ROBERT L. LOEH. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 12/22/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 10 Filed: 1/4/2006, Entered: 1/5/2006 Terminated:
                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Attached Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Protective Order Out of Time , filed by ROBERT L. LOEH. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 12/22/2005. Response due by 1/9/2006. (mb2, ) Modified on 1/5/2006 (mb2, ).
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 9 Filed: 12/21/2005, Entered: 12/28/2005 Order on Motion for DiscoveryCourt Filing
                                                                    ORDER denying [5] Motion for Discovery, granting [5] Motion for In Camera Review of Document by Court, denying [6] Motion for Discovery. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (mb2, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 8 Filed: 12/12/2005, Entered: 12/16/2005 Response to Motion
                                                                      RESPONSE to [5] MOTION for Discovery MOTION In Camera Review of Document by Court , filed by USA. Reply due by 12/27/2005. Service: 12/12/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 7 Filed: 12/8/2005, Entered: 12/13/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly B. Blank for USA. Service: 12/8/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 6 Filed: 12/6/2005, Entered: 12/9/2005 Terminated:
                                                                          Second MOTION for Discovery , filed by ROBERT L. LOEH. Service: 12/2/2005. Response due by 12/19/2005. (mb2, )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 5 Filed: 11/28/2005, Entered: 12/1/2005, Terminated: 12/21/2005 Terminated:
                                                                            MOTION for Discovery, or in the alternative, MOTION In Camera Review of Document by Court , filed by ROBERT L. LOEH. Service: 11/25/2005. Response due by 12/12/2005. (mb2, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 4 Filed: 11/28/2005, Entered: 12/1/2005 Memorandum
                                                                              Consent to ADR, filed by ROBERT L. LOEH. Service: 11/25/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 3 Filed: 11/17/2005, Entered: 11/17/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Erig G. Bruggink for ADR Pilot proceedings. (lg1, ).
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 11/17/2005, Entered: 11/17/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                  NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (lg1, )
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 11/17/2005, Entered: 11/17/2005
                                                                                    COMPLAINT against ROBERT L. LOEH (NAV) ( Filing fee $150, Receipt number 063923), filed by ROBERT L. LOEH.Answer Due by 1/17/2006.(lg1, )
                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                      This case has been viewed 235 times.

                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                      Space
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                       
                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                      Need Password Help?